PHL Variable Insurance Company v. Buck

Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-00774
District Judge Janet C. Hall, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Janet C. Hall
Last Updated October 9, 2016 at 8:25 AM EDT (8.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo PHL Variable Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Represented by Loughlin Fitzgerald, P.C.-Wallingford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Glen Pierson +1 203 265 2035 +1 203 269 3487 gpierson@lflaw.com
v.
No Logo Maureen A. Buck, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Timeline
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/1/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Affidavit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ENTERED IN ERROR ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 05/30/2013.(Lynch, K.) Modified on 5/31/2013 (Lynch, K.). (Entered: 05/31/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Maureen A. Buck* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *W. Glen Pierson* *Loughlin Fitzgerald, P.C.-Wallingford* *150 South Main Street* *Wallingford, CT 06492*. (Torrenti, R.) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 1 Complaint filed by Phoenix Life Insurance Company, 4 Electronic Filing Order, 5 Standing Protective Order, 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, Signed by Clerk on 5/30/13.(Torrenti, R.) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/30/13.(Torrenti, R.) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/30/13.(Torrenti, R.) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 8/30/13. Amended Pleadings due by 7/29/2013 Discovery due by 11/29/2013 Dispositive Motions due by 12/29/2013 Signed by Clerk on 5/30/13.(Torrenti, R.) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by PHL Variable Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Phoenix Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent PM Holdings, Inc. for PHL Variable Insurance Company. (Pierson, W.) Modified on 5/30/2013 to add Corporate Parent Phoenix Companies, Inc. (Lynch, K.). (Entered: 05/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Maureen A. Buck ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-2894021.), filed by PHL Variable Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Pierson, W.) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 101 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?