TCYK, LLC v. Does 1-69
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-03844

Tags
Last Updated September 18, 2016 at 8:53 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Hierl +1 312 580 0100 mhierl@hsplegal.com
Space Todd Sheldon Parkhurst +1 312 604 2626 +1 312 604 2729 tparkhurst@hsplegal.com
v.
No Logo Does 1-69, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 1, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 12, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #2, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 29, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 3, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 34, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 38, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by THE RUSSELL FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erin Kathryn Russell +1 312 994 2424 +1 312 706 9766 erin@russellfirmchicago.com
No Logo John Doe 42, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 52, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by THE RUSSELL FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Kathryn Russell +1 312 994 2424 +1 312 706 9766 erin@russellfirmchicago.com
No Logo JOHN DOE 14, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, 16, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 18, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 23, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, 33, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, 35, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, 36, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #39, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 4, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, 41, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 44, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 46, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, 48, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, 50, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, 55, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 64, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, 69, Defendant
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: 2/19/2014 status hearing
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Status hearing held on 2/19/2014 and continued to 4/21/2014 at 08:30 AM.Mailed notice (kef, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: 2/12/2014 text entry
    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Pursuant to plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal [42], doe defendants nos. 1 and 3 are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Mailed notice (kef, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Doe Defendants (Hierl, Michael)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 text entry
        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Pursuant to plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal [40], doe defendant no. 23 is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Mailed notice (kef, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defendant No. 23 (Hierl, Michael)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/15/2014 status hearing
            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Status hearing held on 1/15/2014 and continued to 2/19/2014 at 08:30 AM.Mailed notice (kef, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: 1/14/2014 text entry
              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Pursuant to plaintiff's notices of voluntary dismissal [35][36][37], doe defendant nos. 36, 46 and 33 are dismissed without prejudice. Mailed notice (kef, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Doe Defendant No. 33 (Hierl, Michael)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: 12/6/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defendant No. 46 (Hierl, Michael)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defendant No. 36 (Hierl, Michael)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: 11/19/2013 text entry
                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Pursuant to plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal [30], doe defendant nos. 4, 14, 35, 39, 48, 55 and 69 are dismissed without prejudice. Pursuant to plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal [33], doe defendants nos. 16 and 52 are dismissed with prejudice. Mailed notice (kef, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: 11/19/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Doe Defendants (Hierl, Michael)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: 11/18/2013 status hearing
                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Status hearing held on 11/18/2013 and continued to 1/15/2014 at 08:30 AM.Mailed notice (kef, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: 11/18/2013 Attorney Appearance
                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Doe 52 by Erin Kathryn Russell (Russell, Erin)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Certain Doe Defendants (Hierl, Michael)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013 text entry
                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Pursuant to plaintiff's notices of voluntary dismissal [27][28], all causes of action against Doe Defendants Nos.41 and 50 are dismissed with prejudice. Mailed notice (kef, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defendant No. 50 (Hierl, Michael)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 27 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defendant No. 41 (Hierl, Michael)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 status hearing
                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Status hearing held on 9/24/2013 and continued to 11/18/2013 at 08:30 AM.Mailed notice (kef, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: 9/12/2013 Add and Terminate Parties
                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Pursuant to plaintiff's notices of voluntary dismissals [21][24], all causes of action against Doe Defendants No. 2, 12, 18, 29, 38, 42, 44 and 64 are dismissed with prejudice. Mailed notice (kef, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: 9/11/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defendant No. 64 (Hierl, Michael)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: 8/27/2013 Order on Motion to Quash
                                            ORDER Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/27/2013: The Court denies Defendant John Doe #65's motion to quash [18]. [For further details, see attached Order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: 8/23/2013 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                              MEMORANDUM by TCYK, LLC in Opposition to motion to quash[18] Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Quash Subpoena Filed by Doe No. 65 (Dkt. No. 18) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: 8/23/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Doe Defendants (Hierl, Michael)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: 8/14/2013 Order on Motion to Quash
                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Because a general denial of liability is not a valid basis for quashing a subpoena under Federal Rule of Procedure 45(c), the Court denies Defendant Doe #33's motion to quash or vacate the subpoena [13].Mailed notice (kef, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: 8/14/2013 Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Defendant John Doe's motion to quash the subpoena [18] is entered. Response by 8/23/13. Mailed notice (kef, )
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: 8/13/2013 Motion to Quash
                                                      MOTION by John Doe to quash subpoena. (Exhibits) (ea, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: 8/12/2013 Attorney Appearance
                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants John Doe 12, John Doe 29, John Doe 42 by Erin Kathryn Russell (Russell, Erin)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: 8/8/2013 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                          MEMORANDUM by TCYK, LLC in Opposition to motion to quash[13] Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Quash or Vacate Subpoena Filed by Doe No. 33 (Dkt. No. 13) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: 8/2/2013 Attorney Appearance
                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Doe 38 by Erin Kathryn Russell (Russell, Erin)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: 7/25/2013 status hearing
                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Status hearing held on 7/25/2013 and continued to 9/24/2013 at 08:30 AM. Defendant Doe 33's motion to quash or vacate [13] is entered. Response by 8/8/13. Mailed notice (kef, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013 Motion to Quash
                                                                PROTECTIVE Motions by Defendant Doe 33 to quash or vacate subpoena. (tlm)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: 7/2/2013 Status Report
                                                                  STATUS Report Initial Status Report by TCYK, LLC (Hierl, Michael)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 notification of affiliates pursuant to local rule 3.2
                                                                    NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Hierl, Michael)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: 6/13/2013 Order on Motion for Discovery
                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Plaintiff's motion for leave to take discovery prior to Rule 26(f) conference [7] is granted. Plaintiff is given leave to issue subpoenas under Rule 45 to the Internet Service Providers who provided internet services to any of the Doe Defendants identified by an Internet Protocol address to obtain information sufficient to identify each Doe Defendant by name, current and permanent addresses, telephone number, email address and Medial Access control number. Joint status report deadline is stricken. Status hearing set for 7/9/13 is stricken and reset to 7/25/13 at 8:30 a.m. No appearance is required on the 6/20/13 notice date. Mailed notice (kef, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: 6/12/2013 Notice of Motion
                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery[7] before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/20/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: 6/12/2013 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                          MEMORANDUM by TCYK, LLC in support of motion for discovery[7] Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-E)(Hierl, Michael)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: 6/12/2013 Motion for Discovery
                                                                          MOTION by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC for discovery Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings:Court Filing
                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Initial status hearing set for 7/9/13 at 8:30 a.m. in courtroom 1241. Parties shall refer to Judge St. Eve's web page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov and file a joint status report by 7/3/13 as set forth in the Initial Status Conferences procedure. Mailed notice (kef, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: 5/24/2013 Patent/Trademark Report
                                                                              MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (tg, )
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: 5/23/2013 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: 5/23/2013 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: 5/23/2013 civil cover sheet
                                                                                    CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: 5/23/2013 Complaint
                                                                                      COMPLAINT filed by TCYK, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8377391. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-B)(Hierl, Michael)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 125 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?