Elf-Man, LLC. v. Doe
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-03884

Tags
Last Updated September 19, 2016 at 3:20 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Elf-Man, LLC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Hierl +1 312 580 0100 mhierl@hsplegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Sheldon Parkhurst +1 312 604 2626 +1 312 604 2729 tparkhurst@hsplegal.com
v.
No Logo Doe, Defendant
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014 Patent/Trademark Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/15/2014 Terminate Hearings
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: 1/9/2014 status hearing
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: 12/6/2013 status hearing
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013 status hearing
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 status hearing
              MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer:Status hearing held. Defendant not present. Plaintiff awaiting response to subpoena. Status hearing set for 10/23/2013 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (gel, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: 7/9/2013 Order on Motion for Discovery
                MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 7/9/2013. Motion for lave to take discovery prior to Rule26(f) conference [8] granted. Status hearing set for 8/15/2013 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: 7/3/2013 Notice of Motion
                  NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery[8] before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/9/2013 at 08:45 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: 7/3/2013 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                    MEMORANDUM by Elf-Man, LLC. in support of motion for discovery[8] Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: 7/3/2013 Motion for Discovery
                      MOTION by Plaintiff Elf-Man, LLC. for discovery Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 6/20/2013 status hearing
                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 6/20/2013. Status hearing set for 7/9/2013 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 Patent/Trademark Report
                          MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (tg, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 Set/Reset Hearings
                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing set for 6/20/2013 at 09:30 AM, courtroom 2119. Mailed notice (etv, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: 5/24/2013 Attorney Appearance
                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ELF-MAN LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: 5/24/2013 Attorney Appearance
                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ELF-MAN LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: 5/24/2013 civil cover sheet
                                  CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: 5/24/2013 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT filed by ELF-MAN LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8381893. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-B)(Hierl, Michael)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 111 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?