Clouding IP LLC v. Fox News Network LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-01641
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 9, 2016 at 3:14 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Clouding IP, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Bayard, PA

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoffner PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaspal S. Hare jaspal.hare@gmail.com

Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Fox News Network LLC Fox News Network LLC, Counter-Claimant
v.
Fox News Network LLC Fox News Network LLC, Defendant

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

No Logo Clouding IP, LLC, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,925,481; 7,254,621. (ntl) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Clouding IP LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
      Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding claim construction issues. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending the Outcome of Inter Partes Review by Gannett Co Inc., Dow Jones & Company, Inc., New York Times Company, Thomson Reuters Corp., West Services Inc., CNN Interactive Group Inc., TI Media Solutions Inc., Fox News Network LLC, TheHuffingtonPost.com Inc. re (17 in 1:12-cv-01643-LPS, 16 in 1:12-cv-01645-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01639-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01642-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01641-LPS, 16 in 1:12-cv-01646-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01644-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01640-LPS) MOTION to Stay Pending the Outcome of Inter Partes Review (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brain Ledahl - filed by Clouding IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Brian Ledahl)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Jaspal S. Hare as co-counsel.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
              Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stephen B. Brauerman, Esquire regarding Termination of IPR Proceedings - re (17 in 1:12-cv-01643-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01642-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01641-LPS, 16 in 1:12-cv-01646-LPS, 16 in 1:12-cv-01645-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01639-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01644-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01640-LPS) MOTION to Stay Pending the Outcome of Inter Partes Review. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven Lieberman, Brian S. Rosenbloom, Sharon L. Davis and Chen Li of ROTHWELL, FIGG, ERNST & MANBECK, P.C. - filed by Gannett Co Inc., Dow Jones & Company, Inc., New York Times Company, Thomson Reuters Corp., West Services Inc., CNN Interactive Group Inc., TI Media Solutions Inc., Time Inc., Fox News Network LLC. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                  Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding request for oral argument - re (16 in 1:12-cv-01645-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01639-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01642-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01641-LPS, 16 in 1:12-cv-01646-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01644-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01640-LPS) MOTION to Stay Pending the Outcome of Inter Partes Review. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                    DECLARATION re (22 in 1:12-cv-01646-LPS) Reply Brief -- Declaration of Chen Li -- by Gannett Co Inc., Dow Jones & Company, Inc., New York Times Company, Thomson Reuters Corp., West Services Inc., CNN Interactive Group Inc., TI Media Solutions Inc., Time Inc., Fox News Network LLC, TheHuffingtonPost.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-M)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                      REPLY BRIEF re 15 MOTION to Stay Pending the Outcome of Inter Partes Review filed by Fox News Network LLC. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                        DECLARATION re (18 in 1:12-cv-01641-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (18 in 1:12-cv-01644-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (18 in 1:12-cv-01639-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (20 in 1:12-cv-01643-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (18 in 1:12-cv-01642-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (18 in 1:12-cv-01640-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (19 in 1:12-cv-01645-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (19 in 1:12-cv-01646-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition by Clouding IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION re (20 in 1:12-cv-01643-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (18 in 1:12-cv-01642-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (18 in 1:12-cv-01641-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (18 in 1:12-cv-01640-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (18 in 1:12-cv-01644-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (19 in 1:12-cv-01645-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (19 in 1:12-cv-01646-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (18 in 1:12-cv-01639-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition /Declaration of William R. Carter, Jr. in Support of Clouding IP, LLC's Answering Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Inter Parties Review by Clouding IP LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                            ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Stay Pending the Outcome of Inter Partes Review filed by Clouding IP LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/28/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review to June 17, 2013 - filed by Clouding IP LLC, Gannett Co Inc., Dow Jones & Company, Inc., New York Times Company, Thomson Reuters Corp., West Services Inc., CNN Interactive Group Inc., TI Media Solutions Inc., Time Inc., Fox News Network LLC, TheHuffingtonPost.com Inc.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                OPENING BRIEF in Support re 15 MOTION to Stay Pending the Outcome of Inter Partes Review filed by Fox News Network LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/10/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to Stay Pending the Outcome of Inter Partes Review - filed by Gannett Co Inc., Dow Jones & Company, Inc., New York Times Company, Thomson Reuters Corp., West Services Inc., CNN Interactive Group Inc., TI Media Solutions Inc., Time Inc., Fox News Network LLC, TheHuffingtonPost.com Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dorian S. Berger - filed by Clouding IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Dorian S. Berger)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Jordan Kushner as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with the firm. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
                                        ANSWER to 9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Clouding IP LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                          Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Clouding IP LLC. (Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                            Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Fox News Network LLC identifying Corporate Parent News Corporation for Fox News Network LLC.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Clouding IP LLC by Fox News Network LLC.(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 11, 2013 - filed by Clouding IP LLC, Fox News Network LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jaspal S. Hare of Russ, August & Kabat - filed by Clouding IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Jaspal S. Hare)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc A. Fenster and Jordan Kushner - filed by Clouding IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Marc A. Fenster, # 2 Certification of Jordan Kushner)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                      Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Fox News Network, LLC to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 28, 2013 - filed by Clouding IP LLC, Fox News Network LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clouding IP LLC. Fox News Network LLC served on 12/6/2012, answer due 12/27/2012. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                          Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,925,481; 7,254,621;. (dzb, ) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzb, ) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                              COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Fox News Network LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1184753.) - filed by Clouding IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dzb, ) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 156 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?