TCYK, LLC v. Does 1-47
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00539-GLF-NMK

Tags
Last Updated January 14, 2017 at 2:18 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David John Butler +1 614 221 2838 +1 614 221 2007 dbutler@taftlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity AG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leon David Bass +1 614 431 2277 +1 614 221 0554 ldb@lawbass.com
No Logo Margaret Ashburn, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Charles Ghent, Defendant
No Logo James Schweterman, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 19, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by clarkandlowe.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Keith Lowe +1 614 340 3895 +1 614 340 3434 david@clarkandlowe.com
No Logo John Does 1-47, Defendant
No Logo Margaret Ashburn, Defendant
No Logo Michiel Laarman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite B

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J O'Reilly +1 614 833 3777 +1 866 257 8939 michael@oreillylawyers.com
No Logo TCYK, LLC, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Judgment - Default
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Status Report Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                            Notice of Mediation Conference: Mediator R Leland Evans to conduct Settlement Week Conference on 6/9/2014 at 09:00 AM. (jr1) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER re 36 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal TCYK, LLC. The Court deems the notice as a motion filed pursuant to Rule 21 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The motion to voluntarily dismiss the claims against defendant James Schweterman is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/15/2014. (pes1) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to James Schweterman, Only (Bass, Leon) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Default Judgment against Charles Ghent by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. Responses due by 5/27/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                    Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Charles Ghent (pes1) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                      Application to Clerk for entry of default against Charles Ghent . (Bass, Leon) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the June 2014 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Joinder of Parties due by 7/1/2014. Motions to Amend due by 7/1/2014. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 4/9/2014. Primary Expert due by 11/15/2014. Rebuttal Expert due by 1/15/2015. Discovery due by 2/15/2015. Dispositive motions due by 3/31/2015. Final Pretrial Conference ready by 7/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 3/26/2014. (pes1) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J O'Reilly for Defendant Michiel Laarman (O'Reilly, Michael) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J O'Reilly for Defendant Michiel Laarman (O'Reilly, Michael) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: 3/20/2014 Rule 26(f) Report
                                              RULE 26(f) REPORT of Parties by Counter Defendant TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Bass, Leon)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014 Rule 26(f) Report
                                                RULE 26(f) REPORT by Counter Claimant Margaret Ashburn, Defendant Margaret Ashburn. (O'Reilly, Michael)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: 3/12/2014 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                  ANSWER to [11] Amended Complaint filed by Michiel Laarman. (pes1)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: 3/11/2014 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                    Defendant's ANSWER to [11] Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against TCYK, LLC filed by Margaret Ashburn. (O'Reilly, Michael)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: 3/4/2014 Stipulation
                                                      STIPULATION Second Joint Stipulation As to Response Date to Amended Complaint by Defendant Margaret Ashburn. (O'Reilly, Michael)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                        NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2014 @ 2:30 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King. (jr1)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: 2/19/2014 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                          Summons Returned Unexecuted as to James Schweterman. (pes1)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: 2/18/2014 Stipulation
                                                            STIPULATION Joint Stipulation As to Response Date to Amended Complaint by Defendant Margaret Ashburn. (O'Reilly, Michael)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [20] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [11] Amended Complaint. Michiel Laarman answer due 3/14/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 2/14/2014. (pes1)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [11] Amended Complaint by Defendant Michiel Laarman. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (pes1)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 Certificate of Clerk
                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Clerk - regular mailing of summons and amended complaint via the Clerk's Office on defendant James Schweterman. (pes1)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 Summons Issued
                                                                    Summons Issued as to James Schweterman. (pes1)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Charles Ghent. Charles Ghent served on 1/28/2014, answer due 2/18/2014. (pes1)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Margaret Ashburn. Margaret Ashburn served on 1/27/2014, answer due 2/18/2014. (pes1)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                          Summons Returned Unexecuted as to James Schweterman. (pes1)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Michiel Laarman. Michiel Laarman served on 1/23/2014, answer due 2/13/2014. (pes1)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Certificate of Clerk
                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Clerk - certified mailing of summons and complaint via the Clerk's Office. (pes1)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Summons Issued
                                                                                Summons Issued as to Margaret Ashburn, Charles Ghent, Michiel Laarman, James Schweterman. (pes1) Modified on 1/21/2014 (pes1).
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Amended Complaint
                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against Margaret Ashburn, Charles Ghent, Michiel Laarman, James Schweterman, filed by TCYK, LLC. (pes1) Modified on 1/21/2014 (pes1).
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: 9/17/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [9] Plaintiff's Motion in which to demonstrate effective service of process or waiver of service of process by 1/31/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 9/17/2013. (er1)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/31/2014. to Serve Summons and Complaint by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1) (Bass, Leon)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                        OPINION AND ORDER denying [5] Defendant Doe No. 19's Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 9/9/2013. (er1)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [5] MOTION to Quash FOR DOE 19 Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Doe 19's Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena filed by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Bass, Leon)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: 8/8/2013 Related Case MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                            RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:13-cv-525 & 2:13-cv-535 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Algenon L. Marbley for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Judge Gregory L. Frost on 8/8/2013. (er1)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: 7/22/2013 Motion to Quash
                                                                                              MOTION to Quash FOR DOE 19 by Defendant John Does 1-47. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit EXHIBIT A, # (2) Exhibit EXHIBIT B, # (3) Exhibit EXHIBIT C, # (4) Exhibit EXHIBIT D, # (5) Exhibit EXHIBIT E) (Lowe, David)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting [3] Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 6/05/13. (rew)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013, Terminated: 6/5/2013 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                  Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Bass, Leon)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 3 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 6/05/13. (rew)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 Complaint
                                                                                                        COMPLAINT For Copyright Infringement against John Does 1-47 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4131258), filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet) (Bass, Leon)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 127 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?