TCYK, LLC v. Does 1-17
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00535-GLF-TPK

Tags
Last Updated September 16, 2016 at 9:10 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David John Butler +1 614 221 2838 +1 614 221 2007 dbutler@taftlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity AG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leon David Bass +1 614 431 2277 +1 614 221 0554 ldb@lawbass.com
v.
No Logo Grady Evans, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-17, Defendant
No Logo Rocca Petrozzi, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Clerk - certified mailing of summons and amended complaint via the Clerk's Office. (pes1) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
    Summons Issued as to Grady Evans, Rocca Petrozzi. (pes1) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
      AMENDED COMPLAINT against Grady Evans, Rocca Petrozzi, filed by TCYK, LLC. (pes1) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 7 Plaintiff's Motion in which to demonstrate effective service of process or waiver of service of process by 1/31/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 9/17/2013. (er1) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
          MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/31/2014. to Serve Summons and Complaint by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Bass, Leon) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:13-cv-525 & 2:13-cv-539 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Judge Gregory L. Frost on 8/8/2013. (er1) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
              Letter to Leon David Bass from C T Corporation (kk2) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 6/12/2013. (kk2) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
                  Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Bass, Leon) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 6/12/2013. (kk2)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
                        COMPLAINT For Copyright Infringement against John Does 1-17 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4131151), filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B) (Bass, Leon) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 135 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?