BKGTH Productions, LLC v. Does 1-87
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-04712
District Judge Joan B. Gottschall, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 11, 2016 at 4:56 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BKGTH PRODUCTIONS, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Hierl +1 312 580 0100 mhierl@hsplegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Sheldon Parkhurst +1 312 604 2626 +1 312 604 2729 tparkhurst@hsplegal.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/3/2013 Terminate Hearings
MINUTE entry before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Status hearing set for 9/4/2013 is stricken and reset for 10/8/2013 at 09:30 AM by request of the plaintiff's counsel via telephone. Mailed notice (rj, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/3/2013 Order
    ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 9/3/2013:Mailed notice(rj, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/3/2013 Order on Motion for Discovery
      MINUTE entry before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Plaintiffs motion for leave to take discovery prior to Rule 26(f) conference [6] is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff may seek information through Rule 45 subpoenas issued to Internet Service Providers (ISPs) sufficient to identify each Doe Defendant by name, mailing address, and Media Access control number, but Plaintiff is not entitled to phone numbers or email addresses. See Order for additional details. Mailed notice (rj, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: 8/27/2013 Terminate Hearings
        MINUTE entry before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Status hearing set for 9/3/2013 is stricken and reset to 9/4/2013 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (rj, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013 Notice of Motion
          NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery[6] before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 9/4/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013 Memorandum in Support of Motion
            MEMORANDUM by BKGTH Productions, LLC in support of motion for discovery[6] Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-B)(Hierl, Michael)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013 Motion for Discovery
              MOTION by Plaintiff BKGTH Productions, LLC for discovery Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER: MINUTE entry before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Status Hearing set for 09/03/13 at 9:30 AM. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendants of the status hearing forthwith. Pursuant to LR 5.2(f), a stapled and/or bound paper copy of all electronically filed documents, including the complaint, must be delivered to chambers (2356) within one business day. Noncompliance with LR 5.2(f) will result in the imposition of a $200.00 fine payable to the Clerk of the Court, 219 South Dearborn Street, 20th Floor, Chicago, Illinois 60604. Parties are directed to discuss settlement of case, consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, and a proposed discovery plan. See Judge Gottschall's civil case management information regarding pretrial case management procedures @ http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 7/23/2013.(mjc, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff BKGTH PRODUCTIONS, LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff BKGTH PRODUCTIONS, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                      CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                        COMPLAINT filed by BKGTH PRODUCTIONS, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8495212. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 262 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?