Drimal v. Makol et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-00717-WWE

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 12, 2017 at 11:05 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Arlene Villamia Drimal, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Adrian Busby, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiggin & Dana LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James I. Glasser +1 203 498 4313 JGlasser@wiggin.com
Space Daniel E Goren +1 203 498 4318 +1 203 782 2889 dgoren@wiggin.com
No Logo Brian Harkins, Defendant
No Logo Christopher DeGraff, Defendant
No Logo David J. Ford, Defendant
No Logo David Makol, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle Lynn McConaghy +1 203 821 3700 +1 203 773 5373 michelle.mcconaghy@usdoj.gov
Space David Christopher Nelson +1 860 947 1101 +1 860 760 7979 David.C.Nelson@usdoj.gov
No Logo Edmund Rom, Defendant
No Logo Frank Lomonaco, Defendant
No Logo Jan Trigg, Defendant
No Logo Joann Maguire, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Riordan, Defendant
No Logo Maria A. Font, Defendant
No Logo Mark Munster, Defendant
No Logo Martha M. Berdote, Defendant
No Logo Pauline Tai, Defendant
No Logo S. Mendoza-Penaherrera, Defendant
No Logo Dickstein Shapiro LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Thomas J. D'Amico"
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1343
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Reopen Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER 41(b: The parties have reported that this action has been settled in full. Rather than continue to keep the case open on the docket, the Clerk is directed to administratively close the file immediately, without prejudice to reopening by any party on or before February 6, 2017. If the parties wish to file a stipulation of dismissal, they may do so on or before February 6, 2017. The dates set forth in this order may be extended for good cause, upon a motion filed in accordance with Local Rule 7(b). Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/6/2017.(LaMura, K.) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER; The parties are excused from filing a case management report pursuant to FRCP 26. However, the parties are instructed to file a joint status report within 30 days of this order if the case has not yet settled. re 50 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Frank Lomonaco, Edmund Rom, David J. Ford Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/6/2016.(LaMura, K.) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              26(f) NOTICE: The Court has reviewed the file in this case to monitor the parties compliance with Local Rule 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) provides that, within 30 days after the appearance of any defendant, the attorneys of record and any unrepresented parties must confer for purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) further provides that, within 14 days after the conference, the participants must jointly file a report of the conference using Form 26(f). It appears that more than forty four days have passed since the appearance of a defendant in this case but no report has been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the parties must file on or before : December 16, 2016, (1) a written statement signed by all counsel of record demonstrating that this case is exempt from the requirement of filing a form 26(f) report; or (2) a form 26(f) report along with a written statement signed by all counsel of record explaining why sanctions should not be imposed for the parties failure to comply with Local Rule 26(f). Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the complaint. Signed by Clerk on 12/2/2016.(LaMura, K.) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ANSWER to 38 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by David J. Ford, Frank Lomonaco, Edmund Rom.(McConaghy, Michelle) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 47 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Dismiss, 43 Motion to Dismiss. All claims against defendants Makol, Trigg, Tai, Riordan, Busby, Harkins, Maguire, Font, Berdote, DAmico, Munster, DeGraff, and Mendoza-Penaherrera are dismissed based upon qualified immunity. Plaintiff has withdrawn her constitutional claims. Plaintiff's state statutory claim is dismissed. Plaintiff's federal statutory claims remain as to defendants LoMonaco, Rom, and Ford. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 7/6/16. (Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/21/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 39 40 Motions for Extension of Time until October 30, 2015 to respond to amended complaint. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 9/9/2014. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER dismissing complaint without prejudice to repleading consistent with the Second Circuit's mandate. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by August 28, 2015. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/7/15.(Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                          MANDATE of USCA dated July 22, 2015 Remanding 32 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kevin Riordan, Jan Trigg, Martha M. Berdote, David J. Ford, Christopher DeGraff, Thomas J. D'Amico, Joann Maguire, Frank Lomonaco, Edmund Rom, S. Mendoza-Penaherrera, Mark Munster, David Makol, Maria A. Font, Pauline Tai, Brian Harkins, 33 Notice of Appeal filed by Adrian Busby (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                            Index to Record on Appeal by Adrian Busby re 33 Notice of Appeal, 28 Reply to Response to Motion, 32 Notice of Appeal, 1 Complaint, 19 MOTION to Dismiss, 7 Summons Returned Executed,,,, 26 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 30 Reply to Response to Motion, 8 Summons Returned Executed,,,,,,, 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, 29 Response, 31 Order on Motion to Dismiss,. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court to arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Glasser, James) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                              Index to Record on Appeal by Martha M. Berdote, Thomas J. D'Amico, Christopher DeGraff, Maria A. Font, David J. Ford, Brian Harkins, Frank Lomonaco, Joann Maguire, David Makol, S. Mendoza-Penaherrera, Mark Munster, Kevin Riordan, Edmund Rom, Pauline Tai, Jan Trigg re 32 Notice of Appeal, 28 Reply to Response to Motion, 1 Complaint, 19 MOTION to Dismiss, 7 Summons Returned Executed,,,, 26 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 30 Reply to Response to Motion, 8 Summons Returned Executed,,,,,,, 33 Notice of Appeal, 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, 29 Response, 31 Order on Motion to Dismiss,. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court to arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Nelson, David) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 31 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by Adrian Busby. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0205-2961248. (Glasser, James) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 31 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by Martha M. Berdote, Thomas J. D'Amico, Christopher DeGraff, Maria A. Font, David J. Ford, Brian Harkins, Frank Lomonaco, Joann Maguire, David Makol, S. Mendoza-Penaherrera, Mark Munster, Kevin Riordan, Edmund Rom, Pauline Tai, Jan Trigg. (McConaghy, Michelle) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER denying 19 Motion to Dismiss; denying 21 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 6/6/13. (Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                      REPLY to Response to 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Adrian Busby. (Glasser, James) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                        RESPONSE re 28 Reply to Response to 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Martha M. Berdote, Thomas J. D'Amico, Christopher DeGraff, Maria A. Font, David J. Ford, Brian Harkins, Frank Lomonaco, Joann Maguire, David Makol, S. Mendoza-Penaherrera, Mark Munster, Kevin Riordan, Edmund Rom, Pauline Tai, Jan Trigg, filed by Arlene Villamia Drimal. (Williams, John) Modified on 2/5/2013 to link to underlying motion(Perez, J.). (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                          REPLY to Response to 19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Martha M. Berdote, Thomas J. D'Amico, Christopher DeGraff, Maria A. Font, David J. Ford, Brian Harkins, Frank Lomonaco, Joann Maguire, David Makol, S. Mendoza-Penaherrera, Mark Munster, Kevin Riordan, Edmund Rom, Pauline Tai, Jan Trigg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McConaghy, Michelle) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E Goren on behalf of Adrian Busby (Goren, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 19 MOTION to Dismiss, 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Arlene Villamia Drimal. (Williams, John) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint until January 21, 2013, by Arlene Villamia Drimal. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/17/12. (Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint until January 21, 2013, by Arlene Villamia Drimal. (Williams, John) (Entered: 12/16/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 19 MOTION to Dismiss until January 21, 2013, by Arlene Villamia Drimal. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/11/12. (Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 19 MOTION to Dismiss until January 21, 2013, by Arlene Villamia Drimal. (Williams, John) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Adrian Busby.Responses due by 12/17/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Glasser, James) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting 18 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 26, 2012 to Respond to 1 Complaint by Adrian Busby. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/20/12. (Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss by Martha M. Berdote, Thomas J. D'Amico, Christopher DeGraff, Maria A. Font, David J. Ford, Brian Harkins, Frank Lomonaco, Joann Maguire, David Makol, S. Mendoza-Penaherrera, Mark Munster, Kevin Riordan, Edmund Rom, Pauline Tai, Jan Trigg.Responses due by 12/11/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Unreported Cases)(McConaghy, Michelle) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until November 26, 2012 to Respond to Complaint 1 Complaint by Adrian Busby. (Glasser, James) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER denying 16 Motion for Extension of Time for failure to comply with Local Rule 7(b). Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/16/12. (Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until November 26, 2012 (Nunc Pro Tunc) To Respond To 1 Complaint by Adrian Busby. (Glasser, James) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by James I. Glasser on behalf of Adrian Busby (Glasser, James) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by David Christopher Nelson on behalf of Martha M. Berdote, Thomas J. D'Amico, Christopher DeGraff, Maria A. Font, David J. Ford, Brian Harkins, Frank Lomonaco, Joann Maguire, David Makol, S. Mendoza-Penaherrera, Mark Munster, Kevin Riordan, Edmund Rom, Pauline Tai, Jan Trigg in addition to the appearances already on file (Nelson, David) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until November 23, 2012 to Respond to the 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/5/12. (Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until November 23, 2012 to Respond to the 1 Complaint by Brian Harkins, Frank Lomonaco, Joann Maguire, David Makol, S. Mendoza-Penaherrera, Mark Munster, Kevin Riordan, Edmund Rom. (McConaghy, Michelle) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until October 8, 2012 to Respond to the 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/23/12. (Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until October 8, 2012 to Respond to the 1 Complaint by Martha M. Berdote, Adrian Busby, Thomas J. D'Amico, Christopher DeGraff, Maria A. Font, David J. Ford, Brian Harkins, Frank Lomonaco, Joann Maguire, David Makol, S. Mendoza-Penaherrera, Mark Munster, Kevin Riordan, Edmund Rom, Pauline Tai, Jan Trigg. (McConaghy, Michelle) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Lynn McConaghy on behalf of Martha M. Berdote, Adrian Busby, Thomas J. D'Amico, Christopher DeGraff, Maria A. Font, David J. Ford, Brian Harkins, Frank Lomonaco, Joann Maguire, David Makol, S. Mendoza-Penaherrera, Mark Munster, Kevin Riordan, Edmund Rom, Pauline Tai, Jan Trigg (McConaghy, Michelle) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arlene Villamia Drimal. Martha M. Berdote served on 6/25/2012, answer due 7/16/2012; Adrian Busby served on 6/25/2012, answer due 7/16/2012; Thomas J. D'Amico served on 6/25/2012, answer due 7/16/2012; Christopher DeGraff served on 6/25/2012, answer due 7/16/2012; Maria A. Font served on 6/25/2012, answer due 7/16/2012; David J. Ford served on 6/25/2012, answer due 7/16/2012; Brian Harkins served on 6/25/2012, answer due 7/16/2012; Frank Lomonaco served on 6/25/2012, answer due 7/16/2012; Joann Maguire served on 6/25/2012, answer due 7/16/2012; David Makol served on 6/25/2012, answer due 7/16/2012; S. Mendoza-Penaherrera served on 6/25/2012, answer due 7/16/2012; Mark Munster served on 6/25/2012, answer due 7/16/2012; Kevin Riordan served on 6/25/2012, answer due 7/16/2012; Edmund Rom served on 6/25/2012, answer due 7/16/2012; Pauline Tai served on 6/25/2012, answer due 7/16/2012; Jan Trigg served on 6/25/2012, answer due 7/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Makol-Summons, # 2 Makol-Marshal's Return, # 3 Trigg-Summons, # 4 Trigg-Marshal's Return, # 5 Riordan-Summons, # 6 Riordan-Marshal's Return, # 7 Maguire-Summons, # 8 Maguire-Marshal's Return, # 9 Lomonaco-Summons, # 10 Lomonaco-Marshal's Return, # 11 Harkins-Summons, # 12 Harkins-Marshal's Return, # 13 Ford-Summons, # 14 Ford-Marshal's Return, # 15 Font-Summons, # 16 Font-Marshal's Return, # 17 DeGraff-Summons, # 18 DeGraff-Marshal's Return, # 19 D'Amico-Summons, # 20 D'Amico-Marshal's Return, # 21 Busby-Summons, # 22 Busby-Marshal's Return, # 23 Berdote-Summons, # 24 Berdote-Marshal's Return, # 25 Tai-Summons, # 26 Tai-Marshal's Return, # 27 Munster-Summons, # 28 Munster-Marshal's Return, # 29 Rom-Summons, # 30 Rom-Marshal's Return, # 31 S.Mendoza-Penaherrera-Summons, # 32 S.Mendoza-Penaherrera-Marshal's Return)(Williams, John) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arlene Villamia Drimal. Martha M. Berdote served on 5/22/2012, answer due 6/12/2012; Adrian Busby served on 5/22/2012, answer due 6/12/2012; Thomas J. D'Amico served on 5/22/2012, answer due 6/12/2012; Christopher DeGraff served on 5/22/2012, answer due 6/12/2012; Maria A. Font served on 5/22/2012, answer due 6/12/2012; David J. Ford served on 5/22/2012, answer due 6/12/2012; Brian Harkins served on 5/22/2012, answer due 6/12/2012; Frank Lomonaco served on 5/22/2012, answer due 6/12/2012; Joann Maguire served on 5/22/2012, answer due 6/12/2012; David Makol served on 5/22/2012, answer due 6/12/2012; S. Mendoza-Penaherrera served on 5/22/2012, answer due 6/12/2012; Mark Munster served on 5/22/2012, answer due 6/12/2012; Kevin Riordan served on 5/22/2012, answer due 6/12/2012; Edmund Rom served on 5/22/2012, answer due 6/12/2012; Pauline Tai served on 5/22/2012, answer due 6/12/2012; Jan Trigg served on 5/22/2012, answer due 6/12/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Summons', Et Al, # 2 Marshals' Returns)(Williams, John) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Martha M. Berdote, Adrian Busby, Thomas J. D'Amico, Christopher DeGraff, Maria A. Font, David J. Ford, Brian Harkins, Frank Lomonaco, Joann Maguire, David Makol, S. Mendoza-Penaherrera, Mark Munster, Kevin Riordan, Edmund Rom, Pauline Tai, Jan Trigg* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John R. Williams* *51 Elm St., Ste. 409* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 1 Complaint filed by Arlene Villamia Drimal, 4 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Notice of Appearance filed by John R. Williams on behalf of Arlene Villamia Drimal, 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 5/15/2012. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/15/2012. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 8/15/2012. Amended Pleadings due by 7/14/2012. Discovery due by 11/14/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 12/14/2012. Signed by Clerk on 5/15/2012. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Arlene Villamia Drimal (Williams, John) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER denying 19 Motion to Dismiss; denying 21 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 6/6/13. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 0205-2499050.), filed by Arlene Villamia Drimal.(Williams, John) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 230 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?