District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Massachusetts District Court Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
  1. Case No. 12-1594
    Filed 5/11/2012
  2. Case No. 14-1596
    Filed 6/3/2014
United States Supreme Court

Aaron Greenspan v. Random House, Inc., et al
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 12-965

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Greenspan, Aaron, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Aaron Greenspan"
No Logo Greenspan, Aaron, Petitioner
Officially listed as "Aaron Greenspan"

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenspan, Aaron

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron J. Greenspan +1 415 670 9350 +1 415 373 3959 aarong@thinkcomputer.com
v.
No Logo Mezrich, Benjamin, Defendant
Officially listed as "Benjamin Mezrich"

Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley H. Ellis +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 bellis@sidley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Megan A. Hughes +1 202 434 5920 +1 202 434 5029 mhughes@wc.com
Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc. Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Posternak Blankstein & Lund LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dustin F. Hecker +1 617 973 6100 +1 617 722 4927 dhecker@pbl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Taylor Baine +1 202 434 5010 +1 202 434 5029 KBaine@wc.com
Space Megan A. Hughes +1 202 434 5920 +1 202 434 5029 mhughes@wc.com
No Logo Mezco, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley H. Ellis +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 bellis@sidley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Megan A. Hughes +1 202 434 5920 +1 202 434 5029 mhughes@wc.com
Random House, Inc. Random House, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Audible, Inc.

Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley H. Ellis +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 bellis@sidley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Megan A. Hughes +1 202 434 5920 +1 202 434 5029 mhughes@wc.com
Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc. Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Taylor Baine +1 202 434 5010 +1 202 434 5029 KBaine@wc.com
No Logo Random House, Inc., et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G. Contopulos +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 scontopulos@sidley.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 12-1594
Lower Court Decision Date 10/16/2012
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: 4/15/2013
Petition DENIED. Justice Breyer took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
    LREF
    Blank 4 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: 3/20/2013
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 12, 2013.
      LREF
      Blank 3 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: 2/12/2013
      Waiver of right of respondent Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc. to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: 2/8/2013
        Waiver of right of respondents Random House, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
          LREF
          Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: 1/28/2013
          Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 8, 2013)
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 541 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?