TCYK, LLC v. Does 1-20
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-01476-WYD-MEH

Tags
Last Updated September 18, 2016 at 5:24 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a California Limited Liability Company David J. Stephenson Jr. david.thunderlaw@gmail.com
v.
No Logo John Does 1-20, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (jhawk, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013 Terminated Case
    Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 12/06/13. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: 12/6/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case and John Doe 12 Without Prejudice by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: 12/5/2013 Terminated Party
        Party John (6, 10, 16, and 19) Does terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 12/05/13. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: 12/5/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 6, John Doe 10, John Doe 16, and John Doe 19 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 Terminated Party
            Party John (2, 3, 4, 7, 8, 9, 14, and 15) Does terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 11/26/13. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: 11/26/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 2, John Doe 3, John Doe 4, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, John Doe 14, and John Doe 15 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: 11/18/2013 Terminated Party
                Party John (5,11, and 20) Does terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 11/10/13. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/10/2013, Entered: 11/10/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 5, John Doe 11, and John Doe 20 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: 11/8/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                    MINUTE ORDER granting [27] Plaintiff's second Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendants (Authority Incorporated). Plaintiff shall serve all remaining Defendants by 12/6/2013. The Court will grant no further extensions of this deadline absent a showing of exceptional cause. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/7/2013. (mehcd)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: 11/5/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                      MEMORANDUM regarding [27] MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendants filed by TCYK, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/5/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: 11/5/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                        MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendants by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Stephenson, David)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013 Terminated Party
                          Party John (1) Doe terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 10/24/13. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: 10/24/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 1 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                              MINUTE ORDER granting [22] Motion for Extension of Time, The Plaintiff shall serve all Defendants in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 on or before November 6, 2013. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/4/2013.(trlee, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                MEMORANDUM regarding [22] MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants filed by TCYK, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/3/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proof of Service CenturyTel, # (2) Exhibit Proof of Service Comcast, # (3) Exhibit Proof of Service Baja, # (4) Exhibit Proof of Service JAB Wireless, # (5) Exhibit Production Response Baja, # (6) Exhibit Production Response CenturyTel, # (7) Exhibit Production Response JAB/Skybeam, # (8) Exhibit Production Response Comcast)(Stephenson, David)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: 9/5/2013 Terminated Party
                                    Party John (13) Doe terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 09/04/13. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 13 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: 8/26/2013 Amended Complaint
                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT Corrected by Interlineation against All Defendants, filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Spreadsheet of Doe Defendants, # (2) Exhibit Copyright Registration Certificate, # (3) Exhibit Local Listings of the Motion Picture)(Stephenson, David)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/25/2013, Entered: 8/25/2013 Amended Complaint
                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Spreadsheet of Doe Defendants, # (2) Exhibit Copyright Registration Certificate, # (3) Exhibit Local Listings of the Motion Picture)(Stephenson, David)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Terminated Party
                                            Party John (17) Doe terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 08/12/13. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: 8/12/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 17 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 15 Filed: 8/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER Dismissing Party With Prejudice. ORDERED that plaintiff, TCYK, LLC, shall amend the case caption on future filings to reflect the dismissal of John Doe 18 by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/09/13. (jjhsl, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: 8/9/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER Dismissing Party With Prejudice. ORDERED that plaintiff, TCYK, LLC, shall amend the case caption on future filings to reflect the dismissal of John Doe 18 by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/09/13. (jjhsl, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/4/2013, Entered: 8/4/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 18 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                      STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 06/23/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a status report within five (5) days of the date of this order, then on the tenth day of each month thereafter, informing the Court of the status of service in this case. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/18/2013. (mehcd) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 8 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Limited Expedited Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/14/2013. (mehcd) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            MEMORANDUM regarding 8 MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Expedited Discovery filed by TCYK, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/13/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (5) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/13/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Expedited Discovery by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration in support of motion, # 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Stephenson, David) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel for all further proceedings. Judge Christine M. Arguello no longer assigned to case by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/1/2013. Case drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (agarc, ) Modified on 6/11/2013 to add magistrate assignment (agarc, ). (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued. (dbera, ) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (dbera, ) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 06/09/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 06/09/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 6/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 8 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Limited Expedited Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/14/2013. (mehcd)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 6/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                COMPLAINT against John Does 1-20 (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-3398358), filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Spreadsheet of Doe Defendants, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Registration, # 3 Exhibit Local Listings of the Movie, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephenson, David) (Entered: 06/09/2013)
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 80 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?