TCYK, LLC v. Does 1-9
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00536-JLG-NMK

Tags
Last Updated September 16, 2016 at 3:34 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014 Preliminary Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
        PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the June 2014 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Joinder of Parties and Motions to Amend due by 6/1/2014. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 3/26/2014. Primary Expert due by 11/15/2014. Rebuttal Expert due by 12/15/2014. Discovery due by 1/15/2015. Dispositive motions due by 3/15/2015. Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 7/10/2015 at 2:00 p.m. Jury trial set for 8/11/2015 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 228. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 3/19/2014. (pes1)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: 3/13/2014 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/13/2014. (cw)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: 3/12/2014 Rule 26(f) Report
            RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Beatrice Martinez. (Faroniya, Yousef)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: 3/12/2014 Stipulation
              STIPULATION Joint Stipulation as to Partial Dismissal of Defendant Dick Goldsmith Only by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Bass, Leon)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC re [19] Answer to Amended Complaint Partial Dismissal Order as to Defendant Dick Goldsmith Only (Bass, Leon)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: 2/12/2014 Answer to Amended Complaint
                  ANSWER to [11] Amended Complaint filed by Dick Goldsmith. (O'Reilly, Michael)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                    SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Dianna Parker. Dianna Parker served on 2/8/2014, answer due 3/3/2014. (pes1)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                      NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2014 @ 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King. (jr1)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Answer to Amended Complaint
                        ANSWER to [11] Amended Complaint filed by Beatrice Martinez. (Faroniya, Yousef)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                          SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Beatrice Martinez. Beatrice Martinez served on 1/24/2014, answer due 2/14/2014. (pes1)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                            SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Dick Goldsmith. Dick Goldsmith served on 1/23/2014, answer due 2/13/2014. (pes1)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Certificate of Clerk
                              CERTIFICATE of Clerk - certified mailing of summons and complaint via the Clerk's Office. (pes1)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Summons Issued
                                Summons Issued as to Dick Goldsmith, Beatrice Martinez, Dianna Parker. (pes1)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Amended Complaint
                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dick Goldsmith, Beatrice Martinez, Dianna Parker, filed by TCYK, LLC. (pes1)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: 9/17/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [9] Plaintiff's Motion to Effect Service of Process or Waiver of Service of Process by 1/31/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 9/17/2013. (er1)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                                      MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/31/2014. to Serve Summons and Complaint by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1) (Bass, Leon)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/3/2013 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
                                        OPINION AND ORDER denying [5] Defendant's Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 9/3/2013. (er1)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013 Related Case MemorandumCourt Filing
                                          RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:13-CV-525 and 2:13-cv-690 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Senior Judge James L Graham on 8/19/2013. (er1)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: 8/1/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [5] MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Doe A/K/A Beatrice T. Martinez's Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena filed by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Bass, Leon)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Motion to Quash
                                              MOTION to Quash or modify subpoena by Defendant John Does 1-9. (rew1)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [3] motion for discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 6/05/13. (rew)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 Motion for Discovery
                                                  Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Bass, Leon)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 3 motion for discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 6/05/13. (rew)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT For Copyright Infringement against John Does 1-9 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4131192), filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B) (Bass, Leon)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 168 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?