Janvey et al v. Proskauer Rose LLP et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-00477
District Judge David C Godbey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 7, 2017 at 1:08 AM EDT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Official Stanford Investors Committee, Plaintiff

Represented by Castillo Snyder PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Jesse R Castillo +1 210 630 4200 +1 210 630 4210 jcastillo@casnlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Edward C Snyder +1 210 630 4200 +1 210 630 4210 esnyder@casnlaw.com

Represented by NELIGAN FOLEY, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Douglas James Buncher +1 214 840 5300 +1 214 840 5301 dbuncher@neliganlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Nicholas Andrew Foley +1 214 840 5330 +1 214 840 5301 nfoley@neliganlaw.com

Represented by Strasburger & Price LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing John M Pinckney, III +1 210 250 6002 +1 210 250 6100 john.pinckney@strasburger.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Edward F Valdespino +1 210 250 6061 +1 210 250 6100 edward.valdespino@strasburger.com
No Logo Ralph S. Janvey, Plaintiff

Represented by Hohmann Taube & Summers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Christopher Wayne Ahart +1 512 472 5997 +1 512 472 5248 chrisa@hts-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Joseph F Brophy , +1 512 472 5997 +1 512 472 5248 joeb@hts-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Guy M Hohmann , +1 512 472 5997 +1 512 472 5248 guyh@hts-law.com
v.
No Logo Chadbourne & Parke, LLP, Defendant

Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Harry M Reasoner +1 713 758 2358 + 713 615 5173 hreasoner@velaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing William D. Sims, Jr. +1 214 220 7700 bsims@velaw.com
Proskauer Rose LLP Proskauer Rose LLP, Defendant

Represented by Carrington, Coleman, Sloman & Blumenthal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Neil Ross Burger +1 214 855 3076 +1 214 840 0120 nburger@ccsb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Bruce Collins +1 214 855 3000 +1 214 855 1333 bcollins@ccsb.com

Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Jonathan Chang +1 212 450 4000 jonathan.chang@davispolk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Richard Cooper +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 701 5800 richard.cooper@davispolk.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted James P. Rouhandeh +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3835 james.rouhandeh@dpw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com
No Logo Thomas V Sjoblom, Defendant

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing William B Mateja +1 214 747 5070 + 214 747 2091 mateja@fr.com

Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Joshua R. Hochberg +1 202 496 7691 +1 202 496 7756 jhochberg@mckennalong.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Mindy L Rattan +1 202 496 7691 mrattan@mckennalong.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 380 - Personal Property: Other Personal Property Damage
  Entries (176) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint MOTION to Continue Joint Motion to Continue Trial Date and Amend Scheduling Order filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A) (Buncher, Douglas) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 175 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S 165 MOTION TO COMPEL: To the extent he has not already done so, the court ORDERS Defendant Pablo M. Alvarado to fully and completely answer and respond to Request for Production numbers 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, and 14 and Interrogatory number 1 for the time period of April 1999 through December 2010, and serve such answers or responses on the Receiver no later than 7/10/2017. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 6/19/2017) (twd) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      REPLY filed by Ralph S. Janvey re: 165 MOTION to Compel (Arlington, David) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        REPLY filed by Proskauer Rose LLP re: 151 MOTION For Choice of Law Determination (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          RULE 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COUNTS 1, 4, 5, 6, AND 7 OF THE COMPLAINT: The allegations set forth in paragraph 254 of the Complaint shall be and hereby are withdrawn with prejudice to Plaintiffs reasserting them against Proskauer Rose LLP in this or in any other action. Plaintiffs voluntarily dismiss all claims against Proskauer Rose LLP asserted in Counts 1, 4, 5, 6, and 7 of the Complaint with prejudice to Plaintiffs reasserting them against Proskauer Rose LLP in this or any other action. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/28/2017) (ran) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 171 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Rule 41 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal With Prejudice of Counts 1, 4, 5, 6 and 7 of the Complaint re 1 Complaint,,,, by Ralph S. Janvey. (Buncher, Douglas) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Michael J Stanley on behalf of Pablo M. Alvarado. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Stanley, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                RESPONSE filed by Pablo M. Alvarado re: 165 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Stanley, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  (Document Restricted) Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee re 167 Response/Objection (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1-13) (Snyder, Edward) Modified security per atty on 4/21/2017 (epm). (Entered: 04/20/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    RESPONSE filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee re: 151 MOTION For Choice of Law Determination (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial reset for Court's two-week docket beginning 2/26/2018 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/6/2017) (aaa) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        The Receiver's MOTION to Compel Further Responses and the Production of Documents from Defendant Pablo M. Alvarado filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. With the Receiver's Appendix in Support and proposed order (Sadler, Kevin) NOTE: Originally filed in 3:10-cv-2584-N (twd) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RESPONSE and OPPOSITION filed by Ralph S. Janvey re: 160 Cross MOTION for Leave to File to Pursue Judicial Proceedings in Florida Court Challenging the Lis Pendens (Sadler, Kevin) NOTE: Originally filed in 3:10-cv-2584-N (twd) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re 160 MOTION to Extend the Lis Pendens on Defendant Alvarado's Property (Sadler, Kevin) NOTE: Originally filed in 3:10-cv-2584-N as document #129. (twd) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Cross MOTION for Leave to File to Pursue Judicial Proceedings in Florida Court Challenging the Lis Pendens filed by Pablo M. Alvarado with exhibits. (Stanley, Michael) NOTE: Originally filed in 3:10-cv-2584-N as document #123. (twd) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                RESPONSE filed by Pablo M. Alvarado re: 160 MOTION to Extend the Lis Pendens on Defendant Alvarado's Property with declaration. (Stanley, Michael) NOTE: Originally filed in 3:10-cv-2584-N as document #120. (twd) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION to Extend the Lis Pendens on Defendant Alvarado's Property filed by Ralph S. Janvey. With declaration of David Arlington, declaration of Karyl Van Tassel and Proposed Order. (Arlington, David) NOTE: Originally filed in 3:10-cv-2584-N as document #119. (twd) M (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ANSWER to 155 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand, filed by Pablo M. Alvarado. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Stanley, Michael) NOTE: Originally filed in 3:10-cv-2584-N as document #100. (twd) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER denying 156 , #82, #83 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. NOTE: Originally filed in 3:10-cv-2584-N as document #99. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/24/2015) (twd) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        RESPONSE filed by Ralph S. Janvey re: 156 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Powers, Scott) NOTE: Originally filed in 3:10-cv-2584-N as document #88. (twd) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Pablo M. Alvarado (Stanley, Michael) NOTE: Originally filed in 3:10-cv-2584-N as document #80. (twd) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Pablo M. Alvarado, Rebecca Hamric, Robert Glen Rigby filed by Ralph S. Janvey. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. NOTE: Originally filed in 3:10-cv-2584-N as document #73. (twd) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              AGREED ORDER REGARDING METHOD OF PRODUCTION OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS. NOTE: Originally filed in 3:10-cv-2584-N as document #51. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/19/2014) (twd) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Member case(s) 3:10-CV-2584 consolidated with lead case 3:13-CV-0477. All future docketing should be in lead case 3:13-CV-0477. This Order addresses the Receiver, OSIC, and Pablo Alvarado's joint motion to consolidate cases #132 in Janvey v. Alvarado, No. 3:10-CV-2584-N (N.D. Tex. filed 12/17/2010) (the "Alvarado Action") and Defendant Proskauer Rose, LLP's motion to continue 141 in Janvey v. Proskauer Rose, LLP, No. 3:13-CV0477-N (N.D. Tex. filed 1/31/2013) (the "Proskauer Action"). The Court grants both motions and will enter separately a new scheduling order in the Proskauer Action. The claims against Alvarado in the Alvarado Action are consolidated with the claims against Proskauer in the Proskauer Action. Rebecca Hamric, Pablo M. Alvarado and Robert Glen Rigby added to case pursuant to consolidation. Attorneys Michael J Stanley, William Shawn Staples for Pablo M. Alvarado and Linda J Broocks for Rebecca Hamric added to case pursuant to consolidation. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/5/2017) (twd) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Appendix in Support filed by Proskauer Rose LLP re 151 MOTION For Choice of Law Determination (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION For Choice of Law Determination filed by Proskauer Rose LLP with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      REPLY filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee re: 145 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, (Powers, Scott) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE of Examiner's Report Addressing Motion to Consolidate filed by John J Little (Little, John) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          REPLY filed by Proskauer Rose LLP re: 141 MOTION to Continue Defendant Proskauer Rose LLP's Opposed Motion to Continue Trial Date (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Appendix in Support filed by Proskauer Rose LLP re 146 Response/Objection (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              RESPONSE filed by Proskauer Rose LLP re: 145 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER: The Court sets the following expedited briefing schedule on the Receiver and OSIC's joint motion to consolidate cases 132 in Janvey v. Alvarado, No. 3:10-CV-2584-N (N.D. Tex. filed Dec. 17, 2010). Defendant Proskauer Rose, LLP's response is due on Thursday, 3/23/2017. The Receiver and OSIC's reply is due on Thursday, 3/30/2017. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/16/2017) (sss) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee re 143 Response/Objection (Buncher, Douglas) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    RESPONSE filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee re: 141 MOTION to Continue Defendant Proskauer Rose LLP's Opposed Motion to Continue Trial Date (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Buncher, Douglas) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Appendix in Support filed by Proskauer Rose LLP re 141 MOTION to Continue Defendant Proskauer Rose LLP's Opposed Motion to Continue Trial Date (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 02/20/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION to Continue Defendant Proskauer Rose LLP's Opposed Motion to Continue Trial Date filed by Proskauer Rose LLP with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Scheduling Order) (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 02/20/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to the Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. All claims in this action by Plaintiffs, Receiver Ralph S. Janvey and The Official Stanford Investors Committee, against Defendant Thomas Sjoblom are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and 2. The foregoing parties will bear their own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees with respect to the dismissed claims. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/22/2016) (aaa) (aaa). (Entered: 12/22/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Thomas Sjoblom with Prejudice filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Dismissal with Prejudice) (Blakeway, Judith) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              AGREED ORDER REGARDING METHOD OF PRODUCTION OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS BY RECEIVER (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/19/2016) (mem) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MOTION for Discovery Motion for Entry of Agreed Order Regarding Method of Production of Certain Documents by Receiver filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Proskauer Rose LLP (Buncher, Douglas) Modified filer on 12/14/2016 (awc). (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER PROCEEDINGS - BMB filed by Ralph S Janvey et al. (ctf) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER PROCEEDINGS - WILLIS filed by Ralph S Janvey et al. (ctf) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE of OSIC's Objections and Responses to Defendant Proskauer Rose LLP's Request for Production of Documents filed by Official Stanford Investors Committee (Blakeway, Judith) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE of Objections and Responses to Defendant Proskauer Rose LLP's Subpoena filed by Castillo Snyder PC (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NOTICE of Strasburger & Price, LLP's Objections and Responses to Defendant Proskauer Rose LLP's Subpoena filed by Strasburger & Price, LLP (Blakeway, Judith) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 9/21/2016) (twd) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Amended Joint Motion for the Entry of Protective Order filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B) (Buncher, Douglas) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER denying 128 Motion for Protective Order, without prejudice to refiling in conformance with Judge Godbey's specific requirements. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 9/12/2016) (mem) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A) (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    RULE 54(b) FINAL JUDGMENT AND BAR ORDER. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/30/2016) (epm) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      RESPONSE filed by Official Stanford Investors Committee, Ralph S. Janvey re: 125 Response/Objection, 124 Response/Objection (Kitner, David) Modified filer on 8/8/2016 (awc). (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        OBJECTION and response to 120 filed by Ysmael Benito Silva. (ran) Modified on 8/2/2016 (gr). (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          OBJECTION and response to 120 filed by Teofila Silva. (ran) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            EXHIBIT to Document 173 in Case 3:09-cv-1736 and NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER PROCEEDINGS. The final hearing on the Motion 165 in Case 3:09-cv-1736 is set for October 28, 2016. Any objection to the Agreement, the Motion, the Judgments and Bar Orders, the Final Bar Order, or the request for approval of the Receivers attorneys' fees must be filed, in writing, with the Court in the SEC Action no later than September 30, 2016. Any objections not filed by this date will be deemed waived and will not be considered by the Court. (gmg) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER: The settlement hearing in these cases previously set for October 21, 2016, is reset to October 28, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. in Judge Godbey's Courtroom, 1505. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/21/2016) (gmg) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE of ORDER (Originally entered in 3:09-cv-0298 as document #2334.): The Kroll settlement hearing previously set for 7/08/2016, is now set for 8/12/2016, at 11:00 a.m. at the United States Courthouse, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242, in Courtroom 1505. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/11/2016) (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/11/2016) (ash) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: The court preliminarily finds that the settlement and Agreement proposed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Arch Specialty Insurance Company, and Lexington Insurance Company (Underwriters) and the Receiver and Official Stanford Investors Committee are fair, reasonable, and equitable; have no obvious deficiencies; and are the product of serious, informed, arms-length negotiations. The Court, however, reserves a final ruling with respect to the terms of the Agreement until after the Final Approval Hearing. This hearing will be held at the United States Courthouse, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242, in Courtroom 1505, at 10:00 a.m. on Friday, October 21, 2016. See order for additional information and directives. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/11/2016) (ash) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John J Little on behalf of John J Little. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Little, John) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      REPLY filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee re: 106 MOTION for Leave to File Amended ComplaintPlaintiffs' Opposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Buncher, Douglas) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 115 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Craig M. Reiser. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/5/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address for Moonyean Wood. New address: PO Box 1410, Brevard, NC 28712. (bdb) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7691781) filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)Attorney Craig Matthew Reiser added to party Proskauer Rose LLP(pty:dft) (Reiser, Craig) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Appendix in Support filed by Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom re 113 Response/Objection Appendix of Defendants Proskauer Rose LLP and Thomas V. Sjoblom in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom re: 106 MOTION for Leave to File Amended ComplaintPlaintiffs' Opposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  REPLY filed by Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom re: 99 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 110 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Replies due by 6/23/2016. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/15/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on 10/16/2017. The setting is for a two week docket. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Nancy M Koenig on 6/10/2016) (bdb) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER: The court hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs' 97 Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order and DENIES Defendant's 103 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Nancy M Koenig on 6/10/2016) (bdb) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee re: 99 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Buncher, Douglas) Modified filer on 6/3/2016 (awc). (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Amended ComplaintPlaintiffs' Opposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B) (Buncher, Douglas) Modified filer on 6/3/2016 (awc). (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER PROCEEDINGS. Objections are due by July 22, 2016. A final hearing will be held before the Honorable David C. Godbey in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, United States Courthouse, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242, in Courtroom 1505 at 10:00 a.m. on Friday, August 12, 2016. (ash) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee re: 103 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1-Defendant Proskauer Rose LLP's Surreply to Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in support of Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order) (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of THOMAS V. SJOBLOM'S JOINDER TO PROSKAUER ROSE, LLP'S RESPONSE TO OPPOSED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF SCHEDULING ORDER re: 100 Response/Objection filed by Thomas V Sjoblom (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Mateja, William) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 101 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee re: 97 MOTION Entry of Scheduling Order (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE filed by Proskauer Rose LLP re: 97 MOTION Entry of Scheduling Order (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 99 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Joint STATUS REPORT of FRCP 26(f) Conference filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee, Proskauer Rose LLP. (Blakeway, Judith) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Entry of Scheduling Order filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Blakeway, Judith) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: The Final Approval Hearing will be held before the Honorable David C. Godbey of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, United States Courthouse, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242, in Courtroom 1505, at 10:00 a.m. on Friday, 8/12/2016. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/9/2016) (aaa) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee re 94 MOTION to Expedite (EXPEDITED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF SCHEDULING ORDER AND MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH CHADBOURNE & PARKE LLP, TO ENTER THE BAR ORDER, TO ENTER THE FINAL JUDGMENT AND BAR ORDER, AND FOR PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5, # 6 Exhibit(s) 6) (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Expedite (EXPEDITED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF SCHEDULING ORDER AND MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH CHADBOURNE & PARKE LLP, TO ENTER THE BAR ORDER, TO ENTER THE FINAL JUDGMENT AND BAR ORDER, AND FOR PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES) filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Snyder, Edward) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        LONG FORM NOTICE OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT, BAR ORDER AND JUDGMENT, AND HEARING BY ORDER THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT, NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS. Objections due by May 18, 2016. Hearing scheduled to be held before the Honorable David C. Godbey in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, United States Courthouse, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242, in Courtroom 1505, at 10:00 a.m. on July 8, 2016. (gmg) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 91 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL: Attorney Edward F Valdespino terminated. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/5/2016) (twd) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Judith Reed Blakeway. Motion, Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney () filed by Official Stanford Investors Committee (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel) (Blakeway, Judith) (Entered: 02/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Judith Reed Blakeway on behalf of Official Stanford Investors Committee. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Blakeway, Judith) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick J Neligan, Jr on behalf of Ralph S. Janvey. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Neligan, Patrick) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thomas V Sjoblom. (Carroll, Christina) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint filed by Thomas V Sjoblom. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Carroll, Christina) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chadbourne & Parke LLP. (Leffell, Daniel) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Leffell, Daniel) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Proskauer Rose LLP. (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, filed by Proskauer Rose LLP. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 81 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer All Defendants. Answers are due by August 14, 2015. Further extensions are unlikely. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/6/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed Motion to Extend their Time to Answer filed by Thomas V Sjoblom, Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Mateja, William) Modified filers on 7/6/2015 (skt). (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Firm Name filed by Thomas V Sjoblom (Carroll, Christina) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 79 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: The Court grants Defendants' 55 , 58 , 61 motions to dismiss Plaintiffs' aiding and abetting fraudulent transfer claims. The Court denies Defendants' motions in all other regards. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/23/2015) (twd) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 77 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christina M. Carroll. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/19/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Christina M. Carroll (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6857973) filed by Thomas V Sjoblom (Mateja, William) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 75 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Mindy L. Rattan removed as counsel for Defendant Thomas V. Sjoblom. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/29/2015) (ctf) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MINDY L. RATTAN filed by Thomas V Sjoblom (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Mateja, William) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF MINDY L. RATTAN AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT THOMAS V. SJOBLOM filed by Thomas V Sjoblom (Mateja, William) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 67 Motion to extend page limit. Proskauer is granted permission to file a reply brief in further support of its pending Motion to Dismiss in excess of ten (10) pages, but not to exceed thirty-five (35) pages. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/16/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY filed by Thomas V Sjoblom re: 61 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Original Complaint (Mateja, William) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appendix in Support filed by Proskauer Rose LLP re 58 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim /Appendix in Support of Defendant Proskauer Rose LLP's Motion to Dismiss and Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Original Complaint (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY filed by Proskauer Rose LLP re: 58 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appendix in Support filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP re 55 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim / Supplemental Appendix (Beller, Daniel) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP re: 55 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Beller, Daniel) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Extend Page Limitation filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 65 Motion exceed page limit. Chadbourne may file a reply brief in further support of its pending Motion to Dismiss in excess of ten (10), and not to exceed thirty-five (35) pages. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/9/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Extend Page Limitation filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Beller, Daniel) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 62 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiffs may file a joint response and supporting brief not to exceed 75 pages in response to Defendants motions to dismiss Plaintiffs Original Complaint. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/5/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee re: 55 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 58 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 61 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Original Complaint (Gaither, John) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Joint Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss in Excess of Page LimitationPlaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Joint Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss in Excess of Page Limitations filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee (Gaither, John) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Original Complaint filed by Thomas V Sjoblom (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A) (Mateja, William) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: This Order addresses the Receiver's motion to substitute counsel 33 and Defendants Proskauer Rose LLP ("Proskauer") and Thomas Sjoblom's (collectively, "moving Defendants") cross-motion to compel discovery. Because the Court finds little risk that counsel to be substituted has been exposed to disqualifying information, the Court grants the Receiver's motion to substitute counsel. However, the Court lifts the litigation stay to permit moving Defendants to conduct limited discovery regarding whether substituted counsel has been exposed to confidential government information. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/9/2014) (ctf) (Entered: 10/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by Proskauer Rose LLP re 58 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Proskauer Rose LLP with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appendix in Support filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP re 55 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Beller, Daniel) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP re 55 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Beller, Daniel) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Beller, Daniel) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 51 Motion to Exceed Page Limit. Page limit not to exceed 50 pages. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/3/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 52 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicholas A. Foley is withdrawn as counsel for plaintiffs Ralph S. Janvey and Official Stanford Investors Committee. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/2/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee (Buncher, Douglas) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Extend Page Limitation filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 49 Motion to exceed page limit. Page limit not to exceed fifty (50) pages. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/26/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Extend Page Limitation filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Page Limitation) (Beller, Daniel) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Defendants' motions to dismiss the Second Action shall be due on or beforeOctober 3, 2014. Plaintiffs' responses to Defendants' motions shall be due on or before December 2, 2014. Defendants' replies in support of their motions to dismiss shall be due on or before January 15, 2015. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/25/2014) (aaa) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: Status Conference held on 8/21/2014. Attorney Appearances: SEC - David Reece; Receiver- Kevin Sadler, Michael Kuckelman, Douglas Buncher; Examiner- John Little; Defense - Jonathan Polkes, Ashley Kleber, Brian Tagtmeier, Robert Plotkin, Phil Preis, Jesse Castillo, Edward Valdepino, and Randy Pulman. (Court Reporter: Linda Langford) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 01:11. (chmb) (Entered: 08/21/2014) (jkm) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Thomas V Sjoblom. (Mateja, William) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee, Proskauer Rose LLP. (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          The Court will hold a status hearing for all parties to the Stanford MDL proceeding on 8/21/2014 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/22/2014) (jkm) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Examiner's Report No. 8 filed by John J Little. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s)) (Little, John) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              It is ordered that all matters and motions previously referred to the Honorable E. Scott Frost, United States Magistrate Judge, in the In re Stanford Entities Securities Litigation multidistrict litigation, are now hereby referred to the Honorable Nancy M. Koenig, United States Magistrate Judge, except for two matters outlined in the order. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/13/2014) (gmg) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER requesting input regarding the priority of decision in various matters pending in all cases within the In re Stanford Entities Securities Litigation. Input must be filed with the Court within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/3/2013) (gmg) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Status Hearing for all parties to the Stanford MDL proceeding set for 1/16/2014 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/2/2013) (gmg) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY filed by Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom re: 37 Response/Objection, (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY filed by Ralph S. Janvey re: 33 Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Douglas J Buncher,Douglas J Buncher for Ralph S. Janvey. Motion (Buncher, Douglas) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom re: 33 Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Douglas J Buncher,Douglas J Buncher for Ralph S. Janvey. Motion (Attachments: # 1 Declaration(s) Declaration of James P. Rouhandeh in Support of Defendants Proskauer Rose LLP and Thomas V. Sjoblom's Opposition to Plaintiff's Joint Motion to Substitute Counsel and Cross-Motion to Compel Discovery) (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: The Court vacates its Order 35 filed today. The Opposed Motion to Substitute 33 will be considered in due course. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/30/2013) (trt) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***VACATED PER 36 ORDER*** ORDER granting 33 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Neligan Foley LLP is substituted as attorneys of record for Ralph S. Janvey in his capacity as Court-Appointed Receiver for the Stanford Receivership Estate, with Douglas J. Buncher of Neligan Foley LLP designated as attorney in charge; and Guy M. Hohmann, Joseph F. Brophy, Christopher W. Ahart, and the law firm Hohmann, Taube & Summers, L.L.P. are hereby withdrawn as attorneys of record for Ralph S. Janvey, Plaintiff. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/30/2013) (trt) Modified text on 7/30/2013 (trt). (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Proskauer Rose LLP re: 33 Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Douglas J Buncher,Douglas J Buncher for Ralph S. Janvey. Motion (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Douglas J Buncher,Douglas J Buncher for Ralph S. Janvey. Motion filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A) (Buncher, Douglas) Modified term date on 7/30/2013 per 36 Order (trt). (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 31 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan Chang. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/24/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Jonathan Chang (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5295627) filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 26 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua R. Hochberg. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/29/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 25 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mindy L. Rattan. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/29/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to 26 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Joshua R. Hochberg (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 66059) by Defendant Thomas V Sjoblom. (Mateja, William) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to 25 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Mindy L. Rattan (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 66060) by Defendant Thomas V Sjoblom. (Mateja, William) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Joshua R. Hochberg (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 66059) filed by Thomas V Sjoblom. (tln) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Mindy L. Rattan (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 66060) filed by Thomas V Sjoblom. (tln) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William B. Michael. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/17/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel J. Leffell. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/12/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel J. Beller. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/12/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney William B. Michael (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5238953) filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Michael, William) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel J. Schwartz. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/11/2013) (twd) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James P. Rouhandeh. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/11/2013) (twd) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Daniel J. Schwartz (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5235128) filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney James P. Rouhandeh (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5235107) filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Daniel J. Leffell (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5226574) filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Proposed Order) (Leffell, Daniel) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Daniel J. Beller (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5226355) filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Beller, Daniel) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Defendant Chadbourne & Parke's Notice Regarding the Amended Joint Motion of the SEC, Receiver, Examiner, and Official Stanford Investors Committee to Approve Settlement Agreement and Cross-Border Protocol filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A) (Reasoner, Harry) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/8/2013) (twd) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***Proposed Order*** Joint STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Stay Proceedings by Ralph S. Janvey, Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom, Official Stanford Investors Committee. (Ahart, Christopher) Modified filers on 3/7/2013 (axm). (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Reissued as to Thomas V Sjoblom. (jrr) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted as to Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee. (Ahart, Christopher) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request for Clerk to issue Summons to Thomas V. Sjoblom filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee. (Ahart, Christopher) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Chadbourne & Parke LLP ; served on 2/12/2013. (Ahart, Christopher) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to the Honorable Judge David C. Godbey. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/1/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V Sjoblom. (tln) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Clerk to issue Summons to Thomas V. Sjoblom filed by Ralph S. Janvey. (Hohmann, Guy) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request for Clerk to issue Summons to Chadbourne & Parke, LLP filed by Ralph S. Janvey. (Hohmann, Guy) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request for Clerk to issue Summons to Proskauer Rose, LLP filed by Ralph S. Janvey. (Hohmann, Guy) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Lynn. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee. (Filing fee $350; Receipt number 0539-5091460) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) (Hohmann, Guy) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 644 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?