In re: Livingsocial Marketing
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 13-7059

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2017 at 9:38 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3450 - Interstate Commerce
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207553802 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
CLERK'S ORDER filed [1470152] considering stipulation [1466978-3]; that the Clerk is directed to note on the docket that this case is dismissed. No mandate shall issue. [13-7059]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207547722 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
    STIPULATION filed [1466978] to dismiss case voluntarily [13-7059] (Bandas, Christopher)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207545394 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
      MOTION filed [1465722] by Jeremy De La Garza to extend time to file brief to 01/21/2014. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/25/2013) [Service Date: 11/12/2013 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [13-7059] (Bandas, Christopher)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207533327 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
        CLERK'S ORDER filed [1458742] setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 11/19/2013. Appendix due 11/19/2013. APPELLEE Brief due on 12/19/2013. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 01/02/2014 [13-7059]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207514467 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
          STATEMENT FILED [1447890] by Living Social, Inc. with Disclosure Listing [Service Date: 07/22/2013 ] [13-7059] (Rhodes, Michael)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207513750 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
            CLERK'S ORDER filed [1447493] considering Clerk order initial submissions for appellants[1440467-5], dismissing case for lack of prosecution [13-7062 (Consolidation termed 07/19/2013) with 13-7059], withholding issuance of the mandate. [13-7062]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207513679 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE FILED [1447457] from USPS website showing that the Order issued 6/10/13 and mailed by certified mail to Michelle Melton was unclaimed as of 7/17/2013. [Service Date: 07/19/2013 ] [13-7062]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207508200 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1443983] RECEIVED from Lorenzo Cadenos [signed for on 06/14/2013] for order [1440492-2] sent to Appellant Cery Perle [13-7062]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207503209 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                  CLERK'S ORDER filed [1440467] extending time to file initial submission for apet [1433625-3] APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/10/2013. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/10/2013, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [13-7062]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207498440 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                    CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1437757] by Dawn Abbott, Barrie Arliss, Melissa Forshey, Sarah Gosling, Cara Lauer, Mandy Miller, Kimberly Pullman and Amy Schultz in 13-7059, 13-7062 [Service Date: 05/23/2013 ] [13-7059, 13-7062] (Green, Kevin)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207498434 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                      ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1437755] by Kevin K. Green on behalf of Appellees Dawn Abbott, Barrie Arliss, Melissa Forshey, Sarah Gosling, Cara Lauer, Mandy Miller, Kimberly Pullman and Amy Schultz in 13-7059, 13-7062. [13-7059, 13-7062] (Green, Kevin)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207498285 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                        CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1437689] by Jack's Canoes & Kayaks, LLC and Living Social, Inc. in 13-7059 [Service Date: 05/23/2013 ] [13-7059, 13-7062] (Doolin, Michelle)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207498279 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                          ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1437687] by Michael G. Rhodes and co-counsel Michael J. Klisch, Michelle C. Doolin, Christopher B. Durbin, and Darcie A. Tilly on behalf of Appellees Jack's Canoes & Kayaks, LLC and Living Social, Inc. in 13-7059. [13-7059, 13-7062] (Doolin, Michelle)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207497609 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                            STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1437342] by Jeremy De La Garza in 13-7059 [Service Date: 05/21/2013 ] [13-7059, 13-7062] (Bandas, Christopher)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207497606 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                              STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1437341] by Jeremy De La Garza in 13-7059 [Service Date: 05/21/2013 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [13-7059, 13-7062] (Bandas, Christopher)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207497602 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1437340] by Jeremy De La Garza in 13-7059 [Service Date: 05/21/2013 ] [13-7059, 13-7062] (Bandas, Christopher)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207497423 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                  CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1437179] by Jeremy De La Garza in 13-7059 [Service Date: 05/21/2013 ] [13-7059, 13-7062] (Bandas, Christopher)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207497419 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                    TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1437178] by Jeremy De La Garza in 13-7059 [Service Date: 05/21/2013 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [13-7059, 13-7062] (Bandas, Christopher)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207497413 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                      ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1437175] by Christopher A. Bandas on behalf of Appellant Jeremy De La Garza in 13-7059. [13-7059, 13-7062] (Bandas, Christopher)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207497405 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                      UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1437172] by Jeremy De La Garza in 13-7059 [13-7059, 13-7062] (Bandas, Christopher)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207491478 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                        CLERK'S ORDER filed [1433625] consolidating cases 13-7062 (Consolidation started 05/01/2013) with 13-7059; directing party to file in 13-7062 initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/07/2013. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/07/2013 [13-7059, 13-7062]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207490617 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE [1433125] filed from Clerk, District Court corrected docket sheet as to the file date of the Notice of Appeal.. [13-7059, 13-7062]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207488753 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                            LETTER SENT [1432148] regarding attorney membership to Michael G. Rhodes for Jack's Canoes & Kayaks, LLC and Hungry Machine, Inc.. Application for Admission due 05/23/2013. [13-7059]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207488750 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                              LETTER SENT [1432147] regarding attorney membership to Charles J. LaDuca for Mandy Miller, Kimberly Pullman, Sarah Gosling, Dawn Abbott, Barrie Arliss, Cara Lauer and Amy Schultz. Application for Admission due 05/23/2013. [13-7059]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207488747 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                CLERK'S ORDER filed [1432146] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/23/2013. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 05/23/2013. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/23/2013. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/23/2013. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/23/2013. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 05/23/2013. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/23/2013. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/23/2013. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/07/2013; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 05/23/2013. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/23/2013. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/23/2013. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/07/2013 [13-7059]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207488744 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1432144] by Jeremy De La Garza seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:11-mc-00472-ESH. Assigned USCA Case Number [13-7059]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 36 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?