TCYK, LLC v. Does 1-10
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00534-MHW-TPK

Tags
Last Updated September 17, 2016 at 1:30 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Judgment - Default
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
          NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/2/2014 @ 2:30 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King. (jr1)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: 2/21/2014 Answer to Amended Complaint
            ANSWER to [13] Amended Complaint filed by Gordon Foraker (kk2)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Summons Returned Executed
              SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Gordon Foraker. Gordon Foraker served on 1/31/2014, answer due 2/21/2014. (pes1)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Jonathan Elliot. Jonathan Elliot served on 1/24/2014, answer due 2/14/2014. (pes1)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Certificate of Clerk
                  CERTIFICATE of Clerk - certified mailing of summons and amended complaint via the Clerk's Office. (pes1)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Summons Issued
                    Summons Issued as to Jonathan Elliot, Gordon Foraker, Bonnie Shackleford. (pes1)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Amended Complaint
                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jonathan Elliot, Gordon Foraker, Bonnie Shackleford, filed by TCYK, LLC. (pes1)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: 9/17/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [11] Plaintiff's Motion in which to demonstrate effective service of process or waiver of service of process by 1/21/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 9/17/2013. (er1)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                          MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/21/2014. to Serve Summons and Complaint by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1) (Bass, Leon)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
                            ORDER striking [6] John Doe #1's Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 9/3/2013. (er1)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [6] MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to and Motion to Strike Doe 1's Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena filed by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Bass, Leon)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: 8/8/2013 Related Case MemorandumCourt Filing
                                RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:13-cv-525 and 2:13-cv-688 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Judge Michael H. Watson on 8/8/2013. (er1)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER - Within 10 days, the Doe defendant who filed document #6 shall submit an identical document which contains information required by Rule 11(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 7/29/2013. (sln1)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: 7/23/2013 Motion to Quash
                                    ***STRICKEN, per order [10]*** MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena by Defendant John Doe #1. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (er1)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: 6/12/2013 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [3] Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 6/12/2013. (kk2)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: 6/6/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                        NOTICE by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC re [1] Complaint Exhibit A to the Complaint: Copyright Registration Certificate (Bass, Leon)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 Motion for Discovery
                                          Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Bass, Leon)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 6/12/2013. (kk2)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT For Copyright Infringement against John Does 1-10 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4131050), filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B) (Bass, Leon)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 113 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?