Edwards et al v. Raymond et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-07165
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 1, 2016 at 2:18 AM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Mitch Moses, Plaintiff
No Logo Vince McClean, Plaintiff
No Logo Zacharia L. Edwards, Plaintiff

Represented by Voelker Litigation Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tricia Lynn Putzy +1 312 870 5424 tputzy@voelkerlitigationgroup.com
Space Daniel John Voelker +1 312 870 5430 +1 312 870 5420 dvoelker@voelkerlitigationgroup.com
v.
No Logo Andre Harris, Defendant
No Logo Arista Records Inc., Defendant
No Logo Dirty Dre Music, Defendant
No Logo Double Oh Eight, Defendant
No Logo EMI April Music, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hitco Music Publishing, LLC, Defendant

Represented by GoodSmith Gregg & Unruh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rachel L. Broyles +1 312 322 1981 rbroyles@ggulaw.com
Space D. R. Edwards +1 312 322 1981 dredwards@ggulaw.com
Space Kenneth S. GoodSmith +1 312 322 1981 kgoodsmith@ggulaw.com

Represented by Law Offices of Ivan L Kallick

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Jacobs +1 212 790 4500 +1 212 790 4545 rjacobs@manatt.com
Space Jeremy Ross Lacks +1 212 790 4500 +1 212 790 4545 jlacks@manatt.com
No Logo Jason Boyd, Defendant
No Logo Music of Windswept, Defendant
No Logo Pladis Music, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Poo B Z Publishing, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ryan Toby, Defendant
No Logo Universal Music Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carletta Flora Higginson +1 212 891 1624 +1 212 891 1699 chigginson@jenner.com
Space Christopher B. Lay +1 312 840 7295 +1 312 527 0484 clay@jenner.com
Space David P. Sanders +1 312 222 9350 dsanders@jenner.com
No Logo Usher Terry Raymond IV, Defendant

Represented by Jonathan D.Davis, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan David Davis +1 212 687 5464 +1 212 557 0565 Jdd@Jddavispc.com

Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Doehring +1 312 372 2000 +9847 984 984 7700 adoehring@mwe.com
Space Steven S. Scholes +1 312 372 2000 +1 312 984 7700 sscholes@mwe.com
No Logo Vidal Davis, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 501
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Timeline
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur: Pursuant to the parties' joint stipulation of dismissal, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. All pending motions 49 , 54 are denied as moot. Status hearing set for 8/12/2013 is vacated. Civil case terminated. Mailed and telephoned notice by judge's staff. (srb,) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal [Joint] Without Prejudice (Doehring, Amy) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur: On the parties' oral motion, status hearing set for 8/6/2013 is stricken. The status hearing set for 8/12/2013 at 9:00 a.m. to stand. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur: Motion hearing held on 8/1/2013. Defendant Usher T. Raymonds' motion to dismiss the first amended complaint or to transfer the case to the Southern District of New York 49 and Defendant Universal Music Corp's joinder in the motion to dismiss or to transfer 54 are entered and continued to 8/6/2013 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by David P. Sanders for presentment of motion for joinder 54 before Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/1/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Sanders, David) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Universal Music Corporation for joinder In The Motion To Dismiss The First Amended Complaint Or Transfer To The Southern District Of New York And Supporting Memorandum Of Law By Defendant Usher Raymond, IV (Sanders, David) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT by Jonathan D. Davis in Support of MOTION by Defendant Usher Terry Raymond IV to transfer case Defendant Usher Raymond IV's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint or to Transfer to the Southern Distrect of New York 49 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Scholes, Steven) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 7/29/2013) (np, ). (Entered: 07/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Usher Terry Raymond IV in Support of MOTION by Defendant Usher Terry Raymond IV to transfer case Defendant Usher Raymond IV's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint or to Transfer to the Southern Distrect of New York 49 (Scholes, Steven) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Usher Terry Raymond IV in support of motion to transfer case 49 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Usher Raymond IV's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint or to Transfer to the Southern District of New York (Scholes, Steven) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Steven Samuel Scholes for presentment of motion to transfer case 49 before Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/1/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Scholes, Steven) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Usher Terry Raymond IV to transfer case Defendant Usher Raymond IV's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint or to Transfer to the Southern Distrect of New York (Scholes, Steven) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur: Jonathan D. Davis' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 44 is granted. Defendant Usher Raymond IV's motion for leave to file a memorandum in support of his motion to dismiss in excess of fifteen pages 46 is granted. Defendant's memorandum should not exceed 30 pages. No appearance necessary. Mailed and telephoned notice by judge's staff. (srb,) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Amy Graham Doehring for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 46 before Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/25/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Doehring, Amy) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Usher Terry Raymond IV for leave to file excess pages Memorandum in Support of His Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Doehring, Amy) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Amy Graham Doehring for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice 44 before Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/25/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Doehring, Amy) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-8562036. Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan D. Davis (Doehring, Amy) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
ORDER Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/12/2013. (mgh, ) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
ORDER: Enter Order setting aside default and securing proper party's appearances. [For further details see separate order(s).] (mgh, ) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur: The parties' agreed motion for an order setting aside default and securing proper party's appearance 36 is granted. No appearance necessary on 7/12/2013. Draft order to follow. Robert A. Jacobs' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 39 and Jeremy R. Lacks' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 40 are granted. Mailed and telephoned notice by judge's staff. (srb,) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-8528048. (Lacks, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-8525690. (Jacobs, Robert) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
Local Rule 3.2 Disclosure of BMG Management (US) LLC by Hitco Music Publishing, LLC (GoodSmith, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth S. GoodSmith for presentment of motion to set aside default 36 before Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/12/2013 at 09:15 AM. (GoodSmith, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Hitco Music Publishing, LLC to set aside default (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(GoodSmith, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hitco Music Publishing, LLC by Rachel L. Broyles (Broyles, Rachel) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hitco Music Publishing, LLC by D. R. Edwards (Edwards, D.) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hitco Music Publishing, LLC by Kenneth S. GoodSmith (GoodSmith, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur: Motion hearing held on 7/1/2013. Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to amend/correct complaint and file first amended complaint instanter 27 is granted. Defendants are ordered to file responsive pleading to the amended complaint on or before 7/29/2013. Plaintiffs' motion for a default order as to defendant Hitco Music Publishing, LLC 29 is granted, and default is hereby entered against that defendant. Status hearing set for 7/18/2013 is stricken and reset to 8/12/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur: Carletta F. Higginson's motion to appear pro hac vice 18 is granted. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Daniel John Voelker for presentment of motion for default judgment 29 before Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/1/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Voelker, Daniel) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiffs Zacharia L. Edwards, Vince McClean, Mitch Moses for default judgment as to Hitco Music Publishing, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Voelker, Daniel) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Daniel John Voelker for presentment of motion to amend/correct 27 before Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/1/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Voelker, Daniel) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiffs Zacharia L. Edwards, Vince McClean, Mitch Moses to amend/correct Complaint and File First Amended Complaint Instanter (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Voelker, Daniel) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
AMENDED Answer by Universal Music Corporation to complaint 1 (Sanders, David) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Universal Music Corporation by David P. Sanders (Sanders, David) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Doehring, Amy) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Usher Terry Raymond IV by Amy Graham Doehring (Doehring, Amy) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Usher Terry Raymond IV by Steven Samuel Scholes (Scholes, Steven) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mitch Moses, Zacharia L. Edwards, Vince McClean as to Usher Terry Raymond IV on 4/8/2013, answer due 4/29/2013. (Putzy, Tricia) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 6/5/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur: Enter Memorandum Order. Universal Music's entire existing answer to the complaint is stricken. Universal is ordered to file a self-contained amended answer on or before 6/19/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-8406738. (Higginson, Carletta) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint by Universal Music Corporation(Lay, Christopher) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Universal Music Corporation (Lay, Christopher) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Universal Music Corporation by Christopher B. Lay (Lay, Christopher) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur: Status hearing held on 5/24/2013 and continued to 7/18/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Putzy, Tricia) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur: Status hearing held on 4/15/2013 and continued to 5/24/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Mitch Moses, Zacharia L. Edwards, Vince McClean as to Arista Records, Inc.. (Putzy, Tricia) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mitch Moses, Zacharia L. Edwards, Vince McClean as to Hitco Music Publishing, LLC on 3/28/2013, answer due 4/18/2013. (Putzy, Tricia) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mitch Moses, Zacharia L. Edwards, Vince McClean as to Universal Music Corporation on 3/28/2013, answer due 4/18/2013. (Putzy, Tricia) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Putzy, Tricia) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur: Status hearing held on 1/29/2013 and continued to 4/15/2013 at 9:00 A.M. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur:Status hearing held on 10/30/2012. Status hearing set for 1/29/2013 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur: Status hearing set for 10/30/2012 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Zacharia L. Edwards, Vince McClean, Mitch Moses by Tricia Lynn Putzy (Putzy, Tricia) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Zacharia L. Edwards, Vince McClean, Mitch Moses by Daniel John Voelker (Voelker, Daniel) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
CIVIL Cover Sheet (Voelker, Daniel) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
COMPLAINT filed by Mitch Moses, Zacharia L. Edwards, Vince McClean; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-7528555. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Voelker, Daniel) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 6/5/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 127 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?