Goodrich Corporation v. US
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 13-1505

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 28, 2016 at 12:44 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 2870 - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (67) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
          ORDER filed [999376640] extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 10/21/2014. Response brief due 11/26/2014. Copies to all parties. [13-1505] (ALC)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
            ORDER filed [999314528] extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 07/21/2014. Response brief due 08/26/2014. Copies to all parties. [13-1505] (ALC)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
              ORDER filed [999280185] extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 04/21/2014. Response brief due 05/27/2014. Copies to all parties. [13-1505] (ALC)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                ORDER filed [999241561] extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 02/24/2014. Response brief due 03/31/2014. Copies to all parties. [13-1505] (ALC)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                  ORDER filed [999194325] extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 12/23/2013. Response brief due 01/27/2014. Copies to all parties. [13-1505] (ALC)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                    ORDER filed [999151312] extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 10/23/2013. Response brief due 11/25/2013. Copies to all parties. [13-1505] (ALC)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10
                      ORDER filed [999151312] extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 10/23/2013. Response brief due 11/25/2013. Copies to all parties. [13-1505] (ALC)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10
                        ORDER filed [999151312] extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 10/23/2013. Response brief due 11/25/2013. Copies to all parties. [13-1505] (ALC)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10
                          ORDER filed [999151312] extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 10/23/2013. Response brief due 11/25/2013. Copies to all parties. [13-1505] (ALC)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                            ORDER filed [999110640] extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 08/23/2013. Response brief due 09/24/2013. Copies to all parties. [13-1505] (ALC)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9
                              ORDER filed [999110640] extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 08/23/2013. Response brief due 09/24/2013. Copies to all parties. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9
                                ORDER filed [999110640] extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 08/23/2013. Response brief due 09/24/2013. Copies to all parties. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9
                                  ORDER filed [999110640] extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 08/23/2013. Response brief due 09/24/2013. Copies to all parties. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9
                                    ORDER filed [999110640] extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 08/23/2013. Response brief due 09/24/2013. Copies to all parties. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9
                                      ORDER filed [999110640] extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 08/23/2013. Response brief due 09/24/2013. Copies to all parties. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                        Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1505] (LP)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8
                                          Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1505] (LP)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8
                                            Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1505] (LP)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8
                                              Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1505] (LP)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8
                                                Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1505] (LP)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8
                                                  Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1505] (LP)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                    BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/10/2013. Response Brief due 07/12/2013. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7
                                                      BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/10/2013. Response Brief due 07/12/2013. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7
                                                        BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/10/2013. Response Brief due 07/12/2013. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7
                                                          BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/10/2013. Response Brief due 07/12/2013. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7
                                                            BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/10/2013. Response Brief due 07/12/2013. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7
                                                              BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/10/2013. Response Brief due 07/12/2013. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Goodrich Corporation. [13-1505] Robert Long
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6
                                                                  DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Goodrich Corporation. [13-1505] Robert Long
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6
                                                                    DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Goodrich Corporation. [13-1505] Robert Long
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6
                                                                      DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Goodrich Corporation. [13-1505] Robert Long
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6
                                                                        DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Goodrich Corporation. [13-1505] Robert Long
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6
                                                                          DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Goodrich Corporation. [13-1505] Robert Long
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Goodrich Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999098811] [13-1505] Robert Long
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5
                                                                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Goodrich Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999098811] [13-1505] Robert Long
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5
                                                                                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Goodrich Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999098811] [13-1505] Robert Long
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5
                                                                                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Goodrich Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999098811] [13-1505] Robert Long
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5
                                                                                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Goodrich Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999098811] [13-1505] Robert Long
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5
                                                                                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Goodrich Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999098811] [13-1505] Robert Long
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Robert A. Long for Goodrich Corporation.[999098803] [13-1505] Robert Long
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4
                                                                                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Robert A. Long for Goodrich Corporation.[999098803] [13-1505] Robert Long
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4
                                                                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Robert A. Long for Goodrich Corporation.[999098803] [13-1505] Robert Long
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4
                                                                                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Robert A. Long for Goodrich Corporation.[999098803] [13-1505] Robert Long
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4
                                                                                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Robert A. Long for Goodrich Corporation.[999098803] [13-1505] Robert Long
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4
                                                                                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Robert A. Long for Goodrich Corporation.[999098803] [13-1505] Robert Long
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Arthur T. Catterall for US.[999098142] [13-1505] Arthur Catterall
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3
                                                                                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Arthur T. Catterall for US.[999098142] [13-1505] Arthur Catterall
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3
                                                                                                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Arthur T. Catterall for US.[999098142] [13-1505] Arthur Catterall
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3
                                                                                                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Arthur T. Catterall for US.[999098142] [13-1505] Arthur Catterall
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3
                                                                                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Arthur T. Catterall for US.[999098142] [13-1505] Arthur Catterall
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3
                                                                                                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Arthur T. Catterall for US.[999098142] [13-1505] Arthur Catterall
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 3:10-cv-00105-FDW-DCK. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2
                                                                                                                  DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 3:10-cv-00105-FDW-DCK. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2
                                                                                                                    DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 3:10-cv-00105-FDW-DCK. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2
                                                                                                                      DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 3:10-cv-00105-FDW-DCK. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2
                                                                                                                        DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 3:10-cv-00105-FDW-DCK. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2
                                                                                                                          DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 3:10-cv-00105-FDW-DCK. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:10-cv-00105-FDW-DCK. Case manager: ACarlheim. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1
                                                                                                                              Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:10-cv-00105-FDW-DCK. Case manager: ACarlheim. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1
                                                                                                                                Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:10-cv-00105-FDW-DCK. Case manager: ACarlheim. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1
                                                                                                                                  Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:10-cv-00105-FDW-DCK. Case manager: ACarlheim. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1
                                                                                                                                    Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:10-cv-00105-FDW-DCK. Case manager: ACarlheim. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1
                                                                                                                                      Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:10-cv-00105-FDW-DCK. Case manager: ACarlheim. [13-1505] (ALC)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 99 times.

                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?