TCYK, LLC v. Doe
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00525

Tags
Last Updated October 11, 2016 at 4:40 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 6/24/2013 Letter
Letter (rew)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: 6/3/2013 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [3] motion for discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 6/03/13. (rew)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: 5/31/2013, Terminated: 6/3/2013 Motion for Discovery
      MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: 5/31/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
        Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Bass, Leon)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: 5/31/2013 Complaint
          COMPLAINT For Copyright Infringement against John 1-12 Doe ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4124742), filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B) (Bass, Leon)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 83 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?