James Scheider, Jr. v. Deutsche Bank National Trust C
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 13-1821

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 21, 2016 at 10:52 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3371 - TORTS-Truth in Lending
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 41 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
BRIEF by Appellees Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, IndyMac Mortgage Services, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated and Onewest Bank, F.S.B. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Response. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 12/13/2013. [999259073] [13-1821] Jeffrey Anderson
    LREF
    Blank 40 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
    Amended DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellees Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, IndyMac Mortgage Services, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated and Onewest Bank, F.S.B.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999258975] [13-1821] Jeffrey Anderson
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Marc James Ayers for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, IndyMac Mortgage Services, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated and Onewest Bank, F.S.B..[999255741] [13-1821] Marc Ayers
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Jeffrey M. Anderson for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, IndyMac Mortgage Services, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated and Onewest Bank, F.S.B..[999255740] [13-1821] Jeffrey Anderson
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 37 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
          COURT ORDER filed [999245662] denying Motion to certify question to state court [23] Copies to all parties.. [13-1821] (CP)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
            FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants James Pringle Scheider, Jr. and Taffy G. Scheider. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 11/13/2013. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Not applicable. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999239631] [13-1821] Antonia Lucia
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
              BRIEF by Appellants James Pringle Scheider, Jr. and Taffy G. Scheider in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/13/2013. [999239627] [13-1821] Antonia Lucia
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
              REPLY by James Pringle Scheider, Jr. and Taffy G. Scheider to Motion to certify question to state court [23], Response [26]. [13-1821] Antonia Lucia
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Taffy G. Scheider. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999230816] [13-1821] Mark Berglind
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant James Pringle Scheider, Jr.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999230815] [13-1821] Mark Berglind
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                    DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. Mark S. Berglind, Esq. for Appellants James Pringle Scheider, Jr. and Taffy G. Scheider, Antonia T. Lucia for Appellants James Pringle Scheider, Jr. and Taffy G. Scheider and Mr. Roberts Vaux, Esq. for Appellants James Pringle Scheider, Jr. and Taffy G. Scheider re: filing of disclosure form (Loc.R. 26.1).. [13-1821] (CP)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                      ORDER filed [999229102] Document [20], amending/correcting caption, updating case caption Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Barrett R. Brewer. [13-1821] (CP)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE/ANSWER by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, IndyMac Mortgage Services, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated and Onewest Bank, F.S.B. to Motion to certify question to state court [23]. Nature of response: in opposition. [13-1821] B. Smith
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE/ANSWER by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, IndyMac Mortgage Services, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated and Onewest Bank, F.S.B. to notice requesting response [21]. [13-1821] Sarah Nielsen
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE ISSUED to Barrett R. Brewer for First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Charleston, Sarah Beth Nielsen and Mr. B. Rush Smith, III for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Onewest Bank, F.S.B. and IndyMac Mortgage Services requesting response to Motion to certify question to state court [23]Response due: 11/04/2013.[999223329]. Mailed to: Barrett R. Brewer. [13-1821] (CP)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                              MOTION by Appellants James Pringle Scheider, Jr. and Taffy G. Scheider for certification of question to state court. Date and method of service: 10/21/2013 ecf. [999222936] [13-1821] Antonia Lucia
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                RESPONSE/ANSWER by James Pringle Scheider, Jr. and Taffy G. Scheider to notice requesting response [21], Document [20]. [13-1821] Mark Berglind
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. Mark S. Berglind, Esq. Antonia T. Lucia, Mr. Roberts Vaux, Esq. for James Pringle Scheider, Jr. and Taffy G. Scheider, Sarah Beth Nielsen and Mr. B. Rush Smith, III for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Onewest Bank, F.S.B. and IndyMac Mortgage Services requesting response to Document [20]Response due: 10/28/2013.[999222546].. [13-1821] (CP)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                    DOCUMENT by Appellee First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Charleston. [999222356] [13-1821] (CP)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                      Notice issued re: appellee participation on appeal. Mailed to: Barrett R. Brewer. . [13-1821] (CP)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                                        ORDER filed [999197094] granting Motion to extend filing time [17], updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 11/13/2013. Response brief due 12/13/2013 Copies to all parties.. [13-1821] (CP)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                          MOTION by Appellants James Pringle Scheider, Jr. and Taffy G. Scheider to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until 10/28/2013. Date and method of service: 09/18/2013 ecf. [999196696] [13-1821] Antonia Lucia
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                            ORDER filed [999165582] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 10/04/2013, updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 10/04/2013. Response brief due 11/04/2013 Copies to all parties.. [13-1821] (DSD)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                              ORDER filed [999165582] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 10/04/2013, updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 10/04/2013. Response brief due 11/04/2013 Copies to all parties.. [13-1821] (DSD)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Antonia T. Lucia for James P. Scheider, Jr. and Taffy G. Scheider.[999159215] [13-1821] Antonia Lucia
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15
                                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Antonia T. Lucia for James P. Scheider, Jr. and Taffy G. Scheider.[999159215] [13-1821] Antonia Lucia
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                    DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Attorney Barrett R. Brewer for Appellee First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Charleston re: filing of appearance form (Loc.R. 46(g)). Appearance form due on 07/29/2013 from Barrett R. Brewer, filing of disclosure form (Loc.R. 26.1) Disclosure statement due from First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Charleston on 07/29/2013. Mailed to: Barrett R. Brewer. [13-1821] (CP)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14
                                                      DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Attorney Barrett R. Brewer for Appellee First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Charleston re: filing of appearance form (Loc.R. 46(g)). Appearance form due on 07/29/2013 from Barrett R. Brewer, filing of disclosure form (Loc.R. 26.1) Disclosure statement due from First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Charleston on 07/29/2013. Mailed to: Barrett R. Brewer. [13-1821] (CP)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) for James P. Scheider, Jr. and Taffy G. Scheider.[999156798] [13-1821] Roberts Vaux
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) for James P. Scheider, Jr. and Taffy G. Scheider.[999156798] [13-1821] Roberts Vaux
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                            BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 09/03/2013. Response Brief due 10/03/2013 [13-1821] (DSD)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                              BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 09/03/2013. Response Brief due 10/03/2013 [13-1821] (DSD)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellees Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, IndyMac Mortgage Services, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated and Onewest Bank, F.S.B.. [13-1821] Sarah Nielsen
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                                  OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellees Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, IndyMac Mortgage Services, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated and Onewest Bank, F.S.B.. [13-1821] Sarah Nielsen
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1821] (LP)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10
                                                                      Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1821] (LP)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants James P. Scheider, Jr. and Taffy G. Scheider. [13-1821] Mark Berglind
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9
                                                                          DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants James P. Scheider, Jr. and Taffy G. Scheider. [13-1821] Mark Berglind
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Mark S. Berglind for James P. Scheider, Jr. and Taffy G. Scheider.[999149194] [13-1821] Mark Berglind
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8
                                                                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Mark S. Berglind for James P. Scheider, Jr. and Taffy G. Scheider.[999149194] [13-1821] Mark Berglind
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by B. Rush Smith for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, IndyMac Mortgage Services, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated and Onewest Bank, F.S.B..[999149013] [13-1821] B. Smith
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7
                                                                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by B. Rush Smith for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, IndyMac Mortgage Services, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated and Onewest Bank, F.S.B..[999149013] [13-1821] B. Smith
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellees IndyMac Mortgage Services and Onewest Bank, F.S.B.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999149012] [13-1821] Sarah Nielsen
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999149007] [13-1821] Sarah Nielsen
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999149003] [13-1821] Sarah Nielsen
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Sarah B. Nielsen for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, IndyMac Mortgage Services, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated and Onewest Bank, F.S.B..[999148995] [13-1821] Sarah Nielsen
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 9:11-cv-00395-SB. Mailed to: Mark S. Berglind Barrett R. Brewer Brian Patrick Crotty Sarah B. Nielsen James P. Scheider Jr. Benjamin Rush Smith III Roberts Vaux. [13-1821] (CP)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2
                                                                                              DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 9:11-cv-00395-SB. Mailed to: Mark S. Berglind Barrett R. Brewer Brian Patrick Crotty Sarah B. Nielsen James P. Scheider Jr. Benjamin Rush Smith III Roberts Vaux. [13-1821] (CP)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2
                                                                                                DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 9:11-cv-00395-SB. Mailed to: Mark S. Berglind Barrett R. Brewer Brian Patrick Crotty Sarah B. Nielsen James P. Scheider Jr. Benjamin Rush Smith III Roberts Vaux. [13-1821] (CP)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Case docketed. Originating case number: 9:11-cv-00395-SB. Case manager: CPoulsen. [13-1821] (CP)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1
                                                                                                    Case docketed. Originating case number: 9:11-cv-00395-SB. Case manager: CPoulsen. [13-1821] (CP)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1
                                                                                                      Case docketed. Originating case number: 9:11-cv-00395-SB. Case manager: CPoulsen. [13-1821] (CP)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 125 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?