Hooks et al v. Forman, Holt, Elaides & Ravin,
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 12-3639

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 24, 2016 at 9:45 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 09/20/2013, to SDNY (NEW YORK), ISSUED.[1047279] [12-3639] [Entered: 09/20/2013 02:03 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 95 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
    STATEMENT OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellant Karen Hooks Karen Hooks and Geraldine Moore, FILED.[1047278] [12-3639] [Entered: 09/20/2013 02:00 PM]
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
      JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[969229] [12-3639] [Entered: 06/19/2013 11:15 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 89 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
        ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellant Karen Hooks Karen Hooks and Geraldine Moore, FILED. Service date 06/11/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail.[962175] [12-3639] [Entered: 06/11/2013 05:09 PM]
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
          CORRECTED OPINION, to reflect changes made by errata, by PWH, DAL, CFD, FILED.[961075] [12-3639] [Entered: 06/11/2013 09:30 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
            ERRATA SHEET, for Opinion dated 06/10/2013, by CFD, FILED.[961065] [12-3639] [Entered: 06/11/2013 09:24 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 86 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
              JUDGMENT, FILED.[950416] [12-3639]
                LREF
                Blank 82 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 05/29/2013, to SDNY (NYNY), ISSUED.[949504] [12-3639]
                  LREF
                  Blank 81 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                  NEW CASE MANAGER, Connie Mazariego, ASSIGNED.[949496] [12-3639]
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                    OPINION, the distirct court judgment is vacated as it relates to 15 U.S.C. & 1692g(a)(3) and remanded for further proceedings, by PWH, DAL, CFD, FILED.[949488] [12-3639]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 77 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                      REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, from Fagenson & Puglisi RECEIVED.[913949] [12-3639]
                        LREF
                        Blank 75 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                        FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 03/06/2013, on behalf of Appellee Forman, Holt, Elaides & Ravin, LLC and William L. Waldman, RECEIVED. Service date 03/06/2013 by CM/ECF.[866629] [12-3639]
                          LREF
                          Blank 73 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                          FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 03/04/2013, on behalf of Appellant Karen Hooks Karen Hooks and Geraldine Moore, RECEIVED. Service date 03/04/2013 by CM/ECF, email.[863235] [12-3639]
                            LREF
                            Blank 71 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
                            FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 02/21/2013, on behalf of Appellant Karen Hooks Karen Hooks and Geraldine Moore, RECEIVED. Service date 02/21/2013 by CM/ECF, email.[851626] [12-3639]
                              LREF
                              Blank 69 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                              FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 02/20/2013, on behalf of Appellee Forman, Holt, Elaides & Ravin, LLC and William L. Waldman, RECEIVED. Service date 02/20/2013 by CM/ECF, email.[850693] [12-3639]
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
                                FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 02/06/2013, on behalf of Appellant Karen Hooks Karen Hooks and Geraldine Moore, RECEIVED. Service date 02/06/2013 by CM/ECF, email.[838060] [12-3639]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                  FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 02/05/2013, on behalf of Appellee Forman, Holt, Elaides & Ravin, LLC and William L. Waldman, RECEIVED. Service date 02/05/2013 by email, CM/ECF.[837535] [12-3639]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Forman, Holt, Elaides & Ravin, LLC and William L. Waldman, FILED. Service date 01/24/2013 by CM/ECF. [825631] [12-3639]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Blank 35
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Blank 29
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?