BKGTH Productions, LLC v. DOES 1-57
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-04710

Tags
Last Updated September 7, 2016 at 9:37 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: 12/11/2013 Order on Motion to Quash
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion to withdraw [15] is granted adn the motion to quash [12] is withdrawn. Status hearing held on 12/5/2013. Status hearing set for 1/30/2014 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 20 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: 12/6/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BKGTH Products, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Doe Defendants (Hierl, Michael)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Terminate Hearings
      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing date of 11/26/2013 is re-set for 12/5/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BKGTH Products, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Certain Doe Defendants (Hierl, Michael)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: 11/19/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BKGTH Products, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Doe Defendants (Hierl, Michael)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 16 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BKGTH Products, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Doe Defendants (Hierl, Michael)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/21/2013 Motion to Withdraw
              MOTION by Defendant DOES 1-57 to withdraw motion to quash[12] Petition to Withdraw Motion, MOTION by Defendant DOES 1-57 to quash (Hansen, John)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: 10/17/2013 Order on Motion to Quash
                MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion to quash [11] is denied. Status hearing held on 10/17/2013. Status hearing set for 11/26/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: 10/10/2013 Set/Reset Hearings
                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing is set for 10/17/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: 10/9/2013 Motion to Quash
                    MOTION by Defendant DOES 1-57 to quash subpoena related to IP Address 69.245.230.14 (Hansen, John)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/9/2013 Motion to Quash
                      MOTION by Unknown Jonathan Shandor to quash or vacate the subpoena. (vcf, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/9/2013 pro se appearance
                        PRO SE Appearance by Unknown Jonathan Shandor. (vcf, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/3/2013 Order on Motion for Discovery
                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion [6] for leave to takediscovery prior to Rule 26(f) conference is granted. Mailed notice (gds)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013 Notice of Motion
                            NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery[6] before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/29/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                              MEMORANDUM by BKGTH Products, LLC in support of motion for discovery[6] Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-B)(Hierl, Michael)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013 Motion for Discovery
                                MOTION by Plaintiff BKGTH Products, LLC for discovery Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: 7/2/2013 Copyright Report
                                  MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (vcf, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT filed by BKGTH PRODUCTIONS, LLC; Jury Demand. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Attorney Appearance
                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff BKGTH PRODUCTIONS, LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Attorney Appearance
                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff BKGTH PRODUCTIONS, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 civil cover sheet
                                        CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?