American Civil Liberties Union v. United States
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 13-445

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 7:14 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3895 - Statutes: FOIA 1974
  Entries (109) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Permanent link to multimedia source cited in opinion, ATTACHED.[1319034] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 09/12/2014 04:06 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
    ERRATA ORDER, dated 08/25/2014, to implement additional revisions to the revised opinion filed June 23, 2014, as ordered by the opinions filed July 10, 2014, and August 11, 2014, denying the petition for rehearing (with respect to the bifurcated Vaughn index issues), the June 23, 2014, revised opinion is further revised, by JON, JAC, RSP, FILED.[1304033] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 08/25/2014 03:31 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
      JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1297823] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 08/18/2014 04:05 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
        ORDER, petition for rehearing en banc denied, FILED.[1297797] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 08/18/2014 03:53 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None
          SUPPLEMENTAL OPINION, PETITION FOR REHEARING DENIED, Supplemental request for additional redactions from the Vaughn index granted in part and denied in part; by JON, JAC, RSP, FILED.[1291146] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 08/11/2014 09:18 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
            LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Central Intelligence Agency, United States Department of Defense and United States Department of Justice, RECEIVED. Service date 07/28/2014 by CM/ECF.[1281201] [13-445] [Entered: 07/28/2014 04:41 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
              MOTION ORDER, granting motion for leave to submit ex parte and in camera, two supplemental declarations, one classified and privileged, in support of their pending petition for rehearing en banc [228] filed by Appellee United States Department of Justice, Appellee Central Intelligence Agency, United States Department of Defense and United States Department of Justice, by RAK, FILED. [1279999][235] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/25/2014 04:18 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
                OPPOSITION TO MOTION to file document [228], on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation in 13-422, 13-445, FILED. Service date 07/25/2014 by CM/ECF. [1279698][230] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/25/2014 01:00 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
                  MOTION, to file document, on behalf of Appellee United States Department of Justice in 13-422, Appellee Central Intelligence Agency, United States Department of Defense and United States Department of Justice in 13-445, FILED. Service date 07/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1278045] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/23/2014 07:24 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                    INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1275701] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/21/2014 03:07 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                      INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1275700] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/21/2014 03:07 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                        INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1275699] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/21/2014 03:06 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                          INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1275698] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/21/2014 03:06 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                            INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1275691] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/21/2014 03:04 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                              INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1275687] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/21/2014 03:04 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1275680] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/21/2014 03:01 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                  INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1275679] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/21/2014 03:00 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                    INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1275678] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/21/2014 03:00 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                      INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1275677] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/21/2014 02:59 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                        INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1275676] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/21/2014 02:59 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                          INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1275675] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/21/2014 02:59 PM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                            FINAL JUDGMENT, FILED.[1267906] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/10/2014 01:09 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                              ERRATA SHEET, for Opinion dated 06/23/2014, by JON, JAC, RSP, FILED.[1267627] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/10/2014 10:58 AM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                CERTIFIED OPINION, dated 07/10/2014, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[1267439] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/10/2014 09:46 AM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                  OPINION, PETITION FOR REHEARING DENIED, by JON, JAC, RSP, and the case is remanded, FILED.[1267386] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/10/2014 09:30 AM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                    ERRATA SHEET, for Opinion dated 06/23/2014, by JON, JAC, RSP, FILED.[1264792] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/07/2014 03:48 PM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                      ERRATA SHEET, for Opinion dated 06/23/2014, by JON, JAC, RSP, FILED.[1264787] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/07/2014 03:46 PM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                        PARTIAL JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1258683] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/26/2014 05:18 PM]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                          PARTIAL JUDGMENT, FILED.[1258681] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/26/2014 05:15 PM]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                            ORDER, dated 06/26/2014, In view of the bifurcation of issues, as explained in the Court’s June 23, 2014, opinion on the Government’s petition for rehearing, we now Order that a partial judgment be entered with respect to paragraph (3) of the “Conclusion” section of the Court’s June 23, 2014, revised opinion, and that with respect to this partial judgment, a partial mandate issue forthwith inasmuch as the Government has not sought further review of the requirement in paragraph (3) either in its petition for rehearing filed June 5, 2014, or in its supplementary papers to petition for rehearing filed June 20, 2014, by JON, JAC, RSP, FILED.[1258614] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/26/2014 04:33 PM]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                              REVISED NON- DISPOSITIVE OPINION, by JON, JAC, RSP, FILED.[1254659] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/23/2014 10:51 AM]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                OPINION, PETITION FOR REHEARING GRANTED to the extent that it requests relief concerning the OLC-DOD Memorandum, the revised version of our April 21 opinion filed today will include in Appendix A the OLC-DOD Memorandum as redacted by both our original redactions and the additional redactions now sought by the Government , by JON, JAC, RSP, FILED. [1254652] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/23/2014 10:49 AM]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO PETITION FOR REHEARING [187], on behalf of Appellee United States Department of Justice in 13-422, Appellee Central Intelligence Agency, United States Department of Defense and United States Department of Justice in 13-445, FILED. Service date 06/20/2014 by CM/ECF.[1253960][197] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/20/2014 03:17 PM]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Central Intelligence Agency, United States Department of Defense and United States Department of Justice, RECEIVED. Service date 06/20/2014 by CM/ECF.[1253624] [13-445] [Entered: 06/20/2014 11:57 AM]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      ORDER, dated 06/10/2014, we now direct the Appellees to notify the Court by noon on Friday, June 20, 2014, whether it has any objection to the filing of the proposed opinion on the rehearing petition and the proposed revision of the Court’s April 21 public opinion including the redacted OLC-DOD Memorandum, by JON, JAC, RSP, FILED.[1244121] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/10/2014 10:19 AM]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        CORRECTED ORDER, dated 06/06/2014, the parties will be notified by 5 p.m. Friday, June 13, 2014, whether oral argument on the Government’s petition for rehearing will be scheduled for Monday, June 23, 2014, by JON, JAC, RSP, FILED.[1242732] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/06/2014 04:54 PM]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          ORDER, dated 06/06/2014, parties will be notified by 5 p.m. Friday, June 13, 2014, whether oral argument on the Government’s petition for rehearing will be scheduled for Monday, June 20, 2014, by JON, JAC, RSP, FILED.[1242701] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/06/2014 04:35 PM]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC, on behalf of Appellee United States Department of Justice in 13-422, Appellee Central Intelligence Agency, United States Department of Defense and United States Department of Justice in 13-445, FILED. Service date 06/05/2014 by CM/ECF.[1241874] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/05/2014 07:19 PM]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION ORDER, denying motion to file a petition for rehearing ex parte and in camera, provided, however, that the Government may file ex parte and in camera those portions of its petition for rehearing (including supporting documents) that it believes in good faith require secrecy. [183] filed by Appellee United States Department of Justice in 13-422, by JON, JAC, RSP, FILED. [1235159][186] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 05/28/2014 04:10 PM]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION, for leave to file petition ex parte and in camera, on behalf of Appellee United States Department of Justice in 13-422, Appellee Central Intelligence Agency, United States Department of Defense and United States Department of Justice in 13-445, FILED. Service date 05/27/2014 by CM/ECF. [1234105] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 05/27/2014 08:48 PM]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1209299] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 04/24/2014 10:26 AM]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1208699] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 04/23/2014 02:41 PM]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1208697] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 04/23/2014 02:41 PM]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1208695] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 04/23/2014 02:41 PM]
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1208694] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 04/23/2014 02:40 PM]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            JUDGMENT, FILED.[1206297] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 04/21/2014 11:56 AM]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              CERTIFIED OPINION, dated 04/21/2014, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[1206124] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 04/21/2014 10:34 AM]
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                NEW CASE MANAGER, Connie Mazariego, ASSIGNED.[1206101] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 04/21/2014 10:22 AM]
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  OPINION, the district court judgment is affirmed in part, reversed in part and remanded, by JON, JAC, RSP, FILED.[1206062] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 04/21/2014 10:02 AM]
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    ORDER, dated 04/21/2014, granting Government's request for one additional redaction. The request to hold the opinion administratively for 30 days is denied as moot. The Government's request that its second response after an ex parte opportunity to review in camera the public opinion be filed under seal is granted. The Government's request for a third opportunity to review, ex parte and in camera, the public opinion before it is filed is denied, by JON, JAC, RSP, FILED.[1206058] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 04/21/2014 09:59 AM]
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      LETTER, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, RECEIVED. Service date 01/16/2014 by CM/ECF.[1136303] [13-445] [Entered: 01/16/2014 08:57 PM]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from DAVIS WRIGHT, with fee, RECEIVED.[1081741] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 11/01/2013 01:03 PM]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          POST ARGUMENT LETTER BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 10/30/2013 by CM/ECF. [1079359] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 10/30/2013 12:07 PM]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            MOTION ORDER, granting motion for permission to file an ex parte and in camera classified supplemental submission to address questions posed at oral argument [137] filed by Appellee United States Department of Justice, Appellee United States Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency and United States Department of Defense, by JAC, Circuit Judge, FILED. [1069888][149] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 10/18/2013 03:41 PM]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              LETTER, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, RECEIVED. Service date 10/18/2013 by CM/ECF.[1069511] [13-445] [Entered: 10/18/2013 12:19 PM]
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                OPPOSITION TO MOTION for leave to file ex parte and in camera classified supplemental submission, addressing questions posed at oral argument [137], on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 10/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [1065578][142] [13-422, 13-445]--[Edited 10/15/2013 by JT] [Entered: 10/15/2013 12:47 PM]
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION TO MOTION for leave to file ex parte and in camera classified supplemental submission, addressing questions posed at oral argument, [137], on behalf of Appellant Charlie Savage, Scott Shane and The New York Times Company, FILED. Service date 10/14/2013 by CM/ECF. [1064871][141] [13-422, 13-445]--[Edited 10/15/2013 by JT] [Entered: 10/14/2013 02:39 PM]
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION, for leave to file ex parte and in camera classified supplemental submission, addressing questions posed at oral argument, on behalf of Appellee United States Department of Justice in 13-422, Appellee Central Intelligence Agency, United States Department of Defense and United States Department of Justice in 13-445, FILED. Service date 10/10/2013 by CM/ECF. [1063680] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 10/10/2013 09:32 PM]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      POST ARGUMENT LETTER BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee United States Department of Justice in 13-422, Appellee Central Intelligence Agency, United States Department of Defense and United States Department of Justice in 13-445, FILED. Service date 10/10/2013 by CM/ECF. [1063660] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 10/10/2013 06:37 PM]
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER, dated 10/03/2013, regarding location of sealed documents, FILED. Before: Jon O. Newman, José A. Cabranes Rosemary Pooler, Circuit Judges.[1057455] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 10/03/2013 11:12 AM]
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Central Intelligence Agency, United States Department of Defense and United States Department of Justice, RECEIVED. Service date 09/10/2013 by CM/ECF, email.[1039666] [13-445] [Entered: 09/12/2013 02:31 PM]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LETTER, [124], on behalf of Appellee United States Department of Justice in 13-422, Appellee United States Department of Defense and United States Department of Justice in 13-445, FILED.[1039066] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 09/12/2013 09:48 AM]
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              LETTER, directing that the Government make available to each member of the panel documents for prompt in camera inspection, SENT.[1036202] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 09/09/2013 12:44 PM]
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION ORDER, granting motion for leave to file ex parte and in camera classified inserts, [76] filed by Appellee United States Department of Justice in 13-422, FILED. [1027520][122] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 08/27/2013 05:00 PM]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, FILED. Service date 08/21/2013 by CM/ECF. [1022530] [13-445] [Entered: 08/21/2013 01:45 PM]
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    **REVISED ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1017871] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 08/15/2013 03:19 PM]
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ARGUMENT, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1017817] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 08/15/2013 02:58 PM]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Colin Wicker, Esq. for Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF. [978902] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/28/2013 08:13 PM]
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. David Edward McCraw, Esq. for Appellant The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage and Scott Shane, FILED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF. [978893] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/28/2013 07:03 PM]
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF. [978863] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/28/2013 05:48 PM]
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Sarah Sheive Normand for Appellee United States Department of Justice in 13-422, Attorney Sarah Sheive Normand for Appellee United States Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency and United States Department of Defense in 13-445, FILED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF. [978862] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/28/2013 05:45 PM]
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Charlie Savage, Scott Shane and The New York Times Company, FILED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF. [978419] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/28/2013 02:10 PM]
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED MOTION ORDER, referring motion to file document [76] filed by Appellee United States Department of Justice, Appellee United States Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency and United States Department of Defense, by CFD, FILED. [977088][101] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/27/2013 12:27 PM]
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY TO OPPOSITION [85], [80], on behalf of Appellee United States Department of Justice in 13-422, Appellee Central Intelligence Agency, United States Department of Defense and United States Department of Justice in 13-445, FILED. Service date 06/25/2013 by CM/ECF.[975407][93] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/25/2013 09:29 PM]
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION ORDER, referring motion to file document [76] filed by Appellee United States Department of Justice, Appellee United States Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency and United States Department of Defense, by CFD, FILED. [973683][90] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/24/2013 04:00 PM]
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION TO MOTION to file document [76], on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 06/21/2013 by CM/ECF. [971728][85] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/21/2013 10:57 AM]
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION TO MOTION to file document [76], on behalf of Appellant Charlie Savage, Scott Shane and The New York Times Company, FILED. Service date 06/18/2013 by CM/ECF. [968712][80] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/18/2013 05:39 PM]
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            PAPERS, Classified Inserts to Brief for Defendants-Appellees for Filing In Camera and Ex Parte, RECEIVED.[968079] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/18/2013 11:56 AM]
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION, to file document, on behalf of Appellee United States Department of Justice in 13-422, Appellee Central Intelligence Agency, United States Department of Defense and United States Department of Justice in 13-445, FILED. Service date 06/14/2013 by CM/ECF. [966173] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/14/2013 10:30 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee United States Department of Justice in 13-422, Appellee Central Intelligence Agency, United States Department of Defense and United States Department of Justice in 13-445, FILED. Service date 06/14/2013 by US mail, CM/ECF. [966172] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 06/14/2013 10:26 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Electronic Privacy Information Center, FILED. Service date 04/24/2013 by CM/ECF. [917098] [13-422, 13-445]--[Edited 04/24/2013 by AJ]
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, FILED. Service date 04/19/2013 by CM/ECF. [913567] [13-422, 13-445]--[Edited 04/19/2013 by AJ]
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 04/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [907945] [13-422, 13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation in 13-445, FILED. Service date 04/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [907618] [13-445, 13-422]
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [52], on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation in 13-445, FILED.[907575] [13-422, 13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 3, (pp. 576-870), on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 04/15/2013 by CM/ECF.[907456] [13-422, 13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 3, (pp. 279-575), on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 04/15/2013 by CM/ECF.[907451] [13-422, 13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 3, (pp. 1-278), on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 04/15/2013 by CM/ECF.[907436] [13-422, 13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Charlie Savage, Scott Shane and The New York Times Company, FILED. Service date 04/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [907401] [13-422, 13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation in 13-445, FILED. Service date 04/12/2013 by CM/ECF. [906553] [13-422, 13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [43], [44], on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation in 13-445, FILED.[906237] [13-422, 13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED CAPTION PAGE, consolidated parties added, SENT.[899775] [13-422, 13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[899758] [13-445, 13-422]
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 03/08/2013 by CM/ECF. [869891] [13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 03/05/2013 by CM/ECF. [865082] [13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Brief due date as 04/15/2013;. Joint Appendix due date as 04/15/2013, FILED.[864430] [13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 03/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [862181] [13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, informing Court of proposed due date 04/15/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 03/01/2013 by CM/ECF.[861846] [13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Central Intelligence Agency, United States Department of Defense and United States Department of Justice, FILED. Service date 02/26/2013 by CM/ECF. [857689] [13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Central Intelligence Agency, United States Department of Defense and United States Department of Justice, FILED. Service date 02/26/2013 by CM/ECF. [857571] [13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[851407] [13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            FORM D, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union, FILED. Service date 02/19/2013 by CM/ECF.[849928] [13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM D, [12], on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED.[848643] [13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                FORM C, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 02/15/2013 by CM/ECF.[848334] [13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 02/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [848308] [13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Central Intelligence Agency, United States Department of Defense and United States Department of Justice, FILED. Service date 02/07/2013 by US mail, CM/ECF.[841329] [13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[841132] [13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/24/2013, RECEIVED.[841129] [13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. [841104] [13-445]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 67 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?