In re: TVIX Securities Litigation
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-04191
District Judge Laura Taylor Swain, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 17, 2016 at 10:11 PM EDT (5.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo David Schottenstein, Plaintiff

Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
v.
No Logo Anton Van Rossum, Defendant
No Logo Aziz R.D. Syriani, Defendant
No Logo Brady W. Dougan, Defendant
Credit Suisse AG Credit Suisse AG, Defendant

Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Carrie King +1 212 450 3004 +1 212 701 6004 melissa.king@davispolk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emmet Patrick Ong +1 212 450 4902 +1 212 450 3902 emmet.ong@dpw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James H.R. Windels +1 212 450 4000 james.windels@dpw.com
Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Defendant
No Logo D. Neil Radey, Defendant
No Logo David W. Syz, Defendant
No Logo Ernst Tanner, Defendant
No Logo Hans-Ulrich Doerig, Defendant
No Logo Jean Lanier, Defendant
No Logo Noreen Doyle, Defendant
No Logo Paul J. O'Keefe, Defendant
No Logo Peter Brabeck-Letmathe, Defendant
No Logo Peter F. Weibel, Defendant
No Logo Renato Fassbind, Defendant
No Logo Richard E. Thornburgh, Defendant
No Logo Robert H. Benmosche, Defendant
No Logo Thomas W. Bechtler, Defendant
No Logo Walter B. Kielholz, Defendant
No Logo Abram Shalelashvili, ADR Provider

Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

No Logo Ann Nicolosi, Consolidated Plaintiff

Represented by Donaldson, Guin & Slate, L.L.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Guin +1 205 879 9994

Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
No Logo Grace Trading, LLC, Consolidated Plaintiff

Represented by Donaldson, Guin & Slate, L.L.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Guin +1 205 879 9994

Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
No Logo William Bostedo, Consolidated Plaintiff

Represented by LAW OFFICES BERNARD M. GROSS, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and on Behalf of All others Similarly Situated Deborah R. Gross +1 215 561 3600 +1 215 561 3000 debbie@bernardmgross.com

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and on Behalf of All others Similarly Situated David Avi Rosenfeld +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@rgrdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Avi Rosenfeld, Esq. +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@geller-rudman.com
No Logo Brian Vandiver, Movant

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Avi Rosenfeld +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo DRHP, Inc., Movant
No Logo Elias Antonio Khouri Makl, Movant

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian C. Kerr +1 212 501 9000 +1 212 501 0300 kerr@browerpiven.com
No Logo Farid Rahimi, Movant

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Avi Rosenfeld +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Jorge Bitar Naim, Movant

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian C. Kerr +1 212 501 9000 +1 212 501 0300 kerr@browerpiven.com
No Logo Md. Mostofa Afzal Momen, Movant

Represented by Brower Piven, PC

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian C. Kerr +1 212 501 9000 +1 212 501 0300 kerr@browerpiven.com
No Logo Mountain Vista, LLC, Movant

Represented by Ethan Wohl

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan David Wohl +1 212 758 4000 +1 212 758 4004 ewohl@wohlfruchter.com
No Logo Ram Sinai, Movant
No Logo Rick L. Colyer, Movant

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian C. Kerr +1 212 501 9000 +1 212 501 0300 kerr@browerpiven.com
No Logo Robert Kovaks, Movant

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Avi Rosenfeld +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo William Mathers, Movant

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Avi Rosenfeld +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Yohanna Marini, Movant

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian C. Kerr +1 212 501 9000 +1 212 501 0300 kerr@browerpiven.com
No Logo Elite Aviation, LLC, Lead Plaintiff

Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

No Logo Endless H3, Lead Plaintiff

Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
Space Mark Carl Rifkin +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 rifkin@whafh.com
No Logo Nicholas Cherney, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Richard Hoge, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Velocity Shares LLC, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo VLS Securities LLC, Consolidated Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 55 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons in this Opinion and Order, Defendants' motion to dismiss the CCAC is granted in its entirety. This Memorandum Order resolves docket entry number 33. As this case is dismissed, the pending motion to intervene (docket entry no. 46) is hereby terminated. The Clerk's Office is respectfully requested to enter judgment dismissing Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint and to close this case and cases 12 civ. 4756 and 12 civ. 5475. re: (33 in 1:12-cv-04191-LTS) MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Peter Brabeck-Letmathe, Jean Lanier, Ernst Tanner, Credit Suisse AG, Robert H. Benmosche, Aziz R.D. Syriani, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Thomas W. Bechtler, Noreen Doyle, Hans-Ulrich Doerig, Walter B. Kielholz, Peter F. Weibel, D. Neil Radey, Richard E. Thornburgh, Anton Van Rossum, David W. Syz, Brady W. Dougan, Renato Fassbind, (46 in 1:12-cv-04191-LTS) MOTION to Intervene. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/9/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-04191-LTS, 1:12-cv-04756-LTS, 1:12-cv-05475-LTS (rjm) Modified on 6/9/2014 (rjm). (Entered: 06/09/2014)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
    MOTION for Deborah R. Gross to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by William Bostedo. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gross, Deborah) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 52 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference is adjourned to July 11, 2014, at 10:30 AM. Docket entry #52 resolved. Initial Conference set for 7/11/2014 at 10:30 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/13/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for May 16, 2014 addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from James H.R. Windels dated May 8, 2014. Document filed by Thomas W. Bechtler, Robert H. Benmosche, Peter Brabeck-Letmathe, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Hans-Ulrich Doerig, Brady W. Dougan, Noreen Doyle, Renato Fassbind, Walter B. Kielholz, Jean Lanier, D. Neil Radey, Aziz R.D. Syriani, David W. Syz, Ernst Tanner, Richard E. Thornburgh, Anton Van Rossum, Peter F. Weibel.(Windels, James) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 50 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference is adjourned to May 16, 2014, at 10:45 AM and the related deadlines are modified accordingly. The Court will inform the parties if oral argument is desired. Initial Conference set for 5/16/2014 at 10:45 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/7/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew M. Guiney dated March 7, 2014. Document filed by Elite Aviation LLC, Endless H3.(Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 48 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference.The conference is adjourned to 3/14/2014, at 10:00 AM. Initial Conference reset for 3/14/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/26/2013) (cd) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for December 6, 2013 addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from James H.R. Windels dated November 25, 2013. Document filed by Thomas W. Bechtler, Robert H. Benmosche, Peter Brabeck-Letmathe, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Hans-Ulrich Doerig, Brady W. Dougan, Noreen Doyle, Renato Fassbind, Walter B. Kielholz, Jean Lanier, D. Neil Radey, Aziz R.D. Syriani, David W. Syz, Ernst Tanner, Richard E. Thornburgh, Anton Van Rossum, Peter F. Weibel.(Windels, James) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 46 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by Elite Aviation LLC, Endless H3, David Schottenstein. (Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO JOIN & INTERVENE TO ADD AN ADDITIONAL PLAINTIFF SANDRA JOY LASHBROOK TO CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT(DOC 36).(sc) Modified on 9/16/2013 (sc). (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 44 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Initial Conference reset for 12/6/2013 at 10:15 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/11/2013) (cd) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for September 20, 2013 addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from James H.R. Windels dated 09/04/2013. Document filed by Thomas W. Bechtler, Robert H. Benmosche, Peter Brabeck-Letmathe, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Hans-Ulrich Doerig, Brady W. Dougan, Noreen Doyle, Renato Fassbind, Walter B. Kielholz, Jean Lanier, D. Neil Radey, Aziz R.D. Syriani, David W. Syz, Ernst Tanner, Richard E. Thornburgh, Anton Van Rossum, Peter F. Weibel.(Windels, James) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Mark C. Rifkin dated 8/1/2013 re: We are counsel for the Lead Plaintiffs in the above-captioned securities class action and write in response to defendants' July 25, 2013, letter concerning the Second Circuit's In re ProShares Trust Securities Litigation, No. 12-3981, 2013 U.S. App. LEXIS 14764 (2d Cir. 2013) opinion affirming the district court's dismissal of In re ProShares Trust Securities Litigation, No. 09 Civ. 6935 (JGK), 2012 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 128542 (S.D.N.Y. Sept. 7, 2012)...For all these reasons, Lead Plaintiffs respectfully submit that the decision in ProShares should have no bearing on the Court's consideration of the pending motion to dismiss. (tn) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from James H. R. Windels dated 7/25/2013 re: Defendants respectfully submit that the Second Circuit's decision in In re ProShares further supports dismissal of the complaint in In re TVIX. Document filed by Thomas W. Bechtler, Robert H. Benmosche, Peter Brabeck-Letmathe, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Hans-Ulrich Doerig, Brady W. Dougan, Noreen Doyle, Renato Fassbind, Walter B. Kielholz, Jean Lanier, Paul J. O'Keefe, D. Neil Radey, Aziz R.D. Syriani, David W. Syz, Ernst Tanner, Richard E. Thornburgh, Anton Van Rossum, Peter F. Weibel.(ft) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from James H.R. Windels dated 4/10/2013 re: We are counsel for defendants in the above-referenced action, and we are writing pursuant to Your Honor's Individual Practices to respectfully request an adjournment of the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for April 26, 2013. This is the third request for an adjournment of the conference. Plaintiffs' counsel consents to and joins in this request. ENDORSEMENT: In light of the pending motion, the conference is adjourned to September 20, 2013, at 10:00 AM and the related deadlines are modified accordingly. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/12/2013) (ft) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 33 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Thomas W. Bechtler, Robert H. Benmosche, Peter Brabeck-Letmathe, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Hans-Ulrich Doerig, Brady W. Dougan, Noreen Doyle, Renato Fassbind, Walter B. Kielholz, Jean Lanier, D. Neil Radey, Aziz R.D. Syriani, David W. Syz, Ernst Tanner, Richard E. Thornburgh, Anton Van Rossum, Peter F. Weibel. (Windels, James) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Elite Aviation LLC, Endless H3. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-04191-LTS, 1:12-cv-04756-LTS, 1:12-cv-05475-LTS(Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark C. Rifkin on behalf of Elite Aviation LLC, Endless H3 (Rifkin, Mark) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (33 in 1:12-cv-04191-LTS) MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Elite Aviation LLC, Endless H3, David Schottenstein. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-04191-LTS, 1:12-cv-04756-LTS, 1:12-cv-05475-LTS(Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                        CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against Thomas W. Bechtler, Robert H. Benmosche, Peter Brabeck-Letmathe, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Hans-Ulrich Doerig, Brady W. Dougan, Noreen Doyle, Renato Fassbind, Walter B. Kielholz, Jean Lanier, D. Neil Radey, Aziz R.D. Syriani, David W. Syz, Ernst Tanner, Richard E. Thornburgh, Anton Van Rossum, Peter F. Weibel with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by David Schottenstein, Endless H3, Elite Aviation LLC. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by David Schottenstein.(lmb) (mt). (Entered: 11/29/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
                                          DECLARATION of James H.R. Windels in Support re: 33 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Thomas W. Bechtler, Robert H. Benmosche, Peter Brabeck-Letmathe, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Hans-Ulrich Doerig, Brady W. Dougan, Noreen Doyle, Renato Fassbind, Walter B. Kielholz, Jean Lanier, D. Neil Radey, Aziz R.D. Syriani, David W. Syz, Ernst Tanner, Richard E. Thornburgh, Anton Van Rossum, Peter F. Weibel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Windels, James) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 33 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Thomas W. Bechtler, Robert H. Benmosche, Peter Brabeck-Letmathe, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Hans-Ulrich Doerig, Brady W. Dougan, Noreen Doyle, Renato Fassbind, Walter B. Kielholz, Jean Lanier, D. Neil Radey, Aziz R.D. Syriani, David W. Syz, Ernst Tanner, Richard E. Thornburgh, Anton Van Rossum, Peter F. Weibel. (Windels, James) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                              MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Thomas W. Bechtler, Robert H. Benmosche, Peter Brabeck-Letmathe, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Hans-Ulrich Doerig, Brady W. Dougan, Noreen Doyle, Renato Fassbind, Walter B. Kielholz, Jean Lanier, D. Neil Radey, Aziz R.D. Syriani, David W. Syz, Ernst Tanner, Richard E. Thornburgh, Anton Van Rossum, Peter F. Weibel.(Windels, James) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emmet Patrick Ong on behalf of Thomas W. Bechtler, Robert H. Benmosche, Peter Brabeck-Letmathe, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Hans-Ulrich Doerig, Brady W. Dougan, Noreen Doyle, Renato Fassbind, Walter B. Kielholz, Jean Lanier, D. Neil Radey, Aziz R.D. Syriani, David W. Syz, Ernst Tanner, Richard E. Thornburgh, Anton Van Rossum, Peter F. Weibel (Ong, Emmet) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Credit Suisse Group AG, Other Affiliate Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Other Affiliate Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc. for Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. Document filed by Thomas W. Bechtler, Robert H. Benmosche, Peter Brabeck-Letmathe, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Hans-Ulrich Doerig, Brady W. Dougan, Noreen Doyle, Renato Fassbind, Walter B. Kielholz, Jean Lanier, D. Neil Radey, Aziz R.D. Syriani, David W. Syz, Ernst Tanner, Richard E. Thornburgh, Anton Van Rossum, Peter F. Weibel.(Windels, James) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Carrie King on behalf of Thomas W. Bechtler, Robert H. Benmosche, Peter Brabeck-Letmathe, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Hans-Ulrich Doerig, Brady W. Dougan, Noreen Doyle, Renato Fassbind, Walter B. Kielholz, Jean Lanier, D. Neil Radey, Aziz R.D. Syriani, David W. Syz, Ernst Tanner, Richard E. Thornburgh, Anton Van Rossum, Peter F. Weibel (King, Melissa) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from James H.R. Windels dated 11/13/2012 re: Counsel for defendants write on behalf of all parties to respectfully request an enlargement of the page limitations for the memoranda of law to be filed in connection with defendants' motion to dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. We would request that the limits for defendants' initial memorandum and plaintiffs' opposition memorandum be increased from 25 to 40 pages each and the limit for defendants' reply memorandum be increased from 10 to 20 pages. The parties will make every effort to draft the memoranda as concisely as possible, but in order to brief fully the issues for the Court we submit it would be appropriate to exceed the page limitations set forth in Your Honor's Individual Practices. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/16/2012) (js) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Giti Baghban on behalf of Elite Aviation LLC, Endless H3. New Address: Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP, 270 Madison Avenue, New York, NY, United States 10016, 212-545-4747. (Baghban, Giti) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from James H.R. Windels dated 10/18/2012 re: We are counsel for defendants in the above-referenced action, and we are writing pursuant to Your Honor's Individual Practices to respectfully request an adjournment of the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for November 2, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: The initial conference is adjourned to April 26, 2013, at 10:15 AM., ( Initial Conference set for 4/26/2013 at 10:15 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/22/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Giti Baghban on behalf of Elite Aviation LLC, Endless H3 (Baghban, Giti) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND APPROVING LEAD PLAINTIFFS' SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL: granting (6) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting (6) Motion to Appoint Elite Aviation LLC, Endless H3 as Lead Plaintiff(s); granting (6) Motion to Consolidate Cases 12cv4191 (as Lead Case) with 12cv4756,12cv5475 in case 1:12-cv-04191-LTS; granting (7) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting (7) Motion to Appoint Elite Aviation LLC, Endless H3 as Lead Plaintiff(s); granting (7) Motion to Consolidate Cases 12cv4191 (as Lead Case) with 12cv4756,12cv5475 in case 1:12-cv-04756-LTS; granting (3) Motion to Appoint Elite Aviation LLC, Endless H3 as Lead Plaintiff(s); granting (3) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting (3) Motion to Consolidate Cases 12cv4191 (as Lead Case) with 12cv4756,12cv5475 in case 1:12-cv-05475-LTS; granting (4) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting (4) Motion to Appoint Elite Aviation LLC, Endless H3 as Lead Plaintiff(s); granting (4) Motion to Consolidate Cases 12cv4191 (as Lead Case) with 12cv4756,12cv5475; granting (3) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting (3) Motion to Appoint Elite Aviation LLC, Endless H3 as Lead Plaintiff(s); granting (3) Motion to Consolidate Cases 12cv4191 (as Lead Case) with 12cv4756,12cv5475 in case 1:12-cv-05475-LTS; granting (8) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting (8) Motion to Appoint Elite Aviation LLC, Endless H3 as Lead Plaintiff(s); granting (8) Motion to Consolidate Cases 12cv4191 (as Lead Case) with 12cv4756,12cv5475; granting (7) Motion to Appoint Elite Aviation LLC, Endless H3 as Lead Plaintiff(s); granting (7) Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting (7) Motion to Consolidate Cases 12cv4191 (as Lead Case) with 12cv4756, 12cv5475 in case 1:12-cv-04756-LTS. The Court hereby appoints Movants as lead plaintiffs for the Class of purchasers of VelocityShares Daily 2x VIX Short Term Exchange Traded Notes ("TVIX ETNs") issued by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. Movants satisfy all of the requirements for lead plaintiffs pursuant to the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995 ("PSLRA"). Pursuant to the PLSRA, Movants have selected and retained the law firm of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP ("Wolf Haldenstein") as lead counsel in this action. The Court approves the selection of Wolf Haldenstein as lead counsel for the Class. The above-captioned action and any action arising out of the same operative facts and alleging causes of action under the PSLRA now or hereafter filed in or transferred to this Court (the "Actions") are hereby consolidated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a). The Actions shall be referred to as In re TVIX Securities Litigation, Master File No. 12-cv-4191-LTS. I 0. Every pleading in the Actions shall bear the following caption as set forth herein. The Court hereby orders that lead plaintiffs are pennitted to file an amended class action complaint within 45 days from the date of this Order. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/24/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-04191-LTS, 1:12-cv-04756-LTS, 1:12-cv-05475-LTS(djc) Modified on 8/24/2012 (djc). (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Non-Opposition. Document filed by William Mathers, Farid Rahimi, Brian Vandiver. (Rosenfeld, David) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion re: 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Md. Mostofa Afzal Momen, Rick L. Colyer, Yohanna Marini, Jorge Bitar Naim, and Elias Antonio Khouri Makl to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 12-4765. MOTION to Appoint Md. Mostofa Afzal Momen, Rick L. Colyer, Yohanna Marini, Jorge Bitar Naim, and Elias Antonio Khouri Makl to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Rick L. Colyer, Elias Antonio Khouri Makl, Yohanna Marini, Md. Mostofa Afzal Momen, Jorge Bitar Naim. (Kerr, Brian) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel re: 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 12-cv-4756. MOTION to Appoint Mountain Vista, LLC, Ram Sinai, and DRHP, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Mountain Vista, LLC, Ram Sinai, and DRHP, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by DRHP, Inc., Mountain Vista, LLC, Ram Sinai. (Wohl, Ethan) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Lead Plaintiff Motion by Abram Shalelashvili re: 9 MOTION to Appoint Abram Shalelashvili to serve as lead plaintiff(s) , consolidate the actions and appoint lead counsel.. Document filed by Abram Shalelashvili. (Porritt, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        DECLARATION of David A. Rosenfeld in Support re: 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint William Mathers, Brian Vandiver, Farid A. Rahimi and Robert Kovacs to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 12-4191, 12-4756, 12-5475. MOTION to Appoint William Mathers, Brian Vandiver, Farid A. Rahimi and Robert Kovacs to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Robert Kovaks, William Mathers, Farid Rahimi, Brian Vandiver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Rosenfeld, David) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint William Mathers, Brian Vandiver, Farid A. Rahimi and Robert Kovacs to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 12-4191, 12-4756, 12-5475. MOTION to Appoint William Mathers, Brian Vandiver, Farid A. Rahimi and Robert Kovacs to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Robert Kovaks, William Mathers, Farid Rahimi, Brian Vandiver. (Rosenfeld, David) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION to Appoint Counsel., MOTION to Appoint William Mathers, Brian Vandiver, Farid A. Rahimi and Robert Kovacs to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Consolidate Cases 12-4191, 12-4756, 12-5475. Document filed by William Mathers, Brian Vandiver, Farid Rahimi, Robert Kovaks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rosenfeld, David) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              DECLARATION of Kenneth G. Gilman in Support re: 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Md. Mostofa Afzal Momen, Rick L. Colyer, Yohanna Marini, Jorge Bitar Naim, and Elias Antonio Khouri Makl to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 12-4765. MOTION to Appoint Md. Mostofa Afzal Momen, Rick L. Colyer, Yohanna Marini, Jorge Bitar Naim, and Elias Antonio Khouri Makl to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Elias Antonio Khouri Makl, Yohanna Marini, Md. Mostofa Afzal Momen, Mountain Vista, LLC, Jorge Bitar Naim. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(Kerr, Brian) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Md. Mostofa Afzal Momen, Rick L. Colyer, Yohanna Marini, Jorge Bitar Naim, and Elias Antonio Khouri Makl to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 12-4765. MOTION to Appoint Md. Mostofa Afzal Momen, Rick L. Colyer, Yohanna Marini, Jorge Bitar Naim, and Elias Antonio Khouri Makl to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Elias Antonio Khouri Makl, Yohanna Marini, Md. Mostofa Afzal Momen, Mountain Vista, LLC, Jorge Bitar Naim. (Kerr, Brian) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Counsel., MOTION to Appoint Md. Mostofa Afzal Momen, Rick L. Colyer, Yohanna Marini, Jorge Bitar Naim, and Elias Antonio Khouri Makl to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Consolidate Cases 12-4765. Document filed by Md. Mostofa Afzal Momen, Rick L. Colyer, Yohanna Marini, Jorge Bitar Naim, Elias Antonio Khouri Makl.(Kerr, Brian) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 12-cv-4756. MOTION to Appoint Mountain Vista, LLC, Ram Sinai, and DRHP, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Mountain Vista, LLC, Ram Sinai, and DRHP, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by DRHP, Inc., Mountain Vista, LLC, Ram Sinai. (Wohl, Ethan) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      DECLARATION of J. Elazar Fruchter in Support re: 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 12-cv-4756. MOTION to Appoint Mountain Vista, LLC, Ram Sinai, and DRHP, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Mountain Vista, LLC, Ram Sinai, and DRHP, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by DRHP, Inc., Mountain Vista, LLC, Ram Sinai. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Wohl, Ethan) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION to Consolidate Cases 12-cv-4756., MOTION to Appoint Mountain Vista, LLC, Ram Sinai, and DRHP, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Document filed by Mountain Vista, LLC, Ram Sinai, DRHP, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wohl, Ethan) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          DECLARATION of Nicholas I. Porritt in Support re: 9 MOTION to Appoint Abram Shalelashvili to serve as lead plaintiff(s) , consolidate the actions and appoint lead counsel.. Document filed by Abram Shalelashvili. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Porritt, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 9 MOTION to Appoint Abram Shalelashvili to serve as lead plaintiff(s) , consolidate the actions and appoint lead counsel.. Document filed by Abram Shalelashvili. (Porritt, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint Abram Shalelashvili to serve as lead plaintiff(s) , consolidate the actions and appoint lead counsel. Document filed by Abram Shalelashvili. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Porritt, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                DECLARATION of Matthew M. Guiney in Support re: 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Elite Aviation LLC and Endless H3 to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 12-cv-4191, 12-cv-4756, 12-cv-5475. MOTION to Appoint Elite Aviation LLC and Endless H3 to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Elite Aviation LLC, Endless H3. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Elite Aviation LLC and Endless H3 to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 12-cv-4191, 12-cv-4756, 12-cv-5475. MOTION to Appoint Elite Aviation LLC and Endless H3 to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Elite Aviation LLC, Endless H3. (Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel., MOTION to Appoint Elite Aviation LLC and Endless H3 to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Consolidate Cases 12-cv-4191, 12-cv-4756, 12-cv-5475. Document filed by Elite Aviation LLC, Endless H3.(Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew M. Guiney dated 6/20/2012 re: Counsel for plaintiff writes to request an adjournment of the pretrial conference currently scheduled for August 14, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to November 2, 2012 at 10am and the related deadlines are modified accordingly., ( Initial Conference set for 11/2/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/22/2012) (pl) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER AS TO ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND SCHEDULING: Counsel for defendants accepts service of the Complaint, dated May 25, 2012, on behalf of all defendants in this action, such service being effective as of the date the parties execute this stipulation. The time for all defendants to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended through and including forty-five (45) days after an order of the Court appointing one or more lead plaintiffs and approving the selection of counsel by lead plaintiff(s). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/19/2012) (jar) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/14/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. It is further ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff(s) must serve a copy of this Initial Conference Order within fourteen (14) calendar days following the date of this order, on each Defendant that has already been served with the summons and complaint, that a copy of this Initial Conference Order must be served with any subsequent process that brings in additional parties, and that proof of such service must be filed promptly with the Court. It is further ORDERED that counsel for the parties confer preliminarily at least twenty-one (21) days prior to the date set forth in paragraph 1 above to discuss the matters that are set forth in this Order. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/13/2012) (pl) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (mro) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Thomas W. Bechtler, Robert H. Benmosche, Peter Brabeck-Letmathe, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Hans-Ulrich Doerig, Brady W. Dougan, Noreen Doyle, Renato Fassbind, Walter B. Kielholz, Jean Lanier, Paul J. O'Keefe, D. Neil Radey, Aziz R.D. Syriani, David W. Syz, Ernst Tanner, Richard E. Thornburgh, Anton Van Rossum, Peter F. Weibel. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1039360)Document filed by David Schottenstein.(mro) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 446 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?