State of Vermont v. MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Vermont District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00170-wks
District Judge William K. Sessions III, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 17, 2017 at 2:53 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo State of Vermont, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Vermont Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bridget C. Asay +1 802 828 3181 basay@atg.state.vt.us
Space Ryan G. Kriger ,. +1 802 828 3171 +1 802 828 2154 rkriger@atg.state.vt.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Naomi Sheffield +1 802 828 6906 +1 802 828 2154 naomi.sheffield@state.vt.us
Space Naomi Sheffield +1 802 828 6906 +1 802 828 2154 naomi.sheffield@state.vt.us
v.
No Logo MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Farney And Daniels

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W Bryan Farney +1 512 282 2828 +1 512 582 2829 bfarney@farneydaniels.com
Space Cassandra L. Klingman ,. +1 512 582 2829 +1 512 582 2828 cklingman@farneydaniels.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gravel & Shea

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew D. Manitsky ,. +1 802 658 0220 amanitsky@gravelshea.com
Space Andrew D. Manitsky ,. +1 802 658 0220 amanitsky@gravelshea.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Office Burlington
Filed 6/7/2013
Jury Demand None
Demand
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Washington
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 282-5-13 Wncv[Vermont Superior Court, Washington Unit, Civil Div]
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ENE0
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED Index on Appeal Federal Circuit 14-137 Lead; 14-1481 Member re: 64 Notice of Appeal. (gmg) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 64 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF APPEAL re: 61 Opinion and Order by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC (Farney, W.) Link added on 5/14/2014 (jlh). (Entered: 05/13/2014)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
      LETTER forwarding case file to Vermont Superior Court, Washington Unit, Civil Division. (law) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
        WITHDRAWAL of 53 Motion for Summary Judgment by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farney, W.) Text clarified on 4/24/2014 (jlh) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 61 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          OPINION AND ORDER granting 9 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 4/14/2014. (law) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
            REPLY to Response to 45 CONDITIONAL MOTION to Clarify and/or Amend 6 Complaint filed by State of Vermont. (Sheffield, Naomi) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
              RESPONSE in Opposition re 54 MOTION for Consideration Before Any Discretionary Remand of the State's Amended Complaint to State Court re: 53 for Summary Judgment Under Rules 12(d) & 56 filed by State of Vermont. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Sheffield, Naomi) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                MOTION to Stay Briefing re 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment Under Rules 12(d) & 56 filed by State of Vermont. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Sheffield, Naomi)Text clarified on 4/15/14 (jlh) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                  REPLY to Response to 52 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farney, W.) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 52 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by State of Vermont. (Sheffield, Naomi) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/6/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: 52 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC. At the time of docketing exhibits were combined into one image. The images have been broken apart and are now attached to 52 , and are also attached to this entry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit A-3) (law) (Entered: 04/06/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Consideration Before Any Discretionary Remand of the State's Amended Complaint to State Court re: 53 for Summary Judgment Under Rules 12(d) & 56 filed by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farney, W.) Event/text/attachment description clarified on 4/4/2014 (law). (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Summary Judgment Under Rules 12(d) & 56 filed by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Farney, W.) Attachment descriptions clarified on 4/4/2014 (law). (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farney, W.) (Attachment 1 replaced and Additional attachment(s) added on 4/6/2014: # 3 Exhibit A-1, # 4 Exhibit A-2, # 5 Exhibit A-3) (law). (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                              MEMORANDUM by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC in opposition of 45 CONDITIONAL MOTION to Clarify and/or Amend 6 Complaint . (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farney, W.) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: 3/18/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 2/25/2014 before Judge Sessions. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne Pierce, Telephone number 802-860-2227. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 4/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/19/2014. (jam)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: 3/12/2014 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time for Filing Response to [45] CONDITIONAL MOTION to Clarify and/or Amend [6] Complaint. Response due by 4/4/2014. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 3/11/2014. (law)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: 3/11/2014 Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF)
                                    NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: [46] Reply to Response to [38] Motion for Sanctions filed by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC. Exhibit A has been replaced to remove a double pdf header. The corrected document is now attached to [46] as well as this entry. (jlh)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014, Terminated: 3/10/2014 Not a motion, filed in error
                                      STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [45] CONDITIONAL MOTION to Clarify and/or Amend [6] Complaint filed by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC.(Manitsky, Andrew) Event/Text clarified on 3/10/2014 (jlh).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
                                        REPLY to Response to [38] MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11, 28 U.S.C. § 1927, and the Court's Inherent Authority filed by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Certificate of Service)(Manitsky, Andrew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/11/2014) (jlh).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                          CONDITIONAL MOTION to Clarify and/or Amend [6] Complaint filed by State of Vermont. (Attachments: # (1) Redline of Proposed Amended Complaint, # (2) Proposed Amended Complaint)(Sheffield, Naomi) Text clarified on 3/10/2014 (jlh).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Status Report
                                            STATUS REPORT by State of Vermont. (Sheffield, Naomi)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF)
                                              NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: [42] Transcript Request filed by State of Vermont. The document was in edit mode and has been replaced on the docket. The corrected document is now attached to [42] as well as this entry. (jlh)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: 2/27/2014 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by State of Vermont for proceedings held on 02/25/2014 before Judge William K. Sessions, III. (Asay, Bridget) (Main Document 42 replaced on 2/28/2014) (jlh).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: 2/27/2014 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC for proceedings held on 2/25/2014 before Judge Sessions. (Manitsky, Andrew)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                    MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge William K. Sessions III: Motion Hearing on All Pending Motions held on 2/25/2014. Bridget Asay, Esq., Naomi Sheffield, Esq. & Ryan Kriger, Esq. present for pltf; Andrew Manitsky, Esq., Bryan Farney, Esq. & Matthew Stern, Esq. present for dft. Statements by counsel. Pltf given 10 days to determine if they wish to file an Amended Complaint and/or for ptys to engage in settlement negotiations. (Court Reporter: Pierce) (jam)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: 2/21/2014 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [38] MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11, 28 U.S.C. § 1927, and the Court's Inherent Authority filed by State of Vermont. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment1, # (2) Attachment 2, # (3) Attachment 3)(Sheffield, Naomi) Attachment names clarified on 2/24/2014 (jlh).
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 38 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Motion for Sanctions
                                                        MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11, 28 U.S.C. § 1927, and the Court's Inherent Authority filed by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Certificate of Service)(Manitsky, Andrew)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: 1/14/2014 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                        REVISED NOTICE of Hearing re: [32] COMBINED MOTION for Leave to Present New Authority Relevant to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and in Surreply to that Motion, [23] MOTION for Leave to File Subsequent Authority as to [20] MOTION to Stay Briefing and Decision on Defendant's [16] Motion to Dismiss, [9] MOTION to Remand , [16] MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction , [20] MOTION to Stay Briefing and Decision on Defendant's [16] Motion to Dismiss. Motion Hearing reset for 2/25/2014 01:30 PM in Burlington Courtroom 542 before Judge William K. Sessions III.(jam)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                          NOTICE of Hearing re: [32] COMBINED MOTION for Leave to Present New Authority Relevant to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and in Surreply to that Motion, [23] MOTION for Leave to File Subsequent Authority as to [20] MOTION to Stay Briefing and Decision on Defendant's [16] Motion to Dismiss, [9] MOTION to Remand , [16] MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction , [20] MOTION to Stay Briefing and Decision on Defendant's [16] Motion to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2014 01:30 PM in Burlington Courtroom 542 before Judge William K. Sessions III.(jam)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                            REPLY to Response to [32] COMBINED MOTION for Leave to Present New Authority Relevant to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and in Surreply to that Motion filed by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Farney, W.)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [32] COMBINED MOTION for Leave to Present New Authority Relevant to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and in Surreply to that Motion filed by State of Vermont. (Sheffield, Naomi)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                              REPLY to Response to [16] MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Certificate of Service)(Farney, W.)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None Motion for Leave to File
                                                                COMBINED MOTION for Leave to Present New Authority Relevant to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and in Surreply to that Motion filed by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Certificate of Service)(Farney, W.)(jlh). Event corrected on 11/6/2013 (jlh).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [30] Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cassandra Klingman. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/24/13. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/24/2013 Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice
                                                                  MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Cassandra Klingman, Esq. filed by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Certificate of Service)(jlh)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                    REPLY to Response to [9] MOTION to Remand filed by State of Vermont. (Sheffield, Naomi)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [26] Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of W. Bryan Farney. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/18/13. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [16] MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by State of Vermont. (Sheffield, Naomi)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Order on Motion to Exceed Page LimitCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [24] Stipulated Motion to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/17/13. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice
                                                                            MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of W. Bryan Farney filed by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Certificate of Service)(jlh)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/17/2013 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                                                                              STIPULATED MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit re: [9] MOTION to Remand filed by State of Vermont.(Asay, Bridget) Link added on 10/16/2013 (jlh).
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Subsequent Authority as to [20] MOTION to Stay Briefing and Decision on Defendant's [16] Motion to Dismiss filed by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Certificate of Service)(Manitsky, Andrew)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF)
                                                                                  NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: [21] Response in Opposition to [20] Motion to Stay Briefing and Decision on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC. The incorrect document was uploaded at the time of the filing and has been replaced on the docket. The correct document is now attached to [21] as well as this entry. (jlh)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [20] MOTION to Stay Briefing and Decision on Defendant's [16] Motion to Dismiss filed by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Manitsky, Andrew) (Main Document 21 replaced on 10/9/2013) (jlh).
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Motion to Stay
                                                                                    MOTION to Stay Briefing and Decision on [16] Motion to Dismiss filed by State of Vermont.(Sheffield, Naomi) Link added on 9/30/2013 (jlh)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Order on Motion to Exceed Page LimitCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [17] Stipulated Motion to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 09/19/13. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [9] MOTION to Remand filed by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Declaration of J. Mac Rust, # (14) Certificate of Service)(Manitsky, Andrew)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/19/2013 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                                                                                          STIPULATED MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit re: Memorandum in Opposition re: [9] MOTION to Remand filed by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Manitsky, Andrew) Text clarified, link added on 9/18/2013 (jlh).
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of J. Mac Rust, # (2) Certificate of Service)(Manitsky, Andrew)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time for Filing Opposition: Response due by 9/18/213 and Reply due by 10/22/2013 re: [9] MOTION to Remand . Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 9/3/2013. (law)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Filing Defendant's Opposition to [9] MOTION to Remand by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC., State of Vermont. (Manitsky, Andrew) Filer, link added on 8/30/2013 (law).
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Naomi Sheffield on behalf of State of Vermont(Sheffield, Naomi)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan G. Kriger, Esq on behalf of State of Vermont(Kriger, Ryan)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time for Filing Opposition to [9] MOTION to Remand . Response due by 9/11/2013. Reply due by 10/11/2013. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 7/25/2013. (law)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                        STIPULATION re [9] MOTION to Remand for Extension of Time for Filing Defendant's Opposition by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC., State of Vermont (Manitsky, Andrew) Filer added on 7/25/2013 (jlh).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None Motion to Remand
                                                                                                          MOTION to Remand filed by State of Vermont. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support)(Asay, Bridget)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                          NOTICE by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC of Filing of [1] Notice of Removal. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Removal, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B) (originally filed 6/10/2013 in state court)(law)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Summons (re: complaint) Returned Executed
                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC served on 5/20/2013, answer due 6/10/2013. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service) (originally filed 6/4/2013 in state court)(law)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC filed by State of Vermont. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (originally filed 5/8/2013 in state court)(law)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None File Received from State Court
                                                                                                            RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (law)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [3] Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 06/13/13. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/13/2013 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC, State of Vermont.(Manitsky, Andrew) Filer added on 6/14/2013 (jlh).
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                  LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Washington Unit, Civil Division requesting original case file and certified docket sheet. (law)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MPHJ Technology Investments, LLC from Vermont Superior Court, Washington Unit, case number 282-5-13 Wncv. ( Filing fee $ 400) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Certificate of Service, # (4) Civil Cover Sheet)(law)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 1,074 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?