Talley v. Credit Acceptance Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-12798-DPH-PJK
District Judge Denise Page Hood, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I

This docket is featured in the December 13, 2017 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I.

Last Updated October 27, 2017 at 1:30 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Randolph Talley, Plaintiff
v.
Credit Acceptance Corporation Credit Acceptance Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Midwest Towing, Defendant
Citation No cause code entered
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Office Detroit
Filed 6/26/2013
Jury Demand None
Demand
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Gratiot
Terminated 6/28/2013
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,IFP,LR11.2_NOTICE
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 Mail returned
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Randolph Talley re [3] Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KKra)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 judgmentCourt Filing
    JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Loury, R)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Order dismissing caseCourt Filing
      OPINION AND ORDER DENYING [2] APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES OR COSTS AND DISMISSING [1] COMPLAINT. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Loury, R)
        LREF
        Blank  Certificate of service
        TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re [5] Judgment, [4] Order Dismissing Case on Randolph Talley Pris. No. 134414 at 320 N. Hubbard, St. Louis, MI 48880. (Loury, R)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: 6/27/2013 Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes*
          Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KKra)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
            APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Randolph Talley. (KKra)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Complaint
              COMPLAINT filed by Randolph Talley against All Defendants (KKra)
                LREF

                Space Space

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 219 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?