Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Lenovo (United States) Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00497
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 8:26 PM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
Space Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
Space Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
v.
Lenovo (United States), Inc. Lenovo (United States), Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that the cause of action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/11/2015. (gsg) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated forpretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:13cv384 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for trial. All motions shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. The Clerk of the Court shall add all consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as each defendants' Lead and Local Counsel only. Should additional attorneys wish to appear in the consolidated case, they should file a Notice of Appearance in the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/11/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
        SUMMONS Issued as to Lenovo (United States) Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chester Jianbon Shiu on behalf of Norman IP Holdings, LLC (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam G Price on behalf of Norman IP Holdings, LLC (Price, Adam) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D Love. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Jury Demand
                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                    Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                        COMPLAINT against Lenovo (United States) Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4189349.), filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Space Space

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 82 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?