United States of America v. Madison Square Garden LP et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-09704
District Judge Richard J. Holwell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 12, 2016 at 3:40 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean Chance Cenawood +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2717 Sean.Cenawood@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Lloyd Cott +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2730 James.Cott@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Cablevision Systems Corp, Defendant
Unknown Role, Amc Networks, Inc.
No Logo Madison Square Garden, LP, Defendant
No Logo Rainbow Media Holdings LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 12131
Nature of Suit 446 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: Accordingly, this action is dismissed. The Clerk of the Court is requested to close this case. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 8/8/2011) (tro) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER: that the action be transferred to the suspense docket so that this Court may retain jurisdiction in order to resolve any disputes that arise relating to the consent decree. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 12/6/07) (tro) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
      CONSENT DECREE in favor of United States of America against Cablevision Systems Corp., Madison Square Garden LP, Rainbow Media Holdings LLC granting injunctive relief to the plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 11/2/07) (jf) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2007 (Lee, Michael). (Entered: 11/05/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None
        COMPLAINT against Madison Square Garden LP, Rainbow Media Holdings LLC, Cablevision Systems Corp.. Document filed by United States of America.(jpo) (Entered: 11/05/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 51 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?