USA v. CALHOUN
Criminal Case District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:13-cr-00173
District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 23, 2016 at 6:59 PM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo LEE A. CALHOUN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edward B MacMahon Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Edward B. MacMahon +1 540 687 3902 +1 540 687 6366 ebmjr@macmahon-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PO Box 25

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward B. MacMahon +1 540 687 3902 +1 540 687 6366 ebmjr@macmahon-law.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 57 Motion for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Aid of Sentencing as to LEE A. CALHOUN (1). Government's Memorandum in Aid of Sentencing due by 7/1/2016. The sentencing hearing in this matter shall remain scheduled for 7/8/2016, as previously ordered. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/24/16. (dot) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None
    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Aid of Sentencing by USA as to LEE A. CALHOUN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hooks, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 56 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None
      SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by LEE A. CALHOUN (MacMahon, Edward) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None
        Recommendation of PSI Report as to LEE A. CALHOUN prepared by SrUSPO Kathie McGill. re 54 Final Presentence Investigation Report Not for public disclosure per Judicial Conference Policy.(McGill, Kathie) (Entered: 03/25/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER as to LEE A. CALHOUN: U.S. Probation Department shall finalize and file the Pre-Sentence Report for the defendant by no later than 3/25/2016. Parties' Sentencing Memorandum due by 6/24/2015. Sentencing set for 7/8/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/17/15. (dot) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
            NOTICE Joint Proposed Sentencing Schedule by USA as to LEE A. CALHOUN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hooks, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER as to LEE A. CALHOUN. By no later than FRIDAY, DECEMBER 18, 2015, the parties shall file notice with the Court setting forth the order in which they seek to sequence the sentencing hearings in the instant action as well as the related actions referenced in this Order. Moreover, the parties shall file a proposed schedule for the following: the due date for Presentence Report; the due date for the Government's Memorandum in Aid of Sentencing; and the due date for the Defendant's Memorandum in Aid of Sentencing. The parties shall also propose dates for setting the Sentencing Hearing in this matter, bearing in mind that the Court will set the hearing at least two weeks after briefing is complete and will likely schedule the hearing on a Friday. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 11, 2015. (NS) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
                Consent MOTION to Vacate Status Hearing by USA as to LEE A. CALHOUN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hooks, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Waiver of Appearance at Status Conference by LEE A. CALHOUN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacMahon, Edward) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 46 Motion to Continue the Status hearing scheduled for 11/12/2015 as to LEE A. CALHOUN (1). Status Conference rescheduled for 12/16/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/9/15. (dot) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
                      Consent MOTION to Continue Status Hearing by USA as to LEE A. CALHOUN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hooks, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 44 Motion to Continue the status hearing scheduled to take place on 9/10/2015 as to LEE A. CALHOUN (1). Status Conference re-set for 11/12/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/3/15. (dot) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                          Consent MOTION to Continue Status Hearing by USA as to LEE A. CALHOUN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hooks, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 42 Motion to Continue Status Hearing as to LEE A. CALHOUN (1); and it is further ORDERED, that the status hearing scheduled to take place in this matter at 12:00 p.m. on May 21, 2015, is hereby continued until 9/11/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/15/15. (gdf) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                              Consent MOTION to Continue Status Hearing by USA as to LEE A. CALHOUN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Atkinson, Michael) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 40 Motion to Continue as to LEE A. CALHOUN (1): Status Conference set for 5/21/2015 12:00 PM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/19/15. (dot ) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                  Consent MOTION to Continue Status Hearing by USA as to LEE A. CALHOUN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hooks, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 38 Motion to Amend Terms and Conditions of Release as to LEE A. CALHOUN (1). Defendant's passport is to be returned to him and he is permitted to travel freely with prior notice to pre-trial services. The request to amend the terms and conditions of the defendant's release to report to pre-trial services is amended to once a month instead of once a week. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/14/14. (dot ) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None
                                      Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Terms and Conditions of Release by LEE A. CALHOUN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacMahon, Edward) (Entered: 10/09/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting 36 Motion to Continue Status Hearing as to LEE A. CALHOUN (1) :Status Conference set for 2/27/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/2/14. (dot ) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None
                                          Consent MOTION to Continue Status Hearing by LEE A. CALHOUN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacMahon, Edward) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by USA as to LEE A. CALHOUN (Wernick, Ephraim) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jonathan P. Hooks appearing for USA. (Hooks, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Michael K. Atkinson appearing for USA. (Atkinson, Michael) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR.....TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to LEE A. CALHOUN before Judge Richard J. Leon held on 3-5-13; Page Numbers: 1-18-. Date of Issuance:8-4-14. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa, Telephone number 202-354-3269, Court Reporter Email Address : L4dori@hotmail.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/25/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2014.(Foradori, Lisa) Modified on 8/7/2014 (hsj, ). (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to LEE A. CALHOUN before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on 6-20-13; Page Numbers: 1-79. Date of Issuance:8-4-14. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa M. Foradori, Telephone number 202-354-3269, Court Reporter Email Address : L4dori@hotmail.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/25/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2014.(Foradori, Lisa) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 29 Motion to Continue the Status Hearing as to LEE A. CALHOUN (1) currently set for 7/30/2014. Status Conference reset for 10/24/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/17/14. (dot ) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Consent MOTION to Continue Status Hearing by LEE A. CALHOUN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacMahon, Edward) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 27 Consent MOTION to Continue Status Hearing as to LEE A. CALHOUN (1); This matter came before the Court on the Defendant's Revised Consent Motion to Continue Status Hearing. It appearing to the Court that the government consents to the entry of this order, and for other good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: That the status hearing in this case currently set for April 30, 2014, be and is hereby continued until July 30, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/10/2014. (tcb) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Consent MOTION to Continue Status Hearing by LEE A. CALHOUN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacMahon, Edward) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Consent MOTION to Continue Status Hearing by LEE A. CALHOUN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacMahon, Edward) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 24 Motion to Amend Conditions of Release to Allow Travel Outside of the United States as to LEE A. CALHOUN (1). Defendant is allowed to travel to Mexico from May 1 through May 8, 2014. Mr. Calhoun's Probation Office shall return Mr. Calhoun's United States passport to Mr. Calhoun so that he may travel to Mexico. Unpon his return, Mr. Calhoun shall promptly return his United States passport (within 48 hours) to his Probation Officer. All other terms and conditions of Calhoun's release remain unmodified. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/18/14. (dot ) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Terms of Conditions of Release to Allow Travel Outside the United States by LEE A. CALHOUN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacMahon, Edward) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 22 Motion to Continue as to LEE A. CALHOUN (1): the status hearing in this case currently set for March 19, 2014, be and is herby continued until April 30,2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/10/14. (dot ) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      Consent MOTION to Continue Status Hearing by LEE A. CALHOUN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacMahon, Edward) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 20 Motion to Continue as to LEE A. CALHOUN (1):Status Conference set for 3/19/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/4/13. (dot ) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          Consent MOTION to Continue Status Hearing by LEE A. CALHOUN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacMahon, Edward) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 18 Emergency Consent Motion to Amend Terms of Conditions of Release to Allow Travel Within the United States as to LEE A. CALHOUN (1). Accordingly, the Defendant is hereby permitted to travel to Atlanta, Georgia on October 26 through October 27, 2013. All other terms and conditions of Mr. Calhoun's release remain unmodified. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 25, 2013. (SM) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct Terms of Conditions of Release to Allow Travel Within the United States by LEE A. CALHOUN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacMahon, Edward) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 16 Consent Motion to Amend the Conditions of his Release to Allow Travel Within the United States as to LEE A. CALHOUN (1). Defendant is allowed to travel to New Orleans, Louisiana from October 17 through 22, 2013, and travel with family to Orlando, Florida and Pompano Beach, Florida from December 14 through December 18, 2013. All other terms and conditions of Calhoun's release remain unmodified. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/7/13. (dot ) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Terms of Conditions of Release to Allow Travel Within the United States by LEE A. CALHOUN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacMahon, Edward) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 14 Motion to Continue as to LEE A. CALHOUN (1): The status hearing in this case currently set for 9/26/2013, be and is hereby continued. Status Conference reset for 12/18/2013 12:00 PM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/12/13. (dot ) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      Consent MOTION to Continue Status Hearing by LEE A. CALHOUN. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(MacMahon, Edward) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER FOR ROUTINE PROCESSING as to LEE A. CALHOUN. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/2013. (dot ) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to LEE A. CALHOUN (1) Personal Recognizance. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/20/13. (dot ) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            WAIVER of Right to Trial by Jury as to LEE A. CALHOUN. Approved by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/20/13. (dot ) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              PLEA AGREEMENT as to LEE A. CALHOUN. (dot ) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                STATEMENT OF OFFENSE by USA as to LEE A. CALHOUN. (dot ) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  PLEA AGREEMENT as to LEE A. CALHOUN. (dr) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF OFFENSE as to LEE A. CALHOUN. (dr) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER as to LEE A. CALHOUN. By no later than 4:30 PM on Monday, June 17, 2013, the Government shall file a motion to seal the Information and Statement of Offense (if appropriate). The Government shall provide Chambers with copies of all relevant plea materials, including an outline of the elements of the offense, by no later than 12:00 PM on Tuesday, June 18, 2013. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/14/13. (lcckk2) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        INFORMATION as to LEE A. CALHOUN (1) count(s) 1. (hsj, ) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 79 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?