Raza et al v. City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-03448
District Judge Pamela K. Chen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 6, 2017 at 11:13 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Asad Dandia, Plaintiff
No Logo Hamid Raza, Plaintiff

Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Toggle Switch Represented by Long, Ragsdale & Waters, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Christopher Toomey +1 212 519 7816 ptoomey@lrwlaw.com

Represented by New York Civil Liberties Union

Toggle Switch Represented by QC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramzi Kassem +1 718 340 4558 +1 718 340 4478 ramzi.kassem@law.cuny.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Theodore N Cox

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diala Shamas +1 718 340 4533 +1 718 340 4455 diala.shamas@gmail.com
No Logo Masjid Al-Ansar, Plaintiff
No Logo Masjid At-Taqwa, Plaintiff
No Logo Mohammad Elshinawy, Plaintiff
No Logo Muslims Giving Back, Plaintiff
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (128) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Reply in Opposition
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/19/2017, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Settlement
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Stay
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Mail receipt
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 118 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                          AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 117 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza. (Fletcher, Kiersten) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Notice(Other)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Notice(Other)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct/Supplement
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Declaration
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct/Supplement
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  Notice of Related Case (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Stay
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Reply in Support
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Discovery Hearing
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 77 Motion for Protective Order. The attached Protective Order is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/22/2014. (Christianson, Kienan) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack:Telephone Conference held on 7/15/2014 regarding plaintiffs' proposed stipulation and defendants' outstanding document requests. See attached minute entry and stipulation. (FTR 11:09:46 - 11:22:08) (D'Antonio, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/9/14, before Judge Azrack. Court Reporter/Transcriber TRANSCRIPTION PLUS II. Email address: laferrara44@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/6/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2014. (Hong, Loan) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              Letter dated 7/14/14 from Ashley Gorski to Kienan, re: language of stipulations and the parties intentions on calling the Court on 7/15/14 at 11:00 a.m. (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack:Discovery Hearing held on 7/9/2014. The attached minute entry contains rulings and deadlines for the parties. See attached minute entry for more details. Next in-person conference scheduled for September 4, 2014, at 1:00 pm. (Tape #2:05:54 - 4:23:42.) (Christianson, Kienan) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Letter Concerning Field Officer Discovery by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza (Shamsi, Hina) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Letter Advising Court of Modification of Defendants' Time Under the Protective Order to Challenge Plaintiffs' Confidentiality Designations by Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen, Raymond W. Kelly (Shammas, Cheryl) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Amended MOTION for Protective Order - First Amended Stipulation and Protective Order for the Production and Exchange of Confidential Materials by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza. (Mooney, Kyle) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Letter Re: Proposed Dates for Conference by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza (Hunt, Adam) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack:Telephone Conference held on 6/30/2014. Plaintiffs to provide their privilege log by the close of business on June 30, 2014. Parties to file a stipulation extending any impacted deadlines. (Christianson, Kienan) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Letter MOTION for Protective Order to Shield Field Officers from Designation as Custodians by Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen, Raymond W. Kelly. (DiSenso, Anthony) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 20, 2014, before Judge Azrack. Court Transcriber: TypeWrite Word Processing Service, Telephone number 718-966-1401. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2014. (Rocco, Christine) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Protective Order ; Letter Requesting Modification of the March 20, 2014 Protective Order by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Modifying the March 20, 2014 Protective Order) (Hunt, Adam) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack:Telephone Discovery Conference held on 6/20/2014. See attached minute entry for details. (Terranova, Robert) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack: Telephone Discovery Conference held on 6/19/2014. See attached minute entry for details. (Terranova, Robert) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Protective Order designations dispute pursuant to IID Protective Order dkt. no. 45, MOTION for Discovery by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendants' Categorical Privilege Log for Redactions Contained in April 21, 2014 Prodcution, # 2 Exhibit Defendants' Redaction Key for April 21, 2014 Production, # 3 Exhibit 5/23/2014 Letter from Haroules to Farrell disputing various Protective Order designations ascribed to April 21, 2014 Production) (Haroules, Beth) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Application Disputing Defendants confidentiality designations, pursuant to Section II(D) of the Stipulation and Protective Order for the Production and Exchange of Confidential Materials by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza. (Haroules, Beth) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Kiersten Ann Fletcher on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Fletcher, Kiersten) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Adam James Hunt on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Hunt, Adam) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle W.K. Mooney on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Mooney, Kyle) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 63 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-6962483. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service) (Scannell, David) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-6962483. by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza. (Scannell, David) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 61 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-6962448. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service) (Hartman, Joshua) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-6962448. by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza. (Hartman, Joshua) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-6962407. filed by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service) (Gallegos, Hector) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-6962407. by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza. (Gallegos, Hector) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Adjourn Conference Required by Section II(D) of the Stipulation and Protective Order for the Exchange of Confidential Materials by Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen, Raymond W. Kelly. (DiSenso, Anthony) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              REPLY in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Briefing Concerning Defendants' Disputed Discovery Requests filed by All Defendants. (Shammas, Cheryl) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                REPLY in Support of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief Concerning Disputed Discovery Requests filed by All Plaintiffs. (Shamsi, Hina) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Chandra Shekhara Bhatnagar on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Bhatnagar, Chandra) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Order & Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack: Telephone Conference held on 4/24/2014. Plaintiffs' request to file a reply to defendants' opposition papers, [ECF No. 53], is granted. Plaintiffs' reply is limited to five (5) pages (not including exhibits) and must be filed by May 1, 2014. Defendants' request to file a sur-reply is also granted. Defendants' sur-reply is limited to five (5) pages (not including exhibits) and must be filed by May 8, 2014. See attached minute entry. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 4/24/14. (D'Antonio, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Briefing Concerning Defendants' Disputed Discovery Requests filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Defs' Interrogatories and Requests for Documents) (Shammas, Cheryl) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Haroules on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Haroules, Beth) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack:Telephone Conference held on 4/3/2014. Plaintiffs brief, (Pls.' Mem. in Supp. of Disputed Discovery Requests, ECF No. 49), is: (1) in compliance with my Individual Rules; and (2) within the scope of the subject matter that I directed the parties to submit briefing on following the March 19, 2014 discovery hearing. Defendants are directed to respond to plaintiffs' arguments on the disputed document requests. However, plaintiffs' arguments related to the interrogatories are not ripe because they are not yet before the court for decision. Defendants request for an extension of time to file their reply brief is granted. Defendants have until April 21, 2014 to submit their reply brief. See attached minute entry. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 4/3/2014. (D'Antonio, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack:Discovery telephone conference held on 4/2/2014. Reserved decision on defendants request to strike plaintiffs post-discovery conference brief. (Pls. Mem. in Supp. Disputed Discovery Requests, ECF No. 49.)Telephone conference scheduled for April 3, 2014, at 2:30 PM. Defendants are to call Chambers at (718) 613-2530 when all parties are on the line. See attached minute entry. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 4/2/2014. (D'Antonio, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support Concerning Disputed Discovery Requests filed by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mariko Hirose in Support of Supplemental Briefing, # 2 Exhibit) (Toomey, Patrick) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/19/14, before Judge Azrack. Court Reporter/Transcriber ARIA SERVICES, INC., Telephone number 845-260-1377. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/16/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/28/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2014. (Hong, Loan) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Letter re: Joint Document Production Schedule by Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen, Raymond W. Kelly (Leist, Alexis) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Letter Preserving Protective Order Appeal by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza (Kassem, Ramzi) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      REVISED PROTECTIVE ORDER. The attached Protective Order is hereby SO ORDERED. It does not differ in form or substance from the previous Protective Order. The only change is that the parties' signature page has now been fully integrated into the document and no longer appears as a separate attachment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 3/20/2014. (Christianson, Kienan) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER. The attached Protective Order is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 3/20/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Parties' Signature Page)(Christianson, Kienan) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack:Discovery Hearing held on 3/19/2014. The parties are directed to file their submissions regarding the issue of financial records according to the following schedule: (1) Plaintiffs brief due by March 31, 2014; (2) Defendants response due by April 14, 2014. The parties are directed to submit their proposed document production schedule by March 24, 2014. In addition, the parties shall meet and confer regarding Defendants proposed interrogatories. The parties may request a conference with the Court to resolve any disputes regarding the interrogatories that they cannot resolve. The final draft of the Protective Order is due by March 20, 2014, at 11:00 am. (Tape #2:39:00 - 4:58:32.) (Christianson, Kienan) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Odile Maun Farrell on behalf of Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen, Raymond W. Kelly (aty to be noticed) (Farrell, Odile) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Adjourn Conference on March 6, 2014 by Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen, Raymond W. Kelly. (Leist, Alexis) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Letter in Response to Plaintiffs' Letter dated February 18th by Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen, Raymond W. Kelly (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Leist, Alexis) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter re Law Student Interns by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (Shamas, Diala) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack:Status Conference held on 2/12/2014. Conference addressing the Court's revisions of the parties' Proposed Protective Order held. A briefing schedule is hereby set for the issue concerning intern support staff. Plaintiffs brief is due February 17, 2014. Defendants reply is due February 21, 2014. All other concerns raised at the conference will be discussed at the next conference scheduled for March 6, 2014, at 2:00 pm. (Christianson, Kienan) (entered 2/14/2014) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M. DiSenso on behalf of Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen, Raymond W. Kelly (aty to be noticed) (DiSenso, Anthony) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter re Defendants' Proposed Protective Order by Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen, Raymond W. Kelly (Leist, Alexis) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter re Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza (Shamsi, Hina) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Clarification of the Court's November 22, 2013 Memorandum & Order by Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen, Raymond W. Kelly (Shammas, Cheryl) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack:Telephone Conference held on 1/13/2014. The parties are to submit their materials regarding the protective order by January 17, 2014. (Christianson, Kienan) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Nusrat J. Choudhury by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order) (Choudhury, Nusrat) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter Seeking Clarification of the Court's November 22, 2013 Memorandum and Order by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Shamsi, Hina) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint Motion to Appear by Telephone on Monday, January 14th 2014 by Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen, Raymond W. Kelly. (Leist, Alexis) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Re: Status of Confidentiality Stipulation and Discovery Process by Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen, Raymond W. Kelly (DiSenso, Anthony) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion for Discovery: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, Plaintiffs' motion for expedited discovery is granted in part, and denied in part. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 11/22/2013. (Doerr, Mark) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. (Shamsi, Hina) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter re Enlargement of Page Limit for Pls.' Reply in Support of their Motion for Expedited Discovery by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza (Shamsi, Hina) Modified on 11/1/2013 to correct ECF filing event. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 20 MOTION for Discovery filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen, Raymond W. Kelly. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (Leist, Alexis) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 20 MOTION for Discovery filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen, Raymond W. Kelly. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Leist, Alexis) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 20 MOTION for Discovery filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen, Raymond W. Kelly. (Leist, Alexis) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Plaintiffs' Motion For Expedited Discovery by Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen, Raymond W. Kelly. (Leist, Alexis) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Marie Gorski on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Gorski, Ashley) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Discovery by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to Notice, Schedule A, # 2 Exhibit to Notice, Schedule B, # 3 Memorandum in Support, # 4 Declaration of Patrick Toomey, # 5 Exhibit to Declaration, Ex. A - J) (Shamsi, Hina) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter Re: Status of Confidentiality Stipulation by Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen, Raymond W. Kelly (Leist, Alexis) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter In Response to Plaintiffs' Request for Pre-Motion Conference for Expedited Discovery by Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen, Raymond W. Kelly (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit September 10, 2013 Letter D.E. 11) (Farrell, Peter) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl Leah Shammas on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Shammas, Cheryl) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter Requesting Rescheduling of Pre-Motion Conference by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza (Shamsi, Hina) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 12, 2013, before Judge Azrack. Court Transcriber: Fiore Reporting and Transcription Service, Inc., Telephone number (203)929-9992. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/7/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/16/2013. (Rocco, Christine) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack. Initial Conference Hearing held on 9/12/2013. Decision reserved on discovery bifurcation. Counsel to confer regarding confidentiality stipulation. (Tape #1:40-1:55.) (Terranova, Robert) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter in Anticipation of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Requesting Pre-Motion Conference by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza (Shamsi, Hina) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter in Anticipation of Initial Court Conference Set for 9-12-2013 by Masjid Al-Ansar, Masjid At-Taqwa, Asad Dandia, Mohammad Elshinawy, Muslims Giving Back, Hamid Raza (Shamsi, Hina) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter in Anticipation of Initial Court Conference Set for 9-12-2013 by Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen, Raymond W. Kelly (Farrell, Peter) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Leist, Alexis) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by All Plaintiffs. (Shamsi, Hina) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen. (Farrell, Peter) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Muslims Giving Back, Masjid At-Taqwa, Masjid Al-Ansar, Mohammad Elshinawy, Asad Dandia, Hamid Raza. City of New York served on 6/20/2013, answer due 7/11/2013. (Toomey, Patrick) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Muslims Giving Back, Masjid At-Taqwa, Masjid Al-Ansar, Mohammad Elshinawy, Asad Dandia, Hamid Raza. Michael R. Bloomberg served on 6/20/2013, answer due 7/11/2013. (Toomey, Patrick) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Muslims Giving Back, Masjid At-Taqwa, Masjid Al-Ansar, Mohammad Elshinawy, Asad Dandia, Hamid Raza. David Cohen served on 6/20/2013, answer due 7/11/2013. (Toomey, Patrick) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Muslims Giving Back, Masjid At-Taqwa, Masjid Al-Ansar, Mohammad Elshinawy, Asad Dandia, Hamid Raza. Raymond W. Kelly served on 6/20/2013, answer due 7/11/2013. (Toomey, Patrick) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: 6/19/2013 Clerks Notice of Rule 73
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/19/2013 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen, Raymond W. Kelly. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/19/2013 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Michael R. Bloomberg, City of New York, David Cohen, Raymond W. Kelly Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Muslims Giving Back, Masjid At-Taqwa, Masjid Al-Ansar, Mohammad Elshinawy, Asad Dandia, Hamid Raza. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 655 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?