Cellular Communications Equipment LLC v. HTC Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00507

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 4, 2017 at 6:46 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael James Fagan, Jr. +1 985 320 6924 mikefagan81@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
Space Brent Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 bbumgardner@nbclaw.net
Space Thomas Christopher Cecil +1 817 806 3812 +1 817 377 3485 tcecil@nbclaw.net
Space Steven Brannon Latimer +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 blatimer@nbclaw.net
Space Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
Space Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
v.
AT&T, Inc. AT&T, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Ncr Corp
Unknown Role, At Home Corp
Unknown Role, Net2phone, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mail.com, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean Christian Platt +1 858 314 1156 +1 858 314 1500 cplatt@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Wood Kennerly +1 650 320 1800 +1 650 320 1900 chriskennerly@paulhastings.com
Space Sean Christian Platt +1 858 720 2500 +1 858 720 2555 christianplatt@paulhastings.com
AT&T Mobility LLC AT&T Mobility LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Debra Elaine Gunter +1 903 595 3111 debby@yw-lawfirm.com
Space Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com
No Logo Boost Mobile, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Cellco Partnership, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M Dunham +1 202 282 5852 +1 202 282 5100 tdunham@winston.com
Space Sarah J. Kalemeris skalemeris@winston.com
Space Charles B. Molster +1 202 282 5988 +1 202 282 5100 cmolster@winston.com
Space Corrine M Saylor +1 202 282 5000 +1 202 282 5100 csaylor@winston.com
No Logo Exedea Inc, Defendant
No Logo HTC America Inc, Defendant
No Logo HTC Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicole S Cunningham +1 619 544 3112 +1 858 236 1995 nicole.cunningham@pillsburylaw.com
Space Inge Larish +1 619 234 5000 +1 619 236 1995 inge.larish@pillsburylaw.com
Space Steven A Moore +1 619 544 3112 +1 858 346 9392 steve.moore@pillsburylaw.com
Sprint Nextel Corporation Sprint Nextel Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rouse Hendricks German May PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark W McGrory +1 816 471 7700 +1 816 471 2221 markm@rhgm.com
Space Lawrence A Rouse +1 816 471 7711 +1 816 471 2221 larryr@rhgm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Weber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert William Weber +1 903 223 5656 +1 903 223 5652 bweber@smithweber.com
No Logo Sprint Solutions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Sprint Spectrum, LP, Defendant
T-Mobile USA, Inc. T-Mobile USA, Inc., Defendant
Verizon Communications, Inc. Verizon Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV +1 903 597 8311 patrickclutter@potterminton.com
Space Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
Amazon.com, Inc. Amazon.com, Inc., Consol Defendant
Unknown Role, Drugstore.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, Audible, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. David Hadden +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200 dhadden@fenwick.com
Space Ravi Ragavendra Ranganath +1 650 335 7614 +1 650 938 5200 rranganath@fenwick.com
Space Saina Sason Shamilov +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200 sshamilov@fenwick.com
Space Eman Sojoodi +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 esojoodi@fenwick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Haltom & Doan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Haltom Doan +1 903 255 1000 +1 903 255 0800 jdoan@haltomdoan.com
Space Joshua Reed Thane +1 903 255 1000 +1 903 255 0800 jthane@haltomdoan.com
Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roger Brian Craft +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 bcraft@findlaycraft.com
Space Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 efindlay@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mavrakakis Law Group LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Kwok +1 650 804 7800 bkwok@mavllp.com
Space Howard E Levin +1 312 216 1620 +1 312 216 1621 hlevin@mavllp.com
Space Christopher R Lubeck +1 650 804 7800 +1 650 852 9224 clubeck@mavllp.com
Space Thomas Christos Mavrakakis +1 650 804 7800 mav@mavllp.com
Space Michael T Pieja +1 650 804 7800 mpieja@mavllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ashlee Nicole Lin +1 213 892 4459 +1 213 892 4759 ashlee.lin@milbank.com
Space Miguel Ruiz +1 213 892 4000 +1 213 629 5063 Mruiz@milbank.com
Space Mark C Scarsi +1 213 892 4000 +1 213 629 5063 mscarsi@milbank.com
Space Michael K Sheen +1 213 892 4427 msheen@milbank.com
AT&T Mobility LLC AT&T Mobility LLC, Consol Defendant
No Logo Blackberry Corporation, Consol Defendant
BlackBerry Ltd. BlackBerry Ltd., Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "BlackBerry Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kurt Max Pankratz +1 214 953 6584 +1 214 661 4584 kurt.pankratz@bakerbotts.com
Space Harrison Gheens Rich +1 214 953 6896 +1 214 661 4896 harrison.rich@bakerbotts.com
No Logo Boost Mobile, LLC, Consol Defendant
No Logo Cellco Partnership, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles B. Molster +1 202 282 5988 +1 202 282 5100 cmolster@winston.com
Dell, Inc. Dell, Inc., Consol Defendant
Unknown Role, Perot Systems Corp
Unknown Role, Quest Software, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roger Joseph Fulghum +1 713 229 1707 +1 713 229 2707 roger.fulghum@bakerbotts.com
Space Tammy M Pennington +1 713 229 1972 +1 713 229 7772 tammy.pennington@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Dacus Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deron R Dacus +1 903 705 1117 +1 903 705 1117 ddacus@dacusfirm.com
Space Shannon Marie Dacus +1 903 705 1117 +1 903 705 1117 sdacus@dacusfirm.com
LG Electronics USA, Inc. LG Electronics USA, Inc., Consol Defendant
LG Electronics, Inc. LG Electronics, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael W Maas +1 202 263 3000 +1 202 263 3300 mmaas@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Justin Barrow +1 202 263 3154 +1 202 830 0307 wbarrow@mayerbrown.com
Space Jamie B Beaber +1 202 263 3000 +1 202 263 3300 jbeaber@mayerbrown.com
Space Tiffany A Miller +1 202 263 3000 +1 202 263 3300 tmiller@mayerbrown.com
Space Robert Gary Pluta +1 312 701 8641 +1 312 701 7711 rpluta@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Consol Defendant
Unknown Role, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Unknown Role, Facebook, Inc.
Unknown Role, Visiocorp
Unknown Role, Immersion Corp
Unknown Role, Avanade Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel John Galligan +1 214 478 9233 dangalligan@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Microsoft Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David E. Killough +1 425 703 8865 +1 425 869 1327 davkill@microsoft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert John Benson +1 949 567 6700 +1 949 567 6710 rbenson@orrick.com
Space I. Neel Chatterjee +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 nchatterjee@orrick.com
Space Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Cederoth +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036 rcederoth@sidley.com
Space Nathaniel C. Love +1 312 853 7804 +1 312 853 7036 nlove@sidley.com
Space John W McBride +1 312 853 7000 jwmcbride@sidley.com
Space DAVID T. PRITIKIN +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036 dpritikin@sidley.com
Space Ellen Sue Robbins +1 312 853 7000 erobbins@sidley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
NEC Casio Mobile Communications, Ltd. NEC Casio Mobile Communications, Ltd., Consol Defendant
NEC Corporation Of America NEC Corporation Of America, Consol Defendant
No Logo Pan Tech, Company, Ltd., Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "Pantech Co., Ltd."

Toggle Switch Represented by H.C. Park & Associates, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Oluwaseun O. Ajayi +1 703 544 9213 oajayi@park-law.com
Space Brendan Padraig O'Shea +1 703 544 9257 +1 703 288 5139 boshea@park-law.com
Space Alan Arthur Wright +1 703 288 5105 +1 703 288 5139 awright@park-law.com
No Logo Pantech Wireless, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Sprint Solutions, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Sprint Spectrum, LP, Consol Defendant
T-Mobile USA, Inc. T-Mobile USA, Inc., Consol Defendant
ZTE USA, Inc. ZTE USA, Inc., Consol Defendant
ZTE Corporation ZTE Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Everett Upshaw, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A Bailey +1 972 372 4235 +1 214 865 6086 davidbailey@everettupshaw.com
Space Everett McClyde Upshaw +1 214 680 6005 +1 214 865 6086 everettupshaw@everettupshaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space william.atkins@pillsburylaw.com
ZTE Solutions, Inc. ZTE Solutions, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo David Folsom, Special Master

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Folsom +1 903 255 3251 +1 903 255 3266 dfolsom@jw.com
No Logo David Keyzer, Technical Advisor

Toggle Switch Represented by 5170 Golden Foothill Parkway

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Keyzer +1 916 243 5259 +1 916 404 0436 david@keyzerlaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (594) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 3/26/2016, Entered: None Amended Answer to Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Counterclaim
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Amended Answer to Complaint
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 1/18/2016, Entered: None Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling, Protective or Discovery Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 12/24/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Mediation Completion due by 3/1/2016. Jury Selection set for 6/20/2016 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Jury Trial set for 6/20/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Pretrial Conference set for 6/13/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/30/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling, Protective or Discovery Order
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 11/14/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 390 Amended Complaint, by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc..(Elsea, Zachary) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Sever
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Sever
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Order of Reference (Title 28 U.S.C. 636(c))
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 9/22/2015 re 455 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 453 Docket Control Order; 437 MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions and to Strike Defendants' Supplemental Invalidity Contentions; and the 396 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Contributory Infringement Claims. (Court Reporter Brenda Butler.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheets) (leh, ) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 471 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION To Prevent Disclosure of Protected Information and for Disqualification of Dr. Alon Konchitsky by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Nicholas Fung, # 2 Ex. 1, # 3 Ex. 2, # 4 Affidavit Jeffrey Comeau, # 5 Ex. A, # 6 Ex. B, # 7 Ex. C, # 8 Ex. D, # 9 Ex. E, # 10 Ex. F, # 11 Ex. G, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling, Protective or Discovery Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Additional Attachments to Main Document: 442 Response in Opposition to Motion,.. (Beaber, Jamie) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 437 MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions and to Strike Defendants' Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Beaber, Jamie) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 437 MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions and to Strike Defendants' Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Apple Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell for all pretrial purposes. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/30/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Markman Hearing held on 4/9/2015 before Judge Nicole Mitchell. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jill McFadden,Telephone number: (903)530-3163. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2015. (tlh, ) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Patent Invalidity Contentions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple Inc. regarding Compliance with Supplemental Invalidity Contentions (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap for all further proceedings. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/28/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Markman Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Claim Construction Chart/Prehearing Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Reply to Claim Construction Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court adopts the claim constructions as set forth in this Order. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness 287 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/09/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Claim Construction Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - 820 Patent, # 2 Exhibit - Dictionaries, # 3 Exhibit - Table of Dictionary Definitions, # 4 Exhibit - 8923 Patent, # 5 Exhibit - IPR Response)(Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Claim Construction Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Claim Construction Chart/Prehearing Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 345 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/21/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell for purposes of Claim Construction only. The undersigned will continue to oversee all other matters. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/08/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/08/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Markman Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Markman Hearing held on 12/15/2014. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign In Sheets) (cwk) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 287 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 12, # 4 Exhibit 14, # 5 Exhibit 15)(Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Claim Construction Chart/Prehearing Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Reply to Claim Construction Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 11/22/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a) (Benson, Robert) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 11/15/2014, Entered: None Claim Construction Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 11/15/2014, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation. Responses due by 12/2/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Claim Construction Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 263 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael T Pieja terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/14/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part 258 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/07/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Claim Construction Chart/Prehearing Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Claim Construction Chart/Prehearing Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Sever
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC Regarding Compliance With Initial Disclosures (Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Proposed Modifications to Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Scarsi, Mark) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey D Comeau on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4749413. (Comeau, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Howard E Levin on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4741045. (Levin, Howard) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brian Kwok on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4741035. (Kwok, Brian) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael T Pieja on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4741026. (Pieja, Michael) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas C Mavrakakis on behalf of Apple Inc. (Mavrakakis, Thomas) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 214 Motion for Extension of Time for Apple Inc. to Submit its objections to the existing Discovery Order, Order Regarding E-Discovery, and Protective Order. The deadline to file objections to the existing Protective Order 115 is 7/16/2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/10/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to Discovery Order, Order Regarding E-Discovery, and Protective Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 213 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document (Plaintiff's Surreply Regarding Defendant Apple's Joinder to Motion to modify docket control order (No. 154). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Edward) Modified on 7/9/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 212 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 196 MOTION for Joinder to Defendants' Motion to Modify Docket Docket Control Order filed by Apple Inc.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 209 Motion for Extension of Time. Apple shall have to 7-09-2014 to submit its objections to the existing Discovery Order 96 , Order Regarding E-Discovery 97 , and Protective Order 115 . No further extensions will be granted absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/07/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to Discovery Order, Order Regarding E-Discovery, and Protective Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership, Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc. re Service of P.R. 4-1 Disclosures (Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC of Compliance (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc. re Service of P.R. 4-1 Disclosures (Kennerly, Christopher) Modified on 6/30/2014 (mjc, ). (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 205 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 196 MOTION for Joinder to Defendants' Motion to Modify Docket Docket Control Order filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashlee Lin on behalf of Apple Inc. (Lin, Ashlee) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael K Sheen on behalf of Apple Inc. (Sheen, Michael) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Miguel Ruiz on behalf of Apple Inc. (Ruiz, Miguel) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Eugene Cadwell on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Cadwell, Kevin) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harrison Gheens Rich on behalf of BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited (Rich, Harrison) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roshan Suresh Mansinghani on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Mansinghani, Roshan) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roshan Suresh Mansinghani on behalf of BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited (Mansinghani, Roshan) Modified on 6/26/2014 (mjc, ). (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 195 Motion for Extension of Time. Apple shall have to 7-02-2014 to submit its objections to the existing Discovery Order, Order Regarding E-Discovery, and Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/25/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Joinder to Defendants' Motion to Modify Docket Docket Control Order by Apple Inc.. (Scarsi, Mark) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to Discovery Order, Order Regarding E-Discovery, and Protective Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. Cause No. 6:14cv251 shall be consolidated with the existing consolidated cases in Cause No. 6:13cv507 for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. Cause No. 6:13cv507 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All future motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. The existing Docket Control Order (Cause No. 6:13-cv-507, Docket No. 123) shall govern as to all parties in the consolidated action. The parties may meet and confer and file the appropriate motion to amend the Docket Control Order for any dates or deadlines prior to the 11-18-2014 Markman hearing as necessary. The existing Discovery Order (Docket No. 96), Order Regarding E-Discovery (Docket No. 97), and Protective Order (Docket No. 115) shall govern as to all parties in the consolidated action barring objection by any newly consolidated party within seven days of this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/17/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 192 Motion to Extend Time. The deadline for Defendants to join additional parties, assert counterclaims, and assert inequitable conduct allegations without leave of court is extended to the date upon which Defendants file their answers. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/16/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline for Defendants to 1) Join Additional Parties, 2) Assert Counterclaims, and 3) Add Inequitable Conduct Allegations to Pleadings by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 190 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debra Elaine Gunter terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/13/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Debby E. Gunter by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 189 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 151 SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 187 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney S Christian Platt terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/9/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney S. Christian Platt by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 154 MOTION to Amend/Correct 123 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 184 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daniel John Galligan terminated as counsel for Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/6/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Daniel Galligan by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Galligan, Daniel) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that Microsoft's original motion to dismiss or transfer, Cause No. 6:13-cv-738, Docket No. 9, is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/03/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael E Jones (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina Marie Von der Ahe on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Von der Ahe, Christina) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Support re 154 MOTION to Amend/Correct 123 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, filed by ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Upshaw, Everett) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicole S Cunningham on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation (Cunningham, Nicole) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Inge Larish on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation (Larish, Inge) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William P Atkins on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation (Atkins, William) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven A Moore on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation (Moore, Steven) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 175 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 151 SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Cederoth, Richard) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Amazon.com, Inc. of Compliance re Early Production of Agreements and Summary Sales Data (Ranganath, Ravi) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation of Compliance Regarding Early Production of Agreements and Summary Sales Data (Cunningham, Nicole) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC of Compliance with Court's Order Regarding Disclosure of Plaintiff's Position Regarding Asserted Patents and Other Related Disclosures (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation Notice of Compliance with Court's Order Regarding Early Production of Agreements and Summary Sales Data (Bailey, David) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 170 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 151 SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part 153 Motion for Extension of Time and to Expand Number of Terms. The Motion is GRANTED as to extending the deadline to comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 and it is hereby ORDERED that the deadline extended to 8-04-2014. The Motion is DENIED as to expanding the number of terms for the first Markman hearing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/19/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. of Service of Early Production of Agreements and Summary Sales Data (Weber, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 167 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 154 MOTION to Amend/Correct 123 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Of Compliance Regarding Early Production of Agreements and Summary Sales Data (Benson, Robert) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Early Production of Agreements and Sales Data (Dixon, Douglas) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Early Production of Agreements and Sales Data (Maas, Michael) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cellco Partnership Inc. regarding Compliance with Early Damages Disclosures (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc. Of Compliance Regarding Early Production Of Agreements And Summary Sales Data (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America Defendants NEC Corporation of America, Inc., NEC Casio Mobile Communications, Ltd., and AT&T Mobility LLC's Notice of Compliance Regarding Early Production of Agreements and Summary Sales Data (Rambo, Rick) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited Notice of Compliance (Pankratz, Kurt) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC Of Compliance Regarding Early Production Of Agreements And Summary Sales Data (Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 107 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, 110 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, 109 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, 112 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, 116 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, 113 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, 114 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, 111 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 107 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, 110 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, 112 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, 116 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, 113 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, 114 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, 111 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A Bailey on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation (Bailey, David) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 109 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Dell, Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct 123 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Upshaw, Everett) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2014: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to (1) Extend the Deadline to Comply With P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 and (2) Expand the Number of Terms/Phrases for the First Markman by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, Dell, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 123 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, of Compliance re Microsoft's Initial Disclosures (Cederoth, Richard) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 151 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Nathaniel C. Love, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit P, # 20 Exhibit Q, # 21 Exhibit R, # 22 Exhibit S, # 23 Exhibit T, # 24 Exhibit U, # 25 Exhibit V, # 26 Exhibit W, # 27 Exhibit X, # 28 Exhibit Y, # 29 Supplement Z, # 30 Text of Proposed Order)(Cederoth, Richard) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nathaniel C Love on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4640523. (Love, Nathaniel) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 148 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall have an extension to 5-02-2014, in which to modify the Docket Control Order regarding limits established for the first Markman. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/29/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File , Unopposed MOTION Motion to Extend The Deadline To Submit Motion to Modify DCO Regarding Limits Established For the First Markman by AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying as moot 53 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/25/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 107 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, 110 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, 109 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, 112 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, 116 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, 113 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, 114 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, 111 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 144 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' deadline to submit motions to modify the Docket Control Order regarding limits established for the first Markman is extended to 4-28-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/22/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Modify the Docket Control Order Regarding Limits Established for the First Markman by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Dixon, Douglas) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Oluwaseun Olugbolade Ajayi on behalf of Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc. (Ajayi, Oluwaseun) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation (Larish, Inge) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Mobility LLC Of Compliance Regarding Service Of Initial Disclosures (Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cellco Partnership Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Amazon.com, Inc. re Service of Initial Disclosures (Ranganath, Ravi) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Beaber, Jamie) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation for Serving Initial Disclosures pursuant to Paragraph 1 of the Docket Control Order (Bailey, David) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cellco Partnership Inc. (Notice of Compliance regarding Initial Disclosures) (Pankratz, Kurt) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited (BlackBerry's Notice of Compliance regarding Initial Disclosures) (Pankratz, Kurt) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Service of Initial Disclosures (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. Notice of Compliance of Service of Initial Disclosures (Dixon, Douglas) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Dell, Inc. Notice of Compliance re Service of Initial Disclosures (Fulghum, Roger) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. Notice of Compliance of Service of Initial Disclosures (Weber, Robert) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America Notice of Compliance re Service of Initial Disclosures (Rambo, Rick) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC of Compliance (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by David Folsom re 127 Notice (Other) ORDER OF CONTINUANCE (Folsom, David) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC Joint Notice Regarding Special Master Status Conference (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David E Killough on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Killough, David) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Indra Neel Chatterjee on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Chatterjee, Indra) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert J Benson on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Benson, Robert) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Jury Selection set for 4/4/2016 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 4/11/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. First Markman Hearing set for 11/18/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Second Markman Hearing set for 3/19/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/15/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER that the curret stay in this case be lifted either when settlement negotiations between Microsoft and Acacia Research Corp. reach an impasse or on 5-01-2014, whichever is earlier. At that time, all deadlines applicable to Microsoft in this case shall resume. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/14/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION For Entry Of Docket Control Order by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Arthur Wright on behalf of Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc. (Wright, Alan) (Entered: 04/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brendan Padraig O'Shea on behalf of Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc. (O'Shea, Brendan) (Entered: 04/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tammy M Pennington Rhodes on behalf of Dell, Inc. (Pennington Rhodes, Tammy) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 85 Notice of Competing Docket Control Order Proposals. The Court adopts the Plaintiff's position. The Markman hearing previously scheduled for 1-22-2015 in these cases is hereby CANCELLED. The Markman hearings set for 11-18-2014 and 3-19-2015 remain as scheduled. The parties are hereby ORDERED to meet and confer and submit a joint proposed Docket Control Order incorporating this change and all previously set dates by 4-14-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/08/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pankratz, Kurt) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/08/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim by AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim by AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim by AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim by AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by David Folsom NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE (MONDAY, APRIL 28, 2014) (Folsom, David) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambo, Rick) Modified on 4/8/2014 (mll, ). (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 106 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 105 Status Report. (Folsom, David) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER by David Folsom. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of David Folsom)(Folsom, David) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Protective order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 102 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the parties to submit proposed Protective Order is extended to 4-04-2014. No further extensions will be granted absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/31/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael W Maas on behalf of LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Maas, Michael) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Special Master. David Folsom appointed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/26/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on 2/26/14 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/28/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2014. (sms, ) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 94 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' deadline to submit proposed Protective Order is extended to 3-28-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC of Compliance (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 481 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?