Thomas v. American Service Finance Corpo
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 13-2282

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 22, 2016 at 12:45 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Charles Thomas, FILED. Service date 06/13/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail.[964806] [13-2282]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
    FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Charles Thomas, FILED. Service date 06/13/2013 by CM/ECF.[964132] [13-2282]
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
      ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Charles Thomas, FILED. Service date 06/11/2013 by CM/ECF.[962193] [13-2282]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
        ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[961940] [13-2282]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5
          ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[961940] [13-2282]
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
            PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Charles Thomas, district court receipt # 4653059651, FILED.[961935] [13-2282]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4
              PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Charles Thomas, district court receipt # 4653059651, FILED.[961935] [13-2282]
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/14/2013, RECEIVED.[961929] [13-2282]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3
                  DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/14/2013, RECEIVED.[961929] [13-2282]
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                    DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/07/2013, RECEIVED.[961925] [13-2282]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2
                      DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/07/2013, RECEIVED.[961925] [13-2282]
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Charles Thomas, FILED. [961919] [13-2282]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1
                          NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Charles Thomas, FILED. [961919] [13-2282]
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 5 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?