Latino Officers v. The City of New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:99-cv-09568
District Judge Lewis A. Kaplan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 9, 2019 at 2:42 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Adam Alvarez, Plaintiff
No Logo Anthony Miranda, Plaintiff
No Logo CARLOS JIMENEZ, Plaintiff
No Logo Charles Castro, Plaintiff
No Logo Christopher Castro, Plaintiff
No Logo Clifford Muniz, Plaintiff
No Logo Daniel Figueroa, Plaintiff
No Logo Fernando Sanchez, Plaintiff
No Logo Haydee Cartagena, Plaintiff
No Logo Hector Ariza, Plaintiff
No Logo Hilda Susu, Plaintiff
No Logo Hiram Monserrate, Plaintiff
No Logo Jose Mercedes, Plaintiff
No Logo Latino Officers Association City of New York Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jack Mikels & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY William Harry Goodman +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 bgoodman@gis.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael G McAuliffe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert H. Spergel +1 516 535 4311 +1 516 294 1767 robertspergel@optonline.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Levy Ratner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Dana E Lossia +1 212 627 8100 +1 212 627 8182 dlossia@levyratner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Levy, Phillips & Konigsberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Diane M. Paolicelli +1 212 605 6200 +1 212 605 6290 dpaolicelli@lpklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Thaniel J. Beinert and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu
No Logo Louis Vega, Plaintiff
No Logo Manuel Delgado, Plaintiff
No Logo Manuel Gomez, Plaintiff

Represented by Giskan Solotaroff Anderson & Stewart LLP

No Logo Manuel Nunez, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Padilla, Plaintiff
No Logo Parnell Peterson, Plaintiff
No Logo Ruben Malave, Plaintiff
No Logo Thaddeus Gamory, Plaintiff
No Logo Wilfred Maldonado, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip S. Raible +1 212 696 4848

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian Neville

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Barry Richard Lax +1 212 696 1999 +1 212 566 4531 blax@laxneville.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz & Gold LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua H Epstein +1 212 600 2085 +1 212 588 1710 jepstein@sorinrand.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Steven Glen Mintz +1 212 696 4848 +1 212 696 1231 mintz@mintzandgold.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Offices of Laurie J. McPherson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Laurie Jeanne McPherson +1 212 505 4030 +1 212 505 4034 ljmcpherson@mcphersonlaw.net
v.
No Logo Charles V. Campisi, Defendant
No Logo George Grasso, Defendant
No Logo Howard Safir, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Flynn, Defendant
New York City Police Department New York City Police Department, Defendant
No Logo Patrick Bradley, Defendant
No Logo Patrick Kelleher, Defendant
No Logo Richard Kubick, Defendant
Giuliani, Rudolph Giuliani, Rudolph, Defendant
Officially listed as "Rudolph W. Giuliani"
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Julie E. Oneill

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
No Logo The Police Relief Fund, Inc., Defendant
No Logo James K. Thomas, Movant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Kenneth Thomas +1 717 255 7617
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (298) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Dennis Concepcion dated 8/19/2014 re: I am a former decorated Police Officer with the New York City Police Department from 1990 - 2002. Back in 2004 you heard arguments in your court from the Black and Latino Police Officer Organizations against the N.Y.C.P.D. asserting claims of racial discrimination, hostile work environment and retaliation. (rjm) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER. This case was settled on a class action basis. Four class members opted out. The claims of three of those class members were settled. The claims of the fourth were tried to verdict. The Court now is in receipt of a pro se communication from one Dennis Concepcion, one of the class members who did not opt out. Mr. Concepcion, according to his communication, participated in the settlement and received $58,000. Nonetheless, he remains - years later - unhappy with the relief he obtained and now seeks to reopen his case. Mr. Concepcion has not served copies of his papers on any of the parties. His application therefore is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to renewal by the filing of new papers with proof that they have been duly served on counsel for all parties to this action. Mr. Concepcion would be well advised to consult counsel before doing so, but he of course is free to proceed pro se if he wishes to do so. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/2/2014) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rjm) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
      MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 295 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Hiram Monserrate, Louis Vega, Daniel Figueroa, Carlos Jimenez, Thaddeus Gamory, Jose Mercedes, Parnell Peterson, Hilda Susu, Manuel Delgado, Manuel Nunez, Anthony Miranda, Charles Castro, Clifford Muniz, Manuel Gomez, Latino Officers Association City of New York Incorporated, Wilfred Maldonado, Michael Padilla, Fernando Sanchez, Adam Alvarez, Christopher Castro, Ruben Malave, Hector Ariza, Haydee Cartagena USCA Case Number 07-5293-cv. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED in accordance with the opinion of this court. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 3/27/2009. (nd) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None
        MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 267 Notice of Appeal filed by James K. Thomas USCA Case Number 07-0941-cv. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 9/15/2008. (nd) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
          Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Index). Notice that the Original index to the record on Appeal for 295 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Hiram Monserrate, Louis Vega, Daniel Figueroa, Carlos Jimenez, Thaddeus Gamory, Jose Mercedes, Parnell Peterson, Hilda Susu, Manuel Delgado, Manuel Nunez, Anthony Miranda, Charles Castro, Clifford Muniz, Manuel Gomez, Latino Officers Association City of New York Incorporated, Wilfred Maldonado, Michael Padilla, Fernando Sanchez, Adam Alvarez, Christopher Castro, Ruben Malave, Hector Ariza, Haydee Cartagena USCA Case Number 07-5293, 3 Copies of the index, Certified Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd) (tp). (Entered: 02/15/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF APPEAL from 294 Memorandum & Opinion,. Document filed by Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa, Latino Officers Association City of New York Incorporated, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Wilfred Maldonado, Haydee Cartagena, Manuel Delgado, Parnell Peterson, Hiram Monserrate, Fernando Sanchez, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 634172. Copies of Notice of Appeal mailed attorney(s) of record: Corporation Counsel of the City of New York. (nd) (Entered: 11/21/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
              MEMORANDUM OPINION:# 95369 for the foregoing reasons, plaintiffs' motion for contempt and to compel compliance with the settlement and order [docket item 247] is denied. Because there are no grounds on which to hold defendants in contempt, the Court denies all of plaintiffs requests for relief. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/26/07) (kco) Copies Mailed by Chambers. Modified on 10/30/2007 (Horne, Jenny). (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
                REPLY AFFIDAVIT OF Richard Faust. Document filed by Michael Padilla, Ruben Malave, Latino Officers Association City of New York Incorporated, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez, Anthony Miranda, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro. (pl) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 247 MOTION to Compel. Document filed by Michael Padilla, Ruben Malave, Latino Officers Association City of New York Incorporated, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez, Anthony Miranda, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro. (pl) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
                    REBUTTAL AFFIDAVIT of Carlos Muentes in Support re: 247 MOTION to Compel. Document filed by Michael Padilla, Ruben Malave, Latino Officers Association City of New York Incorporated, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez, Anthony Miranda, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro. (pl) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Richard Levy dated 7/12/2007 re: Plaintiff request to file a reply memorandum of law in this case, which is due on July 31, 2007, of twenty-five (25) pages in length, which exceeds the 10 page limit for reply memoranda established by your Individual Practices. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 7/17/2007) (jmi) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Stipulation and Order of Settlement and Partial Discontinuance: this action is dismissed, with prejudice, and without costs, expenses, or fees in excess of the amount specified herein; the City of New York agrees to pay plaintiff the sum of $60,000.00 in a check made payable to Mintz & Gold, LLP as attorneys for Ruben Malave in full satisfaction of all claims that were or could have been raised in this action, including claims for costs, expenses and attorney's fees; in consideration for the payment of this sum, plaintiff agrees to the dismissal of all the claims against the individually named dfts and to release all dfts, any present or former employees or agents of the City of New York, and the City of New York from any and all liability claims, or rights of action arising from and contained in the complaint in this action, including claims for costs, expenses and attorney's fees; plaintiff shall execute and deliver to City dfts' attorney all documents necessary to effect this settlement, including without limitation, a general release and an "Affidavit of Liens"; plaintiff's attorney shall execute a form W-9. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 7/3/07) (dle) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Stipulation and Order of Settlement and Partial Discontinuance: this action is dismissed, with prejudice, and without costs, expenses, or fees in excess of the amount specified herein; the City of New York agrees to pay plaintiff the sum of $85,000.00 in a check made payable to Barry Lax, esq. as attorneys for Parnell Peterson in full satisfaction of all claims that were or could have been raised in this action, including claims for costs, expenses and attorney's fees; in consideration for the payment of this sum, plaintiff agrees to the dismissal of all the claims against the individually named dfts and to release all dfts, any present or former employees or agents of the City of New York and the City of New York from any and all liability, claims or rights of action from and contained in the complaint in this action, including claims for costs, expenses and attorney's fees. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 7/3/07) (dle) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None
                            CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated June 20, 2007, Final judgment is entered for defendants in this action without prejudice to Gomezs subsequent action; accordingly, this case is closed. (Signed by J. Michael McMahon, clerk on 7/5/07) (ml) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Richard Levy dated 6/19/07 re: counsel for plaintiffs request that plaintiffs' reply papers to their motion for contempt be due on 7/31/07. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/21/07) Replies due by 7/31/2007. (dle) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER. This case was settled on a class action basis. Four class members opted out. The claims of the fourth, Manuel Gomez, were tried in May 2005 together with a subsequent action brought by Gomez. The trial resulted in a directed verdict for the defendants on one issue and a hung jury on the balance. Gomez's case was called for a retrial on June 19, 2007. At the commencement of the trial, counsel agreed that the directed verdict in the prior trial resolved all of Gomez's claims that were included in the class action. In consequence, the only remaining claims now on trial are those made in his subsequent action. Accordingly, all claims brought by all parties in this action now have been resolved. The Clerk shall enter final judgment and close this case. This is without prejudice to Gomez's subsequent action. It is ordered that counsel to whom this order is sent is responsible for faxing a copy to all counsel and retaining verification of such in this case file. Do not fax such verification to chambers. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/20/2007) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(jpo) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER; that the re-trial of this case shall begin on Tuesday, 6/19/07 @9:30 a.m. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/5/07) (pl) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None
                                    AMENDED DECLARATION of Donna Jones. Document filed by The City of New York, The New York City Police Department. (djc) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from James M. Lemonedes dated 4/27/07 re: Request a modification of the briefing schedule and ask that defendants be allowed to submit their opposition to plaintiffs motion by Monday May 7, 2007, and that plaintiffs be allowed to reply by or before June 29, 2007, and I will consent to any additional time they may require. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/30/07) (js) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None
                                        DECLARATION of Donna Jones. Document filed by The City of New York, The New York City Police Department, Michael R. Bloomberg, Raymond W. Kelly. (jpo) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None
                                          DECLARATION of Lt. Lester Tuthill in Opposition to 247 MOTION for Contempt. Document filed by The City of New York, The New York City Police Department, Michael R. Bloomberg, Raymond W. Kelly. (jpo) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None
                                            DECLARATION of Julie Schwartz in Opposition to 247 MOTION for Contempt. Document filed by The City of New York, The New York City Police Department, Michael R. Bloomberg, Raymond W. Kelly. (jpo) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None
                                              DECLARATION of Marie G. Ryan in opposition to 247 MOTION for Contempt. Document filed by The City of New York, The New York City Police Department, Michael R. Bloomberg, Raymond W. Kelly. (jpo) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                DECLARATION of Georgia Pestana in opposition to 247 MOTION for Contempt. Document filed by The City of New York, The New York City Police Department, Michael R. Bloomberg. (jpo) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                  DECLARATION of Catherine McCann. Document filed by New York City Police Department. (jpo) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to 247 MOTION for Contempt. Document filed by The City of New York, The New York City Police Department, Michael R. Bloomberg, Raymond W. Kelly. (jpo) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 3/15/2007 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. (jmi) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from William S.J. Fraenkel dated 3/26/07 re: Defendants request that they be permitted to submit opposition to plaintiffs' motion by or before April 30, 2007 and that plaintiffs be allowed to reply by or before June 22, 2007. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/27/07) (js) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL that the above entitled action, in so far as it is brought by plaintiff Peter... be and hereby is without prejudice and without costs to either side. This is without prejudice to claims by the... plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/15/2007) (jmi) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/6/2007 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. (mbe) (Entered: 03/19/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                              PLAINTIFFS' STATISTICAL APPENDIX (EXHIBIT). Document filed by Michael Padilla, Ruben Malave, Latino Officers Association City of New York Incorporated, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez, Anthony Miranda, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro.(ae) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Stuart I. Parker dated 1/29/03 re: Defendants write opposing plaintiffs' counsel's 1/28 letter to reopen the deposition of James Fyfe. Document filed by The City of New York, The New York City Police Department, Michael R. Bloomberg, Raymond W. Kelly.(ae) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Index). Notice that the Original index to the record on Appeal for 267 Notice of Appeal filed by James K. Thomas 3 Copies of the index, Certified Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2007 (Pisarczyk, Thomas). (Entered: 03/09/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL from 243 Order. Document filed by James K. Thomas. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 605432. Copies sent to attorney(s) of record: Corporation Counsel. (tp) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER that this action is dismissed, with prejudice and without costs, expenses or fees in excess of the amount specified herein; the City of New York agrees to pay plaintiff the sum of sixty seven thousand, five hundred dollars in a check made payable to Dreier, LLP in full satisfaction of all claims; in consideration for the payment of this sum plaintiff agrees to the dismissal of all the claims against the individually named dfts and to release all dfts from any and all liability, claims or rights of action arising from and contained in the complaint. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/28/07) (dle) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/2/2007 at 9:32 a.m. before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. (aba) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11/4/2006 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. (aba) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Carlos Muentes to update the Court regarding allegations made in original affidavit dated 11/27/06. Document filed by Michael Padilla, Ruben Malave, Latino Officers Association City of New York Incorporated, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Wilfred Maldonado, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez, Anthony Miranda, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro. (sn) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Alan Sash in Support of Pltffs' Motion for Contempt. Document filed by Michael Padilla, Ruben Malave, Latino Officers Association City of New York Incorporated, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Wilfred Maldonado, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez, Anthony Miranda, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro. (sn) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from James M. Lemonedes dated 2/7/07 re:dft's requests a brief extension to submit their opposition papers to the motion for contempt to 2/23/07, and Plaintiffs' reply papers will be submitted on 3/23/07. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/9/07) (pl) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER; that this action insofar as it is brought by Ruben Malave shall be and hereby is discontinue with prejudice and without costs to either side. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/6/07) (pl) Modified on 2/27/2007 (Lancaster, Patricia). (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL; Granted. Jason Batsoy substituted as counsel for Gomez. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/1/07) (kco) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER; a pretrial conference is scheduled for 2/2/2007 at 9:15 a.m. Plaintiff Manuel Gomez is required to attend. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/1/07) (kco) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        STIPULATION TO CLARIFY SUBSTITUED PARTIES, TO ELIMINATE INDIVIDUAL LIABILITY OF NAMED DEFENDANTS, TO DROP DEFENDANTS FROM THE PRESENT ACTION, AND TO ORDER SUBSTITUTION So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/4/07) (jco, ) (Entered: 01/09/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER defendants' time to submit opposition papers to plaintiff?s motion for contempt and to compel compliance with Judgment and Order (the "motion") shall be extended to 2/9/07. Plaintiffs will reply to defendants' opposition on or before 3/9/07. The Court shall maintain jurisdiction over this case to hear and decide this motion, with the express understanding that during the pendancy of the motion the defendants will not continue to provide monitoring reports except that defendants' final reports will be the cumulative and fourth quarter 2006 reports. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/5/07) (jco, ) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Richard Faust. Document filed by Latino Officers Association City of New York Incorporated. (jmi, ) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Fernando Sanchez. Document filed by Fernando Sanchez. (jmi, ) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Castro. Document filed by Christopher Castro. (jmi, ) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Carlos Muentes. Document filed by Latino Officers Association City of New York Incorporated. (jmi, ) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Robert Gonzalez. Document filed by Latino Officers Association City of New York Incorporated. (jmi, ) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Richard Levy in Support re: 247 MOTION to Compel.. Document filed by Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa, Howard Safir, Latino Officers Association City of New York Incorporated, Charles V. Campisi, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Wilfred Maldonado, Haydee Cartagena, Manuel Delgado, Parnell Peterson, Hiram Monserrate, Fernando Sanchez, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory. (jmi, ) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Charles Castro. Document filed by Charles Castro. (jmi, ) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 247 MOTION to Compel.. Document filed by Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa, Latino Officers Association City of New York Incorporated, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Wilfred Maldonado, Haydee Cartagena, Manuel Delgado, Parnell Peterson, Hiram Monserrate, Fernando Sanchez, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory. (jmi, ) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION for Contempt and to Compel Compliance with Settlement. Document filed by Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa, Latino Officers Association City of New York Incorporated, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Wilfred Maldonado, Haydee Cartagena, Manuel Delgado, Parnell Peterson, Hiram Monserrate, Fernando Sanchez, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory. (jmi, ) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 1/27/06 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. (tro, ) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from James Lemonedes dated 9/21/06 re: response to the court's order of 9/6/06. (dle, ) (Entered: 10/12/2006)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from James Lemonedes dated 9/29/06 re: response to the court's order of 9/26/06. (dle, ) (Entered: 10/12/2006)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER that the petition to set aside the award of the special master and to remand his claims for further review is denied. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/3/06) (dle, ) (Entered: 10/10/2006)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER in his letter response to the petition of class member James K. Thomas, counsel for the City asserts that all class members received notice of the settlement provision stating that "[a]ll decisions by the Special Master are final, binding and not appealable." It would be helpful if counsel would advise the Court of where and in what manner class members were so informed. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/26/06) "Copies Mailed By Chambers"(jco, ) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER: A status conference regarding the case of plaintiff Manuel Gomez is scheduled for October 5, 2006 at 10:15 a.m. If plaintiff Gomez has obtained new counsel, his attorney should attend the conference, otherwise he should appear pro-se. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/21/06) (js, ) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER re: 239 MOTION to Set Aside. MOTION to Remand. Counsel for the plaintiff class and the defendants shall respond to the petition on or before 9/27/06. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/6/06) "Copies mailed by Chambers" (jco, ) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Set Aside the award of Special Master Kenneth R. Feinberg. MOTION to Remand his claims for further review either before Special Master Feinbergor before this Court. Attached Memo In Support of Petiotion of James K. Thomas. Filed by James K. Thomas (jar, ) (Entered: 08/21/2006)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/22,23,24,25,30,31/2006; 6/1,2/2006 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. (jar, ) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER: The claims of plaintiff Gomez in 99-cv-9568 are consolidated for trial with 05-cv-4811. Trial shall commence at 10:30 a.m. on 5/22/2006. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/30/2006) (lb, ) (Entered: 04/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Kira Repetto-Cruz dated 3/10/2006. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel may file an appropriate motion. The Court will not act on the basis of a letter. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/13/2006) (lb, ) (Entered: 03/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Accordingly, the cases will be tried separately (in alphabetical order by the surname of each plaintiff). Each trial will be bifurcated such that the Monell issue will be tried if and subsequent to a verdict otherwise favorable to a plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/7/06) (js, ) (Entered: 03/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from James M. Lemonedes dated 2/22/06 re: Counsel write in accordance with your Honor's 1/31/06 Memo Order. (jco, ) (Entered: 03/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from James McKenney dated 2/17/06 re: Counsel writes to request that the court order the three cases consolidated for trial. Document filed by Ruben Malave.(jco, ) (Entered: 03/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from James K. Thomas dated 1/31/06; re: Mr. Thomas moves to set aside the decision of the Special Master.(sac, ) (Entered: 02/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION 92683 re: Defendants motion in limine 216 is granted to the extent that Mr. Faust's testimony as to command discipline in the 26th precinct is excluded and is denied in all other respects, albeit without prejudice to renewal as to the anecdotal witness issue as indicated. The parties are directed to submit, on or before 2/21/2006, either a joint proposal as to whether and to what extent they wish to joint or separate trials or, if they agree, their respective proposals. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/31/2006) (lb, ) Modified on 2/1/2006 (ns, ). (Entered: 01/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Diane Paolicelli and Richard A. Levy dated 12/21/05 re: a request for guidance in obtaining information on individual class members. ENDORSEMENT: DENIED. The information shall not be disclosed in view of the City's 12/28/2005 response. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/3/06) (kco) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Georgia Pestana dated 12/28/05 re: Counsel writes of behalf of defendants to respond to class counsels' letter dated 12/27/05. Document filed by The City of New York, New York City Police Department, Rudolph W. Giuliani, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief Fund, Inc.(jco, ) (Entered: 01/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Noah A. Kinigstein on behalf of Monica Arroyo-Horne (jco, ) . (Entered: 12/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Pretrial and Settlement Conference set for 11/15/2005 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Lead trial counsel shall attend and shall either have or bring clients who have full settlement authority. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/31/2005) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(lb, ) (Entered: 11/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Georgia Pestana dated 9/23/05 re: that Ms. Arroyo-Horne is not a member of the force, is not a class member, is not bound by the settlement and is not eligible to participate in the claims procedure. Document filed by The City of New York, New York City Police Department, Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief Fund, Inc.(db, ) (Entered: 10/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A Kaplan from Noah A. Kinigstein dated 9/14/205 re: to represent Ms. Monica Arroyo-Horne a civilian member of the New Yotk City Police Department who is a class member in the above mentioned class action. I'am writing because it appears that although Ms. Arroyo-Horne, as a civilian membet of the New York City Police Department, that is doing the same or similar work as uniformed members of the New York City Police Department, and thus covered by the class certification (See page 2 of the Judgment and Order Approving the Class Action, dated September 15,2004 and the Memorandum Opinion of August 6,2002) has been denied compensation under the settlement. When she submitted her claim for compensation sha was told she was ineligible because as civilian member ahe was not eligible.ENDORSEMENT: Denied. Ms. Arroyo-Horne plaintiff is not a member of the class. See letter dated 9/23/2005 of defense counsel. She of course may make any motion she wishes. She and counsel also are subject to the risk of sanctions. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/28/2005) (jmi, ) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER; deft's in limine motion does not specifically identify the witnesses whose testimony deft's seek to exclude. It would be helpful if counsel would identify the winesses by name and provide chambers with an additional copy of the expert report of any expert witnesses at issue. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/13/05) (kco, ) (Entered: 09/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: that Clinton Correctional Facility make the following inmate available for a telephone conference: Inmate - Ezra Leslie DIN # 03-A-3404. Date - 8/16/05. Time - 2:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 8/2/05) (db, ) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 216 MOTION in Limine.. Document filed by The City of New York, New York City Police Department, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief Fund, Inc.. (jp, ) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kaplan from James Laemonedes dated 3/29/05: granting a two day extension re defts' reply brief for their motion in limine. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/29/05) (cd, ) (Entered: 04/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 216 MOTION in Limine.. Document filed by Michael Padilla, Ruben Malave, Manuel Gomez, Wilfred Maldonado, Fernando Sanchez. (jmi, ) (Entered: 03/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss th Complaint. Document filed by The City of New York, New York City Police Department, Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief Fund, Inc.. (jmi, ) (Entered: 03/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine Ordering Excluding from Evidence the Statistical, Expert and Anecdotal Plaintiffs Seek to Offer and Granting Such Other Relief as may be Appropriate. Document filed by The City of New York, New York City Police Department, Rudolph W. Giuliani, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief Fund, Inc.. (jmi, ) (Entered: 03/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kaplan from James Lemonedes dated 2/28/2005 re: granting counsels request for an extension of time as follows: Motions due by 3/11/2005. Responses due by 3/23/2005 Replies due by 3/30/2005. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/3/2005) (jp, ) (Entered: 03/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER ; purs to the Notice of Substitution of Counsel, Giskan and Solotaroff shall be substituted for the Law Offices of Laurie J. McPherson as attorneys representing the named plaintiff Manuel Gomez, in all matters pertaining to this action before the Hon. Lewis A. Kaplan in the District Court. It is further stipulated that the Law Offices of Laurie J. McPherson are relieved of further responsibility with respect to this action. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/15/05) (djc, ) (Entered: 02/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: defendants are to file their motions in limine by 3/4/05; responses duey 3/16/05 and replies are due 3/23/05. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/14/05) Copies Mailed by Chambers.(db, ) (Entered: 02/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 2/5/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 1/14/05 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. (kj, ) (Entered: 02/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judsge Kaplan from James M. Ledmonedes dated 01/10/05 re: counsel to defendants reauests a pretrial conference..(with exhibits) (djc, ) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 208 Motion to Consolidate Cases without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/14/05) (kw, ) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 208 MOTION to Consolidate Cases.. Document filed by Manuel Gomez, Ruben Malave, Wilfred Maldonado, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez. (jmi, ) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Document filed by Manuel Gomez, Ruben Malave, Wilfred Maldonado, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez. (jmi, ) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Document filed by Manuel Gomez, Ruben Malave, Wilfred Maldonado, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez. Added attorney Steven G. Mintz for Wilfred Maldonado; Parnell Peterson; Fernando Sanchez; Manuel Gomez and Ruben Malave, Barry Lax for Wilfred Maldonado; Parnell Peterson; Fernando Sanchez; Manuel Gomez and Ruben Malave, Roland Gustaf Riopelle for Wilfred Maldonado; Parnell Peterson; Fernando Sanchez; Manuel Gomez and Ruben Malave, Joshua H. Epstein for Wilfred Maldonado; Parnell Peterson; Fernando Sanchez; Manuel Gomez and Ruben Malave, Laurie J. McPherson for Wilfred Maldonado; Parnell Peterson; Fernando Sanchez; Manuel Gomez and Ruben Malave. Attorney Robert H. Spergel; Richard A. Levy and Diane M. Paolicelli terminated. (dle, ) (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that pursuant to the notice of substitution of counsel Mintz & Gold, The Lax Law Firm, Sercarz & Riopelle, Dreier, LLP and the Law Offices of Laurie J. McPherson be substituted for Levy, Ratner & Behroozi as attorneys representing the five named plaintiffs Maldonado, Malave, Gomez Peterson and Sanchez in all matters pertaining to this action before the Honorable Lewis A. Kaplan in the District Court; Levy Ratner & Behroozi, Levy Phillips & Konigsberg LLP and Robert Spergel are relieved of further responsibility with respect to the five named plaintiffs; without furhter notice the clerk of the court shall immediately docket this order and the Notice of Substitution of counsel. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/1/04) (dle, ) (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Philip Raible dated 10/25/04 re: request for following modified schedule: 1) plaintiffs motion to consolidate and proposed joint pre-trial orders due 12/17/04. 2) defendants opposition and final joint pretrial orders due 1/14/05; plaintiffs papers in further support due 1/24/05. Application GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/28/04) (db, ) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER a new joint pretrial order containing both a joint section and sections pertaining to individual plaintiffs, shall be submitted by 11/23/04. Any motion for a joint trial is due by 11/23/04. A final pretrial conference will be held on 12/12/04 at 2:00 p.m. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/25/04) (jco, ) (Entered: 10/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Kenneth R. Feinberg dated 9/24/04 re: granting the Special Masters request that the Court order what is set forth in this letter in connection with my administration of claims arising out of the settlement of this matter. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/27/04) (pl, ) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  JUDGMENT AND ORDER APPROVING THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, CERTIFYING THE AMENDED CLASS AND APPROVING ATTORNEYS FEES. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/15/04) (ml, ) Modified on 10/7/2004 (kg, ). (Entered: 09/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Richard A. Levy and Diane Paolicelli in Support of the parties' joint motion pursuant to Rule 23(e) of the FRCP for a final order and judgment approving the proposed class action settlement submitted to the court dated 12/18/03 and the revised class certification. Document filed by Adam Alvarez, Hector Ariza, Charles Castro, Christopher Castro, Manuel Gomez, Latino Officers Association City of New York Incorporated, Ruben Malave, Wilfred Maldonado, Clifford Muniz, Michael Padilla, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez. (dle, ) (Entered: 09/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' Response to the Filed Objections and Pre-Hearing Memorandum of Law in support of the proposed class action settlement. Document filed by Adam Alvarez, Hector Ariza, Charles Castro, Christopher Castro, Manuel Gomez, Latino Officers Association City of New York Incorporated, Ruben Malave, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Clifford Muniz, Michael Padilla, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez. (dle, ) (Entered: 09/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIRMATION of Richard A. Levy and Diane Paolicelli in Support re: 198 MOTION for Attorney Fees.. Document filed by Adam Alvarez, Hector Ariza, Charles Castro, Christopher Castro, Manuel Gomez, Latino Officers Association City of New York Incorporated, Ruben Malave, Wilfred Maldonado, Clifford Muniz, Michael Padilla, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez. (dle, ) (Entered: 09/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for an order pursuant to Rule 23(h) of the FRCP approving the award of attorneys fees and costs to class counsel as agreed to by the parties in the stipulation and order dated 12/18/03. Document filed by Adam Alvarez, Hector Ariza, Charles Castro, Christopher Castro, Manuel Gomez, Ruben Malave, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Clifford Muniz, Michael Padilla, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez. (dle, ) (Entered: 09/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance, Colleen Meenan enters her appearance in this action on behalf of Rita Fleming. (dle, ) (Entered: 07/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Georgia Pestana in compliance with paragraph nine of the Order Establishing Settlement Procedures dated March 22, 2004. Document filed by Patrick Bradley, Charles V. Campisi, Joseph Flynn, Rudolph W. Giuliani, George Grasso, Patrick Kelleher, Richard Kubick, New York City Police Department, Howard Safir, The City of New York, The Police Relief Fund, Inc.. (ps, ) (Entered: 05/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, regarding issues concerning the establishment of settlement procedures as further set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/22/04) (tp, ) (Entered: 03/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Diane Paolicelli and Richard A. Levy in Support of 191 MOTION to Approve Class Action Settlement. Document filed by Adam Alvarez, Hector Ariza, Charles Castro, Christopher Castro, Manuel Gomez, Latino Officers Association City of New York Incorporated, Ruben Malave, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Clifford Muniz, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez. (sb, ) (Entered: 03/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Georgia Pestana in Support of 191 MOTION to Approve Class Action Settlement. Document filed by Patrick Bradley, Charles V. Campisi, Joseph Flynn, Rudolph W. Giuliani, George Grasso, Patrick Kelleher, Richard Kubick, New York City Police Department, Howard Safir, The City of New York, The Police Relief Fund, Inc. (sb, ) (Entered: 03/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of 191 MOTION to Approve Class Action Settlement. Document filed by Adam Alvarez, Hector Ariza, Charles Castro, Christopher Castro, Manuel Gomez, Latino Officers Association City of New York Incorporated, Ruben Malave, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Clifford Muniz, Michael Padilla, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez. (sb, ) (Entered: 03/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (sb, ) (Entered: 03/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from Manuel Gomez dated 03/15/04 re: misleading letter sent to Your Honor by Ms. Goergia Pestana, Chief of Labor annd Employment Law of the NYC Law Dept., dated March 3, 2004. Document filed by Manuel Gomez.(djc, ) (Entered: 03/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER The Court pursuant to Rule 23(e) of the F.R.C.P., that the within action be settled on the following terms and conditions further set forth in this Order. Defendants agree to pay undersigned class counsel the sum of Four million, eight hundred thousand dollars ($4,800,000) as and for their attorneys fees and costs incurred up to the date of the Final Order of settlment and agree not to oppose plaintiffs' counsel's application to approve this sum as a reasonable attorneys fee pursuant to F.R.C.P. 23(e). Plaintiffs shall not seek from defendants, nor shall defendants be liable for any attorneys fees or costs incurred by class counsel after the Final Order of settlement relating to implementation of this settlement. The Court does not hereby approve the settlement,which must await further proceedings. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/10/04) (jco, ) (Entered: 02/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 12/5/03 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan.(rg, ) (Entered: 01/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter filed addressed to Judge Kaplan from Diane Paolicelli, atty. for Plaintiffs, dated 11/17/03, re: responding to Mr. Lemonedes' latest diatribe against Plaintiffs' counsel, we respectfully request the Court to grant relief w/ respect to the one real issue that remains outstanding--namely, the Defendants' failure to provide Rule 26(a)(2)(B) data related to Dr. Saad's "rebuttal report". (ae) (Entered: 11/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER; resolution of additional issues with the Court regarding the production of materials relevant to defendants' statistical expert and preparation is as set forth in this Order ; ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); (djc) (Entered: 11/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: adding party(ies) Kenneth Feinberg, Esq., Peter Woodin, Esq. added party(ies): special master Kenneth Feinberg, Peter Woodin , the parties are directed to make themselves and their principals available promptly and as requested by the special master to facilitate a full exploration of the possibility of a consensual resolution of this case prior to the start of the trial on 1/5/04., The special master shall report periodically to the Court concerning the progress of these discussions and the cooperativeness of the parties. Absent contrary order, the reports shall not disclose the positions regarding any of the matters at issue , the parties are advised that the Court is to try this case on 1/5/04, absent the execution prior to that date of a definite settlement agreement . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies Faxed to all parties by Chambers. (db) (Entered: 11/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from James M. Lemonedes, dated 11/12/03. Re: counsel for dfts requests an extension of time until 11/21/03 to respond to the various systematic issues addressed in Mr. Levy's 11/6/03 letter. Application granted ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (db) (Entered: 11/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum to Docket Clerk: A pre-trial conference was held on 11/4/03 before Judge Kaplan. Court Reporter Gerry Harrison present. (moc) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Richard A. Levy, dated 10/15/03. Re:, counsel for parties request an adjournment of Friday's conference. Adjourned to 11/4/03 at 8:45 a.m. . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); (dle) (Entered: 10/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and ORDER, that the parties' time to submit their plans for the use of courtroom technology is extended until 10/22/03 . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (dle) (Entered: 10/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER; that the settlement conference will be held for 10:30 a.m. on 10/28/03 . ( signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox ); Copies faxed by Chambers. (jco) (Entered: 10/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, regarding the issues concerning this matter on its sua sponte order to show cause why a time limit should not be placed on the pattern and practice phase of the trial . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies mailed by Chambers. (tp) (Entered: 10/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter filed by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Haydee Cartagena, Manuel Delgado, Parnell Peterson addressed to Judge Kaplan from James M. Lemonedes, dated 8/4/03, re: response to pltffs request that the trial of the pattern and practice case NOT be limited to 110 hours. (db) (Entered: 10/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter filed by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief addressed to Judge Kaplan from James M. Lemonedes, dated 8/5/03, re: response to pltffs request that the trial of the pattern and practice case NOT be limited to 110 hours. (db) (Entered: 10/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Richard Levy by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Michael Padilla, Ruben Malave in response to the Court's 7/14/03 Order to Show Cause. (db) (Entered: 10/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Richard A. Levy Re: [172-1] order the pattern and practice phase of the trial shall commence on 1/5/04 at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall show cause by 7/27/03, why the pattern and practice phase should not be limited to 110 hours, allotted equally between the two sides,with time spent by each side in questioning witnesses (direct of its own witnesses, cross of its adversary's, etc.) and argument charged against its allotment, [172-2] relief any in limine motions shall be filed no later than 9/8/03. Trial counsel shall confer with the Deputy Clerk with a view to maximizing use of equipment for the electronic presentation of evidence. Counsel's attention is drawn to Effective Use of Courtroom Technology: A Judge's Guide to Pretrial and Trial, published by the Federal Judicial Center. The parties shall submit a plan for the use of such equipment no later than 10/15/03, [172-3] relief . (dle) (Entered: 09/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan for the date(s) of 6/23/03. (tr) (Entered: 08/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from Pamela Jeffrey, dated 7/21/03. Granting plaintiffs' request for an extension until 8/1/03 for the parties to show cause with respect to the duration of the pattern or practice trial . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); (kw) (Entered: 07/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, the pattern and practice phase of the trial shall commence on 1/5/04 at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall show cause by 7/27/03, why the pattern and practice phase should not be limited to 110 hours, allotted equally between the two sides,with time spent by each side in questioning witnesses (direct of its own witnesses, cross of its adversary's, etc.) and argument charged against its allotment ; any in limine motions shall be filed no later than 9/8/03. Trial counsel shall confer with the Deputy Clerk with a view to maximizing use of equipment for the electronic presentation of evidence. Counsel's attention is drawn to Effective Use of Courtroom Technology: A Judge's Guide to Pretrial and Trial, published by the Federal Judicial Center. The parties shall submit a plan for the use of such equipment no later than 10/15/03 . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies mailed by chambers. (kw) (Entered: 07/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, that for the reasons set forth, defendants' [88-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment dismissing all claims related to Hector Ariza in this action, as modified by stipulation, is denied in all respects. ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies mailed by Chambers. (tp) (Entered: 07/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER; denying defts' motion for summary judment dismissing the Complaint [79-1]; denying [159-1] motion for an order purs to Fed. R. Evid. 702 and 403, excluding the expert report and declaration of Defendants' statistician, Dr. Ali Saad, denying [159-2] motion for summary judgment on liability on Plaintiffs' class action pattern or practice claims of discrimination in the disciplinary system, retaliation and hostile work environment, purs to Rule 56(a) of the FRCP, denying [159-3] motion for attorney fees . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies mailed by Chamber (sac) (Entered: 07/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter filed by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from James Lemonedes, dated 7/3/03, re: Levy's letter dated 6/30/03. (dle) (Entered: 07/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 168 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (wv) (Entered: 07/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from Richard A. Levy, dated 6/30/03. Re: counsel for pltff impose on the Court for assistance to resolve a problem created by dfts' failure to provide correct data and other information. In light of dfts' response, dated 7/3/03, this application is DENIED . ( signed by Lewis A. Kaplan ) (db) (Entered: 07/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memo-Endorsement on letter to Judge Kaplan from Diane Paolicelli, dated 7/3/03. counsel for plaintiffs request permission to file a longer brief of no more than 60 pages. Application granted . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); (yv) (Entered: 07/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Fourth Report of Plaintiffs' Expert Richard Fause (Responding to the March 4, 2003 Report of Defendants' Expert Dr. Ali Saad. (djc) (Entered: 07/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiffs Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Michael Padilla, Ruben Malave, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez First Report of Expert Richard Faust ( Based on Corrected Date Provided May 15,2003). (djc) (Entered: 07/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Richard Al Levy by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Michael Padilla, Ruben Malave, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez in support Re: [159-1] motion for an order purs to Fed. R. Evid. 702 and 403, excluding the expert report and declaration of Defendants' statistician, Dr. Ali Saad, [159-2] motion for summary judgment on liability on Plaintiffs' class action pattern or practice claims of discrimination in the disciplinary system, retaliation and hostile work environment, purs to Rule 56(a) of the FRCP, [159-3] motion for attorney fees; and in oppositon to Defendants' motion for summary judgment; (docmt received in night dep. on 0707/03 at 11:35 p.m.); accompanied by 5 Volumes of Exhibits (djc) Modified on 07/09/2003 (Entered: 07/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Michael Padilla, Ruben Malave, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez to defendants' Rule 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Facts, and Plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 Statement of Undisiputed Facts; (docmt received in night dep. on 07/07/03at 11:36 p.m.; (djc) (Entered: 07/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ruben Malave, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Michael Padilla, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez in support of Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Exclude Report and Declaration of Ali Saad, and In Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment; (docmt received in night dep. on 07/07/03 at 11:36 p.m.) (djc) (Entered: 07/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' Michael Padilla, Ruben Malave, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez, Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro Report and Declaration of Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Expert Dr. Mark R. Killingsworth in Response to Report of Defendants' Expert Dr. Ali Saad; (docmt received in night dep. on 07/07/03 at 11:36 p.m.) (djc) (Entered: 07/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Michael Padilla, Ruben Malave, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez; for an order purs to Fed. R. Evid. 702 and 403, excluding the expert report and declaration of Defendants' statistician, Dr. Ali Saad ; for summary judgment on liability on Plaintiffs' class action pattern or practice claims of discrimination in the disciplinary system, retaliation and hostile work environment, purs to Rule 56(a) of the FRCP ; and for attorney fees ; Return Date not indicated. (djc) (Entered: 07/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER (Corrected), that defendants' motion for summary judgment dismissing the claims of the LOA, Miranda, Alvarez and Maldonado [docket item 92] is granted to the extent that the claims of (1) Miranda based on events prior to 11/22/94, and (2) Alvarez based on events prior to 11/12/97, are dismissed. The motion is denied in all other respects . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies mailed by Chambers. (tp) (Entered: 06/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY ADDRESS by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Michael Padilla, Ruben Malave, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Parnell Peterson, Fernando Sanchez. (pl) (Entered: 06/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part, denying in part [92-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment as to all claims against Anthony Miranda, The Latino Officers Association, Inc., Hiram Monserrate, Adam Alverez and Wilfred Maldonado. Defendants' motion for summary judgment dismissing the claims of LOA, Miranda, Alvarez and Maldonado is granted to the extent that the claims of (1) Miranda based on events prior to 11/24/97 and (2) Alvarez based on events prior to 11/12/97 are dismissed. The motion is denied in all other respects ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies mailed by Chambers on 6/17/03. (yv) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part, denying in part [81-1] motion for an order purs. to Rule 56 of the FRCP granting partial summary judgment as to certain claims of plaintiff Clifford Muniz. Accordingly, defendants' motion for partial summary judgment dismissing aspects of the complaint as to plaintiff Muniz is granted to the extent that Muniz's disparate treatment claim with respect to the removal of the flyers at the 26th Precinct is dimissed. The motion is denied in all other respects ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies mailed by Chambers on 6/17/03. (yv) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORRECTED REPLY MEMORANDUM by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief in support re: [88-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment dismissing all claims related to Hector Ariza in this action . (dle) (Entered: 06/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief Re: [81-1] motion for an order purs. to Rule 56 of the FRCP granting partial summary judgment as to certain claims of plaintiff Clifford Muniz (jco) (Entered: 06/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Phyllis Calistro in support of defendants' reply to plaintiff's opposition to [81-1] motion for an order purs. to Rule 56 of the FRCP granting partial summary judgment as to certain claims of plaintiff Clifford Muniz. (jco) (Entered: 06/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and ORDER of SETTLEMENT AND DISCONTINUANCE, that plaintiff Mercedes discontinues this action and dismisses all claims he made or could have made with prejudice, and without costs, expenses, fees or other consideration, except for the amount of $5,041.66 ; Defendant City of New York hereby agrees to pay plaintiff Mercedes the amount of $5,041.66 in accrued unused back vacation pay as further set forth . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (tp) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and ORDER of SETTLEMENT AND DISCONTINUANCE, that plaintiff Vega discontinues this action and dismisses all claims he made or could have made with prejudice, and without costs, expenses, fees or other consideration, except for the amount of $10,000.00 ; Defendant City of NY hereby agrees to pay plaintiff Vega the sum of $10,000.00 in compensatory damages . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (tp) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and ORDER of SETTLEMENT AND DISCONTINUANCE, that plaintiff Vega discontinues this action and dismisses all claims he made or could have made with prejudice, and without costs, expenses, fees or other consideration, except for the amounts set forth herein ; Defendant City of New York hereby agrees to pay plaintiff Vega the amount of $426,823.52 in back pay and $2,011.40 for his 10 day suspension as further described herein . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (tp) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and ORDER of SETTLEMENT AND DISCONTINUANCE, that plaintiff Susu discontinues this action and dismisses all claims she made or could have made with prejudice, and without costs, expenses, fees or other consideration, except for $5,000.00 ; Defendant City of NY hereby agrees to pay plaintiff Susu the sum of $5,000.00 in compensatory damages . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (tp) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and ORDER of SETTLEMENT AND DISCONTINUANCE, that plaintiff Nunez discontinues this action and dismisses all claims he made or could have made with prejudice, and without costs, expenses, fees or other consideration, except for $10,000.00 ; Defendant City of NY hereby agrees to pay plaintiff the sum of $10,000.00 in full satisfaction of his claim for lost overtime and his other claims as additional salary for overtime as further set forth herein . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (tp) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and ORDER of SETTLEMENT AND DISCONTINUANCE, that plaintiff Monserrate discontinues this action and dismisses all claims he made or could have made with prejudice, and without costs, expenses, fees or other consideration, except for $100,000.00 ; Defendant City of NY hereby agrees to pay plaintiff the sum of $100,000.00 in compensatory damages . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (tp) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and ORDER of SETTLEMENT AND DISCONTINUANCE, that plaintiff Jimenez discontinues this action and dismisses all claims he made or could have made with prejudice, and without costs, expenses, fees or other consideration, except for $21,000.00 ; Defendant City of New York agrees to pay plaintiff Jimenez the amount of $21,000.00 in compensatory damages, as further described herein . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (tp) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and ORDER of SETTLEMENT AND DISCONTINUANCE, that plaintiff Gamory discontinues this action and dismisses all claims he made or could have made with prejudice, and without costs, expenses, fees or other consideration, except for the amounts further set forth ; Defendant City of New York hereby agrees to pay plaintiff Gamory the amounts of $213,290.13 for back pay and $40,000.00 in compensatory damages as further described herein . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (tp) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and ORDER of SETTLEMENT AND DISCONTINUANCE, that plaintiff Delgado discontinues this action and dismisses all claims he made or could have made with prejudice, and without costs, expenses, fees or other consideration, except for $15,000.00 ; Defendant City of NY hereby agrees to pay plaintiff Delgado the sum of $15,000.00 in compensatory damages and attorneys' fees for time attributed to plaintiff's claims in accordance with the First Stipulation and Order of Settlement and Discontinuance Regarding Attorneys' Fees . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (tp) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST STIPULATION and ORDER of SETTLEMENT AND DISCONTINUANCE REGARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES, That the individual claims of Manuel Delgado, Thaddeus Gamory, Carlos Jimenez, Hiram Monserrate, Manuel Nunez, Hilda Susu, Louis Vega, and Daniel Figueroa are hereby dismissed, with prejudice as is set forth in their respective Stipulations of Settlement and Discontinuance attached hereto, and without costs, expenses, or fees in excess of the amount of $398,000.00 ; Defendant City of NY hereby agrees to pay plaintiff the sum of $398,000.00 in full satisfaction of attorney fees to LRB and LPK in connection with the aforementioned eight settling plaintiffs on the terms set forth herein . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (tp) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from Richard A. Levy, dated 6/3/03, Plntfs' Response to Motion reset for 7/7/03 re: [96-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment dismissing the plaintiffs claims, for 7/7/03 re: [92-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment as to all claims against Anthony Miranda, The Latino Officers Association, Inc., Hiram Monserrate, Adam Alverez and Wilfred Maldonado, for 7/7/03 re: [88-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment dismissing all claims related to Hector Ariza in this action, for 7/7/03 re: [81-1] motion for an order purs. to Rule 56 of the FRCP granting partial summary judgment as to certain claims of plaintiff Clifford Muniz ; Defts' Reply to Response to Motion reset for 8/6/03 re: [96-1] motion for Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment dismissing the plaintiffs claims, for 8/6/03 re: [92-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment as to all claims against Anthony Miranda, The Latino Officers Association, Inc., Hiram Monserrate, Adam Alverez and Wilfred Maldonado, for 8/6/03 re: [88-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment dismissing all claims related to Hector Ariza in this action, for 8/6/03 re: [81-1] motion for an order purs. to Rule 56 of the FRCP granting partial summary judgment as to certain claims of plaintiff Clifford Muniz . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); (cd) (Entered: 06/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from James Lemonedes, dated 6/4/03. Counsel requests an additional two weeks to address summary judgment issues. Application granted . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (sb) (Entered: 06/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW by The City of New York, Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief in support re: [92-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment as to all claims against Anthony Miranda, The Latino Officers Association, Inc., Hiram Monserrate, Adam Alverez and Wilfred Maldonado. (Filed in the night deposit on 5/27/03 at 5:31 p.m.) (ae) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIRMATION of Sara Mason by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief. Received in night deposit box on 5/27/03 at 10:38 p.m. (db) (Entered: 06/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW by The City of New York, Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief in support of re: [88-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment dismissing all claims related to Hector Ariza in this action. (Filed in the night deposit on 10:38 p.m.) (ae) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and ORDER, that dfts' motion for partial summary judgment with respect to plaintiff Parnell Peterson withdrawn with prejudice; parties further agree as to pliantiff Peterson and Ariza as further set forth in this stipulation . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (dle) (Entered: 05/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from James Lemonedes, dated 5/16/03. Counsel for defendants request until 6/16/03 to file their reply papers with respect to plaintiff Clifford Muniz. Application granted. ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (sb) (Entered: 05/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox. ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (djc) (Entered: 05/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, that a settlement conference shall be held in this action on 6/11/03 at 10:30 a.m., in courtroom 519, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY . ( signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox ); Copies mailed by Chambers. (ae) (Entered: 05/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Diane Paolicelli by Parnell Peterson in opposition to the motion of defendants for summary judgment as to plaintiff Parnell Peterson. (jco) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa in opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment as to platiniff Hector Ariza. (jco) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Parnell Peterson Re: [122-1] settlement notice, [98-1] settlement notice. (jco) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa Re: [122-1] settlement notice. (jco) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Susan M. Jaffe in opposition to defendants' motion for partial summary judgment as to plaintiff Clifford Muniz. (jco) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa in opposition to defendants' motion for partial summary judgment as to plaintiff Clifford Muniz. (jco) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by Clifford Muniz Re: [98-1] settlement notice. (jco) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa in opposition to defendants' motion for partial summary judgment as to plaintiff Parnell Peterson. (jco) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Nancy A. Perry in opposition to the motion of defendants for summary judgment as to plaintiff Hector Ariza. (jco) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Richard Levy by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Manuel Delgado, Parnell Peterson, Hiram Monserrate, Fernando Sanchez in opposition to dfts' motion for Summary judgment as to plaintiffs Anthony Miranda,The Latino Officers' Assoc., Hiram Monserrate, Adam Alvarez and Wilfred Maldonado. (dle) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COUNTER STATEMENT TO RULE 56.1 filed by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Manuel Delgado, Parnell Peterson, Hiram Monserrate, Fernando Sanchez (dle) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Manuel Delgado, Parnell Peterson, Hiram Monserrate, Fernando Sanchez in opposition to dfts' motion for summary judgment as to plaintiffs Latino Officers Assoc. Anthony Miranda, Hiram Monserrate, Adam Alvarez and Wilfred Maldonado. (dle) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 120 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (js) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER; denying [74-1] motion for an order limiting the number of non-statistical evidence witnesses plaintiffs' may offer in the pattern and practice liability phase of this litigation. ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies mailed by Chamber (sac) (Entered: 04/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from Mark A. Panzaveccnia, dated 4/11/03. The motion for summary judgment dismissing the claim of Mr. Mercedes (Docket item 83) is denied without prejudice to renewal if no settlement is approved . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); (kw) (Entered: 04/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from Richard A. Levy, dated 4/11/03. Counsel for plaintiffs request a 1 month's extension of time, from the date of receipt of the corrected CATS data--which is due on 5/15/03--to prepare a revised and updated report and to respond to the defendants motion to dismiss the pattern or practive case. Application granted. ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (sb) (Entered: 04/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter filed by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Manuel Delgado, Parnell Peterson, Hiram Monserrate, Fernando Sanchez addressed to Judge Kaplan from Richard A. Levy, dated 4/8/03, re: Response to defendants' 4/7/03 letter. (sb) (Entered: 04/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, Plaintiffs contend that defendants have violated both the Court's 12/3/02 order, which required production of an updated CATS database, and the 2/28/03 order insofar as they have failed, allegedly "to identify in what way, if any, Plaintiff's findings are affected by the latest claimed problem with the database. Plaintiff seeks sanctions, as further set forth on this order. Also plaintiff requests an order directing defendants to correct any flaws in the database by 4/15/03 and to pay plaintiffs' costs and fees in producing a new statistical report. Plaintiffs' application is denied in all respects save that defendants shall comply with paragraph 9 of the Court's 12/3/02 order no later than 5/15/03. ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies faxed by Chambers. (sb) (Entered: 04/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter filed by The City of New York addressed to Judge Kaplan from William S. J. Fraenkel, dated 3/25/03, re: attached declaration of Dr. Saad (cd) (Entered: 04/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter filed by The City of New York addressed to Judge Kaplan from James M. Leomonedes, dated 4/7/03, re: plntf's request for sanctions. (cd) (Entered: 04/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter filed by The City of New York et al addressed to Judge Kaplan from James M. Leomonedes, dated 4/3/03, re: sanctions against defts. (cd) (Entered: 04/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter filed by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda addressed to Judge Kaplan from Richard A. Levy, dated 4/2/03, re: CATS data. (cd) (Entered: 04/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION # 88290, granting in part, denying in part [34-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment dismissing the claims in this action of plaintiffs Charles Castro, Fernando Sanchez and Reuben Malave for damages and equitable relief based on their terminations from the New York City Police Department; defendants' motion for summary judgment dismissing the Article 78 Plaintiffs' wrongful termination claims is granted to the extent that: (1) Castro's wrongful termination claim is dismissed; (2) Malave is precluded from relitigating the issues whether he patronized as prostitute and that he was unfit for duty by reason of intoxication; and (3) Sanchez is precluded from relitigating the issue whether his termination was in retaliation for his exercise of his First Amendment rights. ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); (ae) (Entered: 06/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Diane Paolicelli by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Manuel Delgado, Parnell Peterson, Hiram Monserrate, Fernando Sanchez in opposition to [74-1] motion for an order limiting the number of non-statistical evidence witnesses plaintiffs' may offer in the pattern and practice liability phase of this litigation. (sb) (Entered: 03/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Manuel Delgado, Parnell Peterson, Hiram Monserrate, Fernando Sanchez in opposition to [74-1] motion for an order limiting the number of non-statistical evidence witnesses plaintiffs' may offer in the pattern and practice liability phase of this litigation. (sb) (Entered: 03/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief in support re: [74-1] motion for an order limiting the number of non-statistical evidence witnesses plaintiffs' may offer in the pattern and practice liability phase of this litigation. Recieved in night deposit box on 3/24/03 at 9:20 p.m. (db) (Entered: 03/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER filed. ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (sac) (Entered: 03/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (UNSIGNED) JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER. (ae) (Entered: 03/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      (UNSIGNED) JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER. (ae) (Entered: 03/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from Richard A. Levy, dated 3/13/03. Re: counsel for pltff requests a on month extension to respond to City dfts motions, with dfts reply extended one month also; dfts have consented request Applications granted. Pltff's response to dfts [83-1] motion, [96-1] motion, [92-1] motion, [88-1] motion, [81-1] motion and [79-1] motion by 4/24/03 , and reply to opposition to dfts [83-1] motion, [96-1] motion, [92-1] motion, [88-1] motion, [81-1] motion and [79-1] motion by 5/24/03 . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (db) Modified on 03/19/2003 (Entered: 03/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from James M. Lemonedes, dated 3/13/03. Re: counsel for dfts request a three week extension until 4/7/03 to file a joint pre-trial order. Application granted . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (db) (Entered: 03/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Joseph Graham by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief Re: [96-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment dismissing the plaintiffs claims. (Received in the night deposit box on 3/11/03 at 8:06pm.). (gf) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Ali I. Saad by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief Re: [96-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment dismissing the plaintiffs claims. (Received in the night deposit box on 3/11/03 at 8:06pm). (gf) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Neldra M. Zeigler by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief Re: [96-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment dismissing the plaintiffs claims. (Received in the night deposit box on 3/11/03 at 8:05pm). (gf) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 56.1 STATEMENT filed by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief. (Received in the night deposit box on 3/11/03 at 8:05pm.). (gf) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief in support of [96-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment dismissing the plaintiffs claims. (Received in the night deposit on 3/11/03 at 8:06pm). (gf) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment dismissing the plaintiffs claims . Return Date not indicated. (Received in the night deposit box on 3/11/03 at 8:06pm.) (gf) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 56.1 STATEMENT filed by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief. (Received in the night deposit box on 3/11/03 at 8:05pm). (gf) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Lauren M. Pytel by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief Re: [92-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment as to all claims against Anthony Miranda, Yhe Latino Officers Association, Inc., Hiram Monserrate, Adam Alverez and Wilfred Maldonado. (Received in the night deposit on 3/11/03 at 8:05pm.). (gf) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief in support of [92-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary. (Received in the night deposit box on 3/11/03 at 8:05pm.). judgment as to all claims against Anthony Miranda, Yhe Latino Officers Association, Inc., Hiram Monserrate, Adam Alverez and Wilfred Maldonado . (gf) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/18/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment as to all claims against Anthony Miranda, The Latino Officers Association, Inc., Hiram Monserrate, Adam Alverez and Wilfred Maldonado . Return Date not indicated. (Received in the night deposit box on 3/11/03 at 8:05 pm.). (gf) Modified on 06/10/2003 (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Sara Mason by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief Re: [88-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment dismissing all claims related to Hector Ariza in this action. (Received in the night deposit box on 3/11/03 at 8:05 pm). (gf) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 56.1 STATEMENT filed by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief. (Received in the night deposit box on 3/11/03 at 8:04pm.). (gf) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief in support of [0-0] pretrial conference. (Received in the night deposit box on 3/11/03 at 8:04pm). (gf) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/15/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment dismissing all claims related to Hector Ariza in this action . Return Date not indicated. (Received in the night deposit box on 3/11/03 at 8:04pm.). (gf) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 56.1 STATEMENT filed by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief. (Received in the night deposit box on 3/11/03 at 8:04 pm.). (gf) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of William S.J. Fraenkel by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief in support Re: [83-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56(b) of the FRCP, for summary judgment, dismissing with prejudice the claims of plaintiff Jose Mercedes. (Received in the night deposit box on 3/11/03 at 8:04 pm.) (gf) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief in support of [83-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56(b) of the FRCP, for summary judgment, dismissing with prejudice the claims of plaintiff Jose Mercedes. (Received in the night deposit box on 3/11/03 at 8:04pm.). (gf) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION OF SERVICE of notice of motion, statement of undisputed facts, declaration of Lauren M. Pytel, memorandum of law and documents further set forth in this declaration as to Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Haydee Cartagena, Manuel Delgado, Parnell Peterson, Hiram Monserrate, Fernando Sanchez by UPS on 3/11/03. Received in night deposit box on 3/11/03 at 8:03 p.m. (yv) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief for an Order pursuant to Rule 56(b) of the FRCP, for summary judgment, dismissing with prejudice the claims of plaintiff Jose Mercedes . Return Date not indicated. (gf) (Entered: 03/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief in support of [81-1] motion for an order purs. to Rule 56 of the FRCP granting partial summary judgment as to certain claims of plaintiff Clifford Muniz. (sb) (Entered: 03/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/18/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief for an order purs. to Rule 56 of the FRCP granting partial summary judgment as to certain claims of plaintiff Clifford Muniz . No Return Date. Rule 56.1 Statement and Declaration of Phyllis Calistro attached. (sb) (Entered: 03/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief in support of [79-1] motion for an order purs. to Rule 56 of the FRCP granting partial summary judgment as to certain claims of plaintiff Parnell Peterson. (sb) (Entered: 03/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/14/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief for an order purs. to Rule 56 of the FRCP granting partial summary judgment as to certain claims of plaintiff Parnell Peterson . No Return Date. Rule 56.1 Statement and Declaration of Phyllis Calistro attached. (sb) (Entered: 03/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, that if a joint pretrial order, complying in all respects with the individual practices of the undersigned, is not filed on or before 3/17/03, the Court may impose sanctions, which may be case dispositive, on whoever is responsible for the failure. It is Ordered that counsel to whom this Order is sent is responsible for faxing a copy to all counsel and retaining verification of such in the case file. Do not fax such verification to Chambers . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies mailed by Chambers. (tp) (Entered: 03/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PLTFFS' REQUEST TO CHARGE by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Manuel Delgado, Parnell Peterson, Hiram Monserrate, Fernando Sanchez . (db) (Entered: 03/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PLTFFS' PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Manuel Delgado, Parnell Peterson, Hiram Monserrate, Fernando Sanchez . (db) (Entered: 03/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief in support of [74-1] motion for an order limiting the number of non-statistical evidence witnesses plaintiffs' may offer in the pattern and practice liability phase of this litigation. (djc) (Entered: 03/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/22/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief for an order limiting the number of non-statistical evidence witnesses plaintiffs' may offer in the pattern and practice liability phase of this litigation ; Return Date not indicated; (djc) (Entered: 03/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendants' Proposed Jury instructions (djc) (Entered: 03/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief . (djc) (Entered: 03/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter filed by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Haydee Cartagena, Manuel Delgado, Parnell Peterson, Hiram Monserrate, Fernando Sanchez addressed to Judge Kaplan from Richard A. Levy, dated 2/26/03, re: Response to defendants' letter from Phyllis Calistro. (sb) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter filed by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief addressed to Judge Kaplan from William S.J. Fraenkel, dated 2/27/03, re: In response to Mr. Levy's 2/26/03. (sb) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Jude Kaplan from Phyllis Calistro, dated 2/26/03; reset defendants summary judgment motion deadline for 3/11/03 ; denying defendants request that the Court order the plaintiffs to submit a valid and proper draft of the Pretrial Order to us by the close of business tomorrow, 2/27/03 . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); (pl) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from Richard A. Levy, dated 2/27/03. Re: counsel for pltff requests that the Court direct the parties to exchange their reports as prepared and to direct the City to identify in what way, if any, the data and pltffs' findings are affected by the latest claimed problem with the database. Application granted . ( by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (db) (Entered: 03/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from Richard A. Levy, dated 2/26/03. Counsel for plaintiff requests that the Court direct that the parties exchange their expert reports no later than 3/4/03, based on the last database which was provided to the Plaintiffs and the Defendants by the NYPD, the defendants are precluded from raising any claims or objections with respect to the validity of the underlying data as last provided by the NYPD. In addition, the defendants shall immediately provide the disciplinary case numbers - or other means of matching officers and race -- as directed in the 12/5/02 Consent Order. Application denied. ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (sb) (Entered: 03/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from Richard A. Levy, dated 12/24/02. Re: Counsel for plaintiff want to move to compel responses to a vary limited number of plaintiffs' interrogatories. Upon consideration of defendants' response, dated 2/6/03, this application is denied. This request does not comply with my 12/12/02 order and is excessive . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ). (tp) (Entered: 02/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, set telephone conference for 5:00 p.m. on 2/18/03 . ( signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox ); Copies faxed and mailed by chambers. (kw) (Entered: 02/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter filed addressed to Judge Kaplan from Stuart I. Parker, dated 02/06/03; re: opposing plaintiffs counsel's December 24, 2002 letter application to compel answers to numerous interrogatories. (djc) (Entered: 02/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from Richard A. Levy, dated 1/28/03. Counsel requests a direction from the court to the City that it produce Dr. James Fyfe for up to an additional 3 hours of deposition. Upon consideration of defendants' response, dated 1/29/03, application denied. ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (sb) (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/31/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan for the date(s) of 11/25/02. (dt) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Hon. Lewis A. Kaplan from Richard A. Levy, dated 12/20/02. counsel for plaintiffs request an extension of time to complete discovery, including expert reports, until the end of January 2003. In the spirit of the season, the application is granted. The season will be be over, and the spirt has been exhausted. Absolutely no more! ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); (yv) (Entered: 12/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER; regarding the issues raised by the parties regarding respnses to discovery request; the Court rules as follows: the numbered paragraphs of this order corresponding to the numbers paragraphs of plaintiffs' 12/3/02 letter; in reaching this dosposition, the Court has considered the various points made in the parties' letters, the extent of the discovery previously conducted, and the likely burden and expense of the proposed discovery as compared with its likely benefit, taking into account the needs of the case, the amount in controversy, the parties' resources, the importance of the issues involved, and the importance of the proposed discovery in resolving those issues. To the extent, if any, that plaintiffs have sought an order compelling production beyond that granted above, the request is denied . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); (pl) (Entered: 12/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter filed by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Manuel Delgado, Parnell Peterson, Hiram Monserrate, Fernando Sanchez addressed to Judge Kaplan from Diane Paolicelli, dated 12/3/02; re: proposed Consent Order regarding production of documents. (pl) (Entered: 12/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter filed by The City of New York addressed to Judge Kaplan from Stuart I. Parkeer, dated 12/5/02, re: in response to Ms. Paolicelli's 12/3/02 letter and to request that the matters raised in her letter to be addressed before the Court at a conference. (kw) (Entered: 12/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter filed by plaintiffs addressed to Judge Kaplan from Richard A. Levy, dated 12/10/02, re: responding to defendants' letter to the Court dated 12/5/02. (kw) Modified on 12/17/2002 (Entered: 12/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT ORDER, defendant shall produce the document set forth in this document to plaintiffs or a statement under oath that after a diligent search no responisve documents could be found, no later than 12/17/02 . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); (kw) (Entered: 12/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum to Docket Clerk: Pretrial conference held on 11/25/02. Court Reporter Christine Arendz Deich. All discovery to be concluded by 1/10/03. Joint Pretrial Order due 2/11/03. (sb) (Entered: 12/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Fox from Pamela Jeffrey, dated 11/25/02. counsel for plaintiffs request that the conference scheduled for 11/26/02 at 2:30 p.m. be adjourned without date. Application granted . ( signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox ); (yv) (Entered: 11/27/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Magistrate Fox from Pamela Jeffrey, dated 10/29/02. counsel for plaintiffs request that the conference be adjourned. Application granted. The conference is adjourned to 11/26/02 at 11:30 a.m. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox ); (yv) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, that on or before 10/9/02, consistent with the discussion held via telephone conference held on 9/18/02, the parties shall submit ex parte confidential writings to the Court to aid it in assisting the parties at a settlement conference concerning attorneys' fees , and a settlement conference shall be held on 10/18/02 at 10:30 a.m. in courtroom 519, 40 Centre Street . ( signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox ); (dle) Modified on 09/27/2002 (Entered: 09/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Discovery Motion or other Motion which does not require a report and recommendation and see 8/8/02 letter and endorsement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (yv) (Entered: 08/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from Diane Paolicelli, dated 8/8/02. Re: plaintiffs requests that Your Honor appoint a magistrate to oversee a non-binding mediation of the legal fee determination for the within stated individual plaintiffs; referred to MJ assigned . ( signed by Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies mailed. (pl) (Entered: 08/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION #87244, granting in part, denying in part [23-1] motion for an order to certifying a class of pltffs purs. to F.R.C.P. 23(a), 23(b)(1)(A), 23(b)(2) and 23(b)(3). The Court bifurcates plntfs' claims and certifies the liability stage of the claims, as discussed (within) for class treatment under Rule 23(b)(2) ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies mailed. (cd) (Entered: 08/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan for the date(s) of 6/26/02 at 10:00 a.m. (ph) (Entered: 08/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 47 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (js) (Entered: 07/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Manuel Delgado, Parnell Peterson, Hiram Monserrate, Fernando Sanchez in opposition to [34-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment dismissing the claims in this action of plaintiffs Charles Castro, Fernando Sanchez and Reuben Malave for damages and equitable relief based on their terminations from the New York City Police Department . (db) (Entered: 04/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Manuel Delgado, Parnell Peterson, Hiram Monserrate, Fernando Sanchez in response to Court's 4/4/02 Order. (db) (Entered: 04/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, regarding the aforementioned issues, the parties are directed to brief this issue, and any others that are fairly related to it, and to file such briefs no later than 4/20/02 . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies mailed. (tp) (Entered: 04/05/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and ORDER, regarding procedures that will govern the handling "Confidential Attorney-Only Materials" . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (kw) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Completion of all discovery by 11/30/02. Service of summary judgment motions by 2/1/03. Filing of pretrial order, proposed jury instructions and requested voir dire questions; case ready for trial, on 2/1/03. Following trial materials to be filed at least 10 days before trial: trial brief stating legal and factual issues and authorities relied upon and discussing any anticipated substantive or procedural problems; and motions in limine. ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies mailed. (sn) Modified on 02/07/2002 (Entered: 02/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Stuart I. Parker by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief in support Re: [34-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment dismissing the claims in this action of plaintiffs Charles Castro, Fernando Sanchez and Reuben Malave for damages and equitable relief based on their terminations from the New York City Police Department . (yv) (Entered: 01/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief re: [36-1] opposition memorandum (yv) (Entered: 01/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from Richard A. Levy, dated 12/26/01; counsel to parties' request to hold motion (for a protective order) in abeyance pending the completion of the described 30(b)(6) deposition is denied without prejudice to renewal ; ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies mailed. (djc) (Entered: 01/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/28/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COUNTER STATEMENT TO RULE 56.1 filed by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa (db) (Entered: 01/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/28/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Diane Paolicelli by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa in opposition to [34-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment dismissing the claims in this action of plaintiffs Charles Castro, Fernando Sanchez and Reuben Malave for damages and equitable relief based on their terminations from the New York City Police Department . (db) (Entered: 01/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/28/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa in opposition to [34-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment dismissing the claims in this action of plaintiffs Charles Castro, Fernando Sanchez and Reuben Malave for damages and equitable relief based on their terminations from the New York City Police Department . (db) (Entered: 01/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief in support of [34-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment dismissing the claims in this action of plaintiffs Charles Castro, Fernando Sanchez and Reuben Malave for damages and equitable relief based on their terminations from the New York City Police Department. (kkc) (Entered: 12/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief; for an Order pursuant to Rule 56 of the FRCP for summary judgment dismissing the claims in this action of plaintiffs Charles Castro, Fernando Sanchez and Reuben Malave for damages and equitable relief based on their terminations from the New York City Police Department . No return date set. Rule 56.1 Statement, Declaration of Stuart I. Parker attached. Exhibits Volume 1 to 3 attached. (kkc) Modified on 12/06/2001 (Entered: 12/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW by plaintiffs in further support of: [23-1] motion for an order to certifying a class of pltffs purs. F.R.C.P. 23(a), 23(b)(1)(A), 23(b)(2) and 23(b)(3). (kkc) Modified on 03/29/2001 (Entered: 03/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/27/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER withdrawing on consent w/o prejudice to renewal [23-1] motion for an order certifying a class of pltffs purs. to F.R.C.P. 23(a), 23(b)(1)(A), 23(b)(2) and 23(b)(3); ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan Copies mailed. (lf) Modified on 03/29/2001 (Entered: 03/28/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/27/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order, that parties proceed to mediation with Susan T. Mackenzie, Esq., as mediator on the terms of agreement reached amoung the parties on their own volition and without compulsion by the Court. ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ). (Copy sent document to the Civil Case Management/Mediation). (kw) (Entered: 03/28/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from Alani Golanski, dated 3/6/01, granting plntfs' request for permission to serve a memorandum of law that exceeds the Court's page limit by 10 pages ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies mailed. (cd) (Entered: 03/12/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATIONS of Anderson, Lubin, Kennedy, Melican AND EXHIBITS by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police in support Re: [23-1] motion for an order to certifying a class of pltffs purs. to F.R.C.P. 23(a), 23(b)(1)(A), 23(b)(2) and 23(b)(3) . (lf) (Entered: 02/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW by The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief in opposition to [23-1] motion for an order to certifying a class of pltffs purs. to F.R.C.P. 23(a), 23(b)(1)(A), 23(b)(2) and 23(b)(3) . (lf) (Entered: 02/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from Amy F. Melican, dated 2/14/01. Granting defendants' request for permission to file a memorandum of law in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for class certification that does not exceed 50 pages . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies mailed. (kw) (Entered: 02/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan for the date(s) of 12/4/00. (sac) (Entered: 02/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from Julie O'Neill, Asst Corp Counsel, dated 1/24/01; deft's response to motion reset to 2/21/01 for [23-1] motion to certifying a class of pltffs purs. to F.R.C.P. 23(a), 23(b)(1)(A), 23(b)(2) and 23(b)(3) ; reset discovery due for 3/25/01 ; the parties request appointment of a Magistrate Judge to asist them in discovery; no magistrate ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies mailed. (lam) (Entered: 02/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by pltffs' in support of [23-1] motion for an order to certifying a class of pltffs purs. F.R.C.P. 23(a), 23(b)(1)(A), 23(b)(2) and 23(b)(3) . (lf) (Entered: 12/18/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION by pltffs; for an order to certifying a class of pltffs purs. to F.R.C.P. 23(a), 23(b)(1)(A), 23(b)(2) and 23(b)(3) ; Return date 12/11/00; Affdvt. of Alani Golanski in support attached (lf) (Entered: 12/18/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and ORDER; pltffs shall have until 12/15/00, to file their motion for class certification. Defts' response shall be due on 1/26/01 . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (sn) (Entered: 11/15/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from Diane Paolicelli, dated 8/17/00. The discovery deadline is extended to 2/28/01. The class motion shall be filed by 11/15/00. The pretrial order and any motions for summary judgment shall be filed by 4/30/01. The Court reserves judgment as to bifurcation or severance pending receipt of the class motion . ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies mailed. (kw) (Entered: 09/08/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/26/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, denying [0-1] motion for an order purs. to Local Rule 15(a) of the Rules for the Division of Business Among District Judges transferring either Guardians Assoc. of the Police Dep't of N.Y., Inc. v. City of New York, 99 Civ. 4960 (MGC), or Latino Officers Assoc. City of New York, Inc. et al. v. City of N.Y., No. 99 Civ. 9568 (LAK); denying [0-2] motion for an order purs. to Rule 42(a) of the F.R.C.P. consolidating the actions shown above for pre-trial and trial purposes. ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies mailed. (sn) Modified on 07/31/2000 (Entered: 07/28/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/26/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of attorney appearance for Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Haydee Cartagena, Manuel Delgado, Parnell Peterson, Hiram Monserrate, Fernando Sanchez by Diane M. Paolicelli. (cd) (Entered: 07/27/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/24/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND PROTECITVE ORDER; regarding procedures that will govern the handling of confidential information; notwithstanding anything to the contrary herein, any papers filed under seal in this action may be made part of the public record on or after 3/24/05 unless the Court otherwise orders ; ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (ls) (Entered: 03/27/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/20/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER; granting [15-1] motion for leave for William H. Goodman and Barbara J. Olshansky to withdraw their appearance in this case. ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies mailed. (pl) (Entered: 03/22/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/7/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan for the date(s) of 1/5/00. (sac) (Entered: 03/07/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/20/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Haydee Cartagena, Manuel Delgado, Parnell Peterson, Hiram Monserrate, Fernando Sanchez for leave to withdraw its appearance in this case ; Return date not indicated. Attached is affidavit of William Goodman. (djc) Modified on 03/20/2000 (Entered: 03/02/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/3/1999, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa, Hector Ariza, Manuel Gomez, Christopher Castro, Haydee Cartagena, Manuel Delgado, Parnell Peterson, Hiram Monserrate, Fernando Sanchez (Answer due 12/23/99 for The Police Relief, for Charles V. Campisi, for Richard Kubick, for Joseph Flynn, for Patrick Bradley, for George Grasso, for Patrick Kelleher, for Howard Safir, for Rudolph W. Giuliani, for N.Y.P.D., for The City of New York) amending [6-1] amended complaint; Summons issued (ls) (Entered: 12/06/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER; pltffs shall serve a Second Amended Complaint on defts on 12/3/99 by hand delivering a copy of the Second Amended Complaint to the Office of the Corporation Counsel, attn: Julie E. O'Neill ; defts' shall answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint by 12/23/99. ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (sac) (Entered: 12/03/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/9/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT SCHEDULING ORDER: no add'l. parties may be joined after 1/8/00, assuming the class is certified; no amendments to the pleadings will be permitted after 1/8/00 assuming the class is certified; all discovery shall be completed on or before 8/31/00; a joint pretrial order in the form prescribed in Judge Kaplan's individual rules shall be filed on or before 12/31/00; ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); copies mailed (ls) (Entered: 11/09/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/8/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Kaplan from Julie E. O'Neill, dated 11/4/99; denying the parties request for a three week adjournment of the pretrial conference scheduled for 11/8/99 ; ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); copies mailed (ls) Modified on 11/10/1999 (Entered: 11/08/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/1/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time; that Michael D. Hess, Corporation Counsel of the City of New York appears in this case on behalf of all of the named defts and acknowledges that all named defts were served properly ; reset answer to the complt. due for 11/30/99 for The Police Relief, for Charles V. Campisi, for Richard Kubick, for Joseph Flynn, for Patrick Bradley, for George Grasso, for Patrick Kelleher, for Howard Safir, for Rudolph W. Giuliani, for N.Y.P.D., for The City of New York ; ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ) (ls) (Entered: 11/03/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/8/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of service as to The City of New York, Rudolph W. Giuliani by personal service on 10/7/99. Answer due on 10/27/99 for The City of New York, for Rudolph W. Giuliani (pl) (Entered: 10/19/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/8/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of service as to The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief by personal service on 10/7/99 . . (pl) (Entered: 10/19/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/8/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of service as to The City of New York, N.Y.P.D., Rudolph W. Giuliani, Howard Safir, Patrick Kelleher, George Grasso, Patrick Bradley, Joseph Flynn, Richard Kubick, Charles V. Campisi, The Police Relief by mail on 10/7/99 . Answer due on 10/27/99 for The City of New York, for N.Y.P.D., for Rudolph W. Giuliani, for Howard Safir, for Patrick Kelleher, for George Grasso, for Patrick Bradley, for Joseph Flynn, for Richard Kubick, for Charles V. Campisi, for The Police Relief . (pl) (Entered: 10/19/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/7/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu, Daniel Figueroa; (Answer due 10/20/99 for The Police Relief, for Charles V. Campisi, for Richard Kubick, for Joseph Flynn, for Patrick Bradley, for George Grasso, for Patrick Kelleher, for Howard Safir, for Rudolph W. Giuliani, for N.Y.P.D., for The City of New York ); amending [1-1] complaint; Summons issued (ls) (Entered: 10/12/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE SCHEDULING AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; counsel for all parties are directed to confer regarding an agreed scheduling order. If counsel are able to agree on a schedule and the agreed schedule calls for filing of the pretrial order not more than 6 months from the date of this order, counsel shall sign and file within 45 days from the date hereof a consent order in the form annexed for consideration by the Court. If such a consent order is not filed within the time provided, a conference will be held on 11/8/99 at 11:00 a.m., in Courtroom 12D, 500 Pearl St. ( signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan ); Copies mailed. (sac) (Entered: 09/23/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/16/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of assignment to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Robert H. Spergel, William Goodman, Barbara J. Olshansky, and Richard A. Levy. (em) (Entered: 09/20/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/9/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Latino Officers, Wilfred Maldonado, Anthony Miranda, Manuel Nunez, Clifford Muniz, Adam Alvarez, Charles Castro, Louis Vega, Thaddeus Gamory, Michael Padilla, Carlos Jimenez, Jose Mercedes, Ruben Malave, Hilda Susu and Daniel Figueroa. (em) (Entered: 09/10/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/9/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed Plaintiffs' Statement of Relatedness pursuant to Local Rule 1.6. (em) (Entered: 09/10/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/9/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT filed; Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c); FILING FEE $150.00. RECEIPT # 353998. (em) (Entered: 09/10/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 160 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?