Kenneth Taggart v. Norwest Mtg Inc, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 12-4311

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 8, 2016 at 6:29 PM EDT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3371 - TORTS-Truth in Lending
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011431593 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
MANDATE ISSUED., filed. (DW)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011423349 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER (MCKEE, Chief Judge, SMITH and SLOVITER, Circuit Judges) denying Petition for Panel Rehearing filed by Appellant Kenneth J. Taggart., filed. SLOVITER, Authoring Judge. (DW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011406066 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
      ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing motion is construed as a motion for leave to file petition for rehearing out of time. So construed, the motion is granted with filing as of September 30, 2013., filed. (DW)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011404457 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
        ECF FILER: Petition filed by Appellant Kenneth J. Taggart for Rehearing before Original Panel. Certificate of Service dated 09/30/2013. (MBW)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011400870 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
          ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant Kenneth J. Taggart for Extension of Time to file Move for Panel Rehearing until/for 14 days. Certificate of Service dated 09/26/2013. (MBW)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 003011387449 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: MCKEE, SMITH and SLOVITER, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 5. Judge: SLOVITER Authoring. The District Court considered all of Taggart's claims with exhaustive care, and we perceive no error. We will affirm the grant of judgment in favor of the defendants. (DW)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011387456 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
              JUDGMENT, Affirmed. Costs taxed to the Appellant. (DW)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011365363 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
              Submit Notification for Thursday, 09/12/2013. (CMH)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011307246 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellant Kenneth J. Taggart, filed. Certificate of Service dated 06/27/2013 by US mail, ECF. (MBW)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011293207 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                  ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Matthew B. Weisberg, Esq. for Appellant Kenneth J. Taggart. Certificate of Service dated 06/14/2013. (MBW)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011292043 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
                    Calendared for Thursday, 09/12/2013. (CMH)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011239168 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                      ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing motion is granted in part and denied in part. The request for a 60 day extension of time is granted, as it is noted that counsel for Appellant was recently retained. Appellant's reply brief must be filed and served on or before June 28, 2013. The request to file via ECF only is denied. An original and nine (9) hard copies of the reply brief must be filed for the convenience of the Court. It is noted that Appellant's pro se opening brief was filed in hard copy only as pro se litigants are not required to file electronically., filed. (DW)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011230225 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                        ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew B. Weisberg, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Kenneth Taggert. (MBW)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011230692 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                          ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant Kenneth J. Taggart for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief until/for 60 days and to be Excused from filing hard copies of the reply brief. Certificate of Service dated 04/17/2013.--[Edited 04/17/2013 by DW] (MBW)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011229629 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                            ORDER (Clerk) granting Motion by Appellees for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix with filing as of April 10, 2013, filed. [See attachment for complete text] (EAF)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 003011224122 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                              ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellees Deutsche Bank National Trust Co, Norwest Mortgage Inc and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc, filed. Certificate of Service dated 04/10/2013 by US mail. (JEL)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011224172 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellees Deutsche Bank National Trust Co, Norwest Mortgage Inc and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc to supplement the appendix. Certificate of Service dated 04/10/2013. (JEL)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 003011224208 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                  ECF FILER: SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellees Deutsche Bank National Trust Co, Norwest Mortgage Inc and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc, filed. Certificate of service dated 04/10/2013 by US mail. (JEL)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 003011193504 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                    PRO SE BRIEF with Volume I of appendix attached on behalf of Appellant Kenneth J. Taggart, filed. Pages: 26, Certificate of Service dated 03/11/2013 by hand delivery. (KEL)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011139959 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                      ORDER (Clerk) granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief and Appendix filed by Appellant Kenneth J. Taggart. 03/11/2013. Appellant's brief and appendix must be filed and served on or before March 11, 2013., filed. (DW)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011138336 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
                                        MOTION filed by Appellant Kenneth J. Taggart for a Thirty (30) Day Extension of Time to File Brief and Appendix . Response due on 01/28/2013. Certificate of Service dated 01/15/2013. (DW)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011118800 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                          BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Appendix due on or before 02/08/2013.. Brief on behalf of Appellant Kenneth J. Taggart due on or before 02/08/2013. (DW)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011116581 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                            ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Blank Rome LLP on behalf of Appellee(s) Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as successor in interest to Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc., and as successor in interest to Norwest Mortgage, Inc., and on behalf of co-appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (JEL)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011116585 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                              ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees Deutsche Bank Natl Trust Co, Norwest Mortgage Inc and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc, filed. (JEL)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011106121 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                FOLLOW UP LETTER to John E. Lucian, Esq. and Gregory F. Vizza, Esq. for Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc, Norwest Mortgage Inc and Deutsche Bank Natl Trust Co requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 01/02/2013. Disclosure Statement due on or before 01/02/2013. (DW)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011090573 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                  CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Kenneth J. Taggart in District Court No. 2-09-cv-01281. (DW)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 111 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?