Public.Resource.org v. United States Internal Revenue Service
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-02789-WHO
District Judge William H. Orrick, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 27, 2018 at 3:30 PM EDT (3.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Public.Resource.org, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Boston, Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David E Halperin +1 202 905 3434 davidhalperindc@gmail.com

Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

v.
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States Internal Revenue Service"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yonatan Gelblum +1 202 305 3136 +1 202 514 6866 yonatan.gelblum@usdoj.gov
Space Christopher Wright Sanders +1 202 616 1840 +1 202 514 6866 christopher.w.sanders@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Office San Francisco
Filed 6/18/2013
Jury Demand None
Demand
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County San Francisco
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,MEDTERM
  Entries (109) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Satisfaction of Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 97 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/11/2015 Clerks Notice
      CLERK'S NOTICE - The hearing as to 91 Motion for Attorney's Fees set for 9/16/2015 is VACATED. Per Civil L.R. 7-1(b), the Court has determined that this motion is appropriate for determination without oral argument. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None USCA Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Clerks Notice
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Clerks Notice
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Transcript Designation Form
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None USCA Case Number
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: 1/14/2015 Motion Hearing
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 1/14/2015 re [46] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Internal Revenue Service and [47] MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Public.Resource. Corrected declaration of Dwayne Ross to be filed by defense within one week. Motions taken under submission; written order to follow. Court Reporter: FTR 2:05-2:21. Plaintiff Attorney Thomas Burke. Defendant Attorney Yonatan Gelblum. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/14/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                  REPLY (re [47] MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment ) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: 11/18/2014 Set Motion and Deadlines/HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER AND ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON PARTIES' CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT granting [57] STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Hearing re [46], [47] MOTION for Summary Judgment continued to 1/14/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/18/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014, Terminated: 11/18/2014 Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [46] MOTION for Summary Judgment , [47] MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Stipulation and Proposed Order Rescheduling Hearing to January 14, 2015 filed by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: 10/29/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                              RESPONSE (re [46] MOTION for Summary Judgment , [47] MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment ) (Opposition and Reply) filed byUnited States Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Affidavit Second Declaration of D. Ross, # (3) Affidavit Second Declaration of L. Rosenmerkel)(Gelblum, Yonatan) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines as to [46] MOTION for Summary Judgment per [44] Briefing Schedule. Responses due by 10/29/2014. Replies due by 12/5/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Judgment
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                      Declaration of Tim Bray in Support of [47] MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Related document(s)[47]) (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                          Declaration of Clay Johnson in Support of [47] MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Related document(s)[47]) (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                              Declaration of Peter Skomoroch in Support of [47] MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Related document(s)[47]) (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                Declaration of Kendall Taggart in Support of [47] MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Related document(s)[47]) (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                  Declaration of Ken Berger in Support of [47] MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Related document(s)[47]) (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                    Declaration of Scott Klein in Support of [47] MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Related document(s)[47]) (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                      Declaration of Beth Simone Noveck in Support of [47] MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[47]) (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                        Declaration of Carl Malamud in Support of [47] MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[47]) (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Public.Resource.org. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/29/2014. Replies due by 12/05/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/29/2014) Modified on 10/1/2014 to revise response and reply dates (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Internal Revenue Service. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 9/29/2014. Replies due by 10/29/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration of A. Leach, # (3) Declaration of D. Higley, # (4) Declaration of D. Ross, # (5) Declaration of J. Archibald, # (6) Declaration of L. Rosenmerkel, # (7) Declaration of M. Hooke, # (8) Declaration of U. Gillis, # (9) Exhibit 101, # (10) Exhibit 102, # (11) Exhibit 103, # (12) Exhibit 104, # (13) Exhibit 105, # (14) Exhibit 106, # (15) Exhibit 107)(Gelblum, Yonatan) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: 8/1/2014 Answer
                                                                                                              ANSWER to [1] Complaint byUnited States Internal Revenue Service. (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Filed on 8/1/2014) Modified on 8/4/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: 7/29/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                NOTICE by United States Internal Revenue Service re [43] Notice (Other) Joint Revised Proposed Briefing Schedule (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Public.Resource.org re [41] Motion Hearing, PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: 6/20/2014 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                    ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William H. Orrick denying [14] Motion to Dismiss. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: 6/18/2014 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/18/2014 before William H. Orrick re [14] MOTION to Dismiss. The parties are directed to meet and confer regarding the briefing schedule for the motions and to submit a proposed schedule within ten (10) days. (Court Reporter FTR 1:58-2:18) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/18/2014)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: 6/11/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Laidman as Co-Counsel for Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org (Laidman, Daniel) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: 6/11/2014 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by Public.Resource.org (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: 6/11/2014 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                              CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Public.Resource.org. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 6/11/2014. Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing as to [14]MOTION to Dismiss set for 6/18/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: 5/8/2014 Certification of Mediation Session
                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session dated 5/8/2014 by Mediator, Stephen Liacouras; Further telephonic mediation session held 4/1/2014; Case did not settle; Mediation process is complete. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order Reassigning Case to JD
                                                                                                                                    POSTED IN ERROR - PLEASE DISREGARD CASE REASSIGNED to the Honorable James Donato, United States District Judge. All parties must review the reassignment order posted at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/jd-order.pdf and comply with its requirements, including submitting a case management statement. This is a text only docket entry. The reassignment order associated with this notice may be viewed at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/jd-order.pdf Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2014.. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/16/2014. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014) Modified on 4/16/2014 (wv, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: 3/18/2014 Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. William H. Orrick granting (with modifications) [35] Stipulation. Unless the parties notify the Court that a settlement has been reached, hearing on the Motion to Dismiss and the Initial Case Management Conference shall occur on June 18, 2014. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement no later than June 11, 2014, setting forth, among other matters, a proposed case management schedule. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: 3/17/2014, Terminated: 3/18/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Rescheduling Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Initial Case Management Conference filed by Public.Resource.org. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: 3/5/2014 Certification of Mediation Session
                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session dated 3/5/2014 by Mediator, Stephen Liacouras; Further telephonic mediation session held 3/5/2014; Further telephonic mediation session scheduled for 4/1/2014 at 11:30 AM. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Certification of Mediation Session
                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session dated 2/10/2014 by Mediator, Stephen Liacouras; Mediation session held 1/24/2014; Further telephonic mediation session held 2/10/2014; Further telephonic mediation session scheduled for 3/5/2014 at 11:00 AM. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 3/5/2014 at 11:00 AM. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: 12/18/2013 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator
                                                                                                                                                ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Stephen Liacouras as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Case Referred to Mediation
                                                                                                                                                  CASE REFERRED to ADR Program for Mediation [31]. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearing - Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing previously set for 12/18/2013 VACATED. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: 12/2/2013 Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                      Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting as modified [30] Stipulation. The parties shall re-calendar the Motion To Dismiss and Case Management Conference for hearing no later than March 19, 2014 on a Wednesday law and motion calendar if the mediation does not result in settlement, or shall notify the Court immediately if settlement is reached.(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013, Terminated: 12/2/2013 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Rescheduling Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Initial Case Management Conference filed by Public.Resource.org. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  ADR Phone Conference held
                                                                                                                                                          ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held 11/15/2013 and 11/19/2013 by Howard Herman, ADR Program Director. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  ADR Phone Conference held
                                                                                                                                                            ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held 11/15/2013 with Howard Herman, ADR Program Director. Further ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 11/19/2013 at 10:30 a.m. Call-in information remains the same.(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re [28] STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Case Management Conference is reset for 12/18/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco (to follow hearing on motion to dismiss). Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/14/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013, Terminated: 11/14/2013 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Rescheduling Initial Case Management Conference filed by Public.Resource.org. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: 11/12/2013 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                  ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 11/15/2013 at 10:00 a.m. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: 11/12/2013 Notice of need of ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: 10/30/2013 ADR Clerk's Notice
                                                                                                                                                                      ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 Renotice motion hearing
                                                                                                                                                                        Renotice motion hearing re [20] STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [17] Opposition/Response to Motion, [14] MOTION to Dismiss STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RESCHEDULING REPLY BRIEF DEADLINE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, [14] MOTION to Dismiss filed byUnited States Internal Revenue Service. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 9/30/2013. Replies due by 10/25/2013. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s)[20], [14]) (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY (re [14] MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byUnited States Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gelblum, Yonatan) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                        Reset Hearing - Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (per [16] Stipulation and Order) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING REPLY BRIEF DEADLINE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS re [20] STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. The hearing date for the motion to dismiss is off calendar. Defendant shall renotice the hearing for a date not less than two weeks after a reply brief is filed. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/15/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Public.Resource.org. United States Internal Revenue Service served on 6/20/2013, answer due 7/11/2013. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013, Terminated: 10/15/2013 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [17] Opposition/Response to Motion, [14] MOTION to Dismiss STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RESCHEDULING REPLY BRIEF DEADLINE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William H. Orrick granting [18] Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Ronald G. London. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013, Terminated: 10/4/2013 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Ronald G. London ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8046056.) filed by Public.Resource.org. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 10/1/2013) Modified on 10/2/2013 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re [14] MOTION to Dismiss ) Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: 9/11/2013 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING AND BRIEFING RE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS - Motion Hearing re [14] Motion to Dismiss set for 10/23/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Response in opposition due by 9/30/2013. Reply due by 10/7/2013. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/11/2013. The Initial Case Management Conference scheduled September 17, 2013, is rescheduled for November 19, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013) Modified on 10/16/2013 to include rescheduled CMC date (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: 9/10/2013, Terminated: 9/11/2013 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [14] MOTION to Dismiss , [10] Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Rescheduling Initial Case Management Conference and Hearing and Briefing Re Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Public.Resource.org. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/3/2013, Terminated: 6/20/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States Internal Revenue Service. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 9/17/2013. Replies due by 9/24/2013. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Sanders, Christopher) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER re [12] Stipulation. The United States shall have until and including September 3, 2013, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint filed in this matter. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/24/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: 7/23/2013 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER filed by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Sanders, Christopher) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Public.Resource.org re [10] Order (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: 7/11/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/11/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/11/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: 7/9/2013 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE - Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: 7/9/2013 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/9/13. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Clerk's Notice of Impending ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: 7/3/2013 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Public.Resource.org.. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting [4] Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: 6/25/2013, Terminated: 6/28/2013 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7800387.) filed by Public.Resource.org. (Halperin, David) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/19/2013 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to United States Internal Revenue Service. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/19/2013 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2013 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 6/18/13. (Attachments: # (1) NC Standing Order, # (2) Standing Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/19/2013 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE AND FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACTS; against United States Internal Revenue Service ( Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 34611087898.). Filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 501 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?