Ahearn v. Massler
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:12-cv-62148
District Judge James I. Cohn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 14, 2016 at 7:29 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael G. Ahearn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Silvergerg & Weiss, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kraig Scott Weiss +1 954 384 0998 kweiss@pkslegal.com
v.
No Logo Alan Massler, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 0101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER CLOSING CASE pursuant to 6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 1/24/2013. (ams) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by Michael G. Ahearn (Weiss, Kraig) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER re: filing of summonses. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 1/23/2013. (ams) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        Order Setting Calendar Call and Trial Date and Order of Reference To United States Magistrate For Scheduling Matters and Pretrial Discovery Matters; SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 6/24/2013 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge James I. Cohn., Calendar Call set for 6/20/2013 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge James I. Cohn.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for Pretrial Discovery Motions Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 11/2/2012. (cqs) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
          FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (form mailed) (cqs) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            Judge Assignment to Judge James I. Cohn (cqs) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
              COMPLAINT Initial Complaint for Copyright Infrigement and Other Relief against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-5197902, filed by Michael G. Ahearn. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit "A")(Weiss, Kraig) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 600 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?