GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01938
District Judge Henry H. Kennedy, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 14, 2016 at 5:41 PM EDT (5.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo ALMARIE FORD, Plaintiff
No Logo DAPHNE JONES, Plaintiff
No Logo EDWARD RANDOLPH, Plaintiff
No Logo GLORIA BURNS, Plaintiff
No Logo Greater New Orleans Fair Housing Action Center, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/16/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Romer-Friedman +1 202 408 3645 promerfriedman@cohenmilstein.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Jenny Rae Yang +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jyang@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greater New Orleans Fair Housing Action Center, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED M. Lucia Blacksher +1 504 208 5050 lblacksher@gnofairhousing.org

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Debo P. Adegbile +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592 dadegbile@naacpldf.org
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Damon T. Hewitt +1 212 965 2257 +1 212 219 2052 dhewitt@naacpldf.org
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Renika C Moore +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592 rmoore@naacpldf.org

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Yvette Conley +1 202 354 3563 danielle.conley@wilmerhale.com
No Logo National Fair Housing Alliance, Plaintiff
No Logo RHONDA DENTS, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo PAUL RAINWATER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Watt Tieder Hoffar & Fitzgerald, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Edward Heffernan +1 703 749 1000 +1 703 749 0699 theffern@wthf.com
No Logo ROBIN KEEGAN, Defendant
United States Department of Housing and Urban Development United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Frilot

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Renee Gluth Culotta +1 504 599 8000 rculotta@frilot.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Joseph Krouse, III +1 504 599 8000 +1 504 599 8116 Akrouse@frilot.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suzanne Marie Risey +1 504 599 8000 +1 504 599 8100 srisey@frilot.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James D. Todd +1 202 514 3378 +1 202 616 8470 james.todd@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 405
Nature of Suit 443 - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations
  Entries (102) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 102 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to 79 Notice of Appeal filed by ROBIN KEEGAN ; ORDERED that the motion for leave to file be granted; FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for voluntary dismissal be granted and this appeal be dismissed with predjudice. USCA Case Number 10-5309. (mmh) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Hewitt, Damon) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
      ENTERED IN ERROR.....AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in support of the Motion to Dismiss re 95 Supplemental Memorandum filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (dr) Modified on 7/8/2011 (dr). (Entered: 07/08/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
        Amended SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (znmw, ) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
          Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 95 Supplemental Memorandum by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Lodged Amended Supplemental Statement of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Todd, James) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
            MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 67 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by EDWARD RANDOLPH, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, ALMARIE FORD, RHONDA DENTS, GLORIA BURNS, DAPHNE JONES ; USCA Case Number 10-5257. ORDERED that the injunction pending appeal entered by this court on September 22, 2010, be vacated. FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order of the District Court appealed from in case No. 10-5257 be affirmed, and the order appealed from in case No. 10-5269 be reversed, and the case be remanded for further proceedings. (smm) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
              Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation by GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, DAPHNE JONES, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, EDWARD RANDOLPH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Romer-Friedman, Peter) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (nmw, ) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Leave to File a Response to HUD's Supplemental Statement of Points and Authorities by GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, DAPHNE JONES, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, EDWARD RANDOLPH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, ReNika) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                    ORDER granting 92 U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Statement of Points and Authorities. Signed by Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 9, 2011. (lchhk1) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Statement of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, Notice of Recent Authority by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit (1) Supplemental Statement of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, Notice of Recent Authority, By Defendant U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, # 3 Exhibit (2) April 8, 2011 Opinion of U.S. Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit)(Todd, James) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                        USCA AMENDED JUDGMENT (certified copy) as to 74 Notice of Appeal filed by ROBIN KEEGAN, 67 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by EDWARD RANDOLPH, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, ALMARIE FORD, RHONDA DENTS, GLORIA BURNS, DAPHNE JONES. ORDERED that the injunction pending appeal entered by this court on September 22, 2010, be vacated. FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order of the District Court appealed from in case No. 10-5257 be affirmed, and the order appealed from in case No. 10-5269 be reversed, and the case be remanded for further proceedings. (smm, ) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                          USCA JUDGMENT (certified copy) as to 74 Notice of Appeal filed by ROBIN KEEGAN, 67 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by EDWARD RANDOLPH, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, ALMARIE FORD, RHONDA DENTS, GLORIA BURNS, DAPHNE JONES. ORDERED that the injunction pending appeal entered by this court on September 22, 2010, be vacated. FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order of the District Court appealed from in case No. 10-5257 be affirmed, and the order appealed from in case No. 10-5269 be reversed. (smm) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Serious Settlement Negotiations to Resolve the Action by GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, DAPHNE JONES, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE (Sellers, Joseph) Modified on 3/29/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 87 Joint Motion for a Privacy Act Protective Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 10, 2011. (NP) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiffs and by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Todd, James) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit City of Ft. Lauderdale v. Scott, No. 10-61122 (S.D. Fla. Jan. 19, 2009))(Todd, James) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None
                                    ORDER of USCA as to 79 Notice of Appeal filed by ROBIN KEEGAN ; ORDERED that, to the extent appellant Keegan seeks to appeal the district court's partial denial of her motion to dismiss on the basis of Eleventh Amendment immunity. consideration of the motion to dismiss be deferred in part pending further order of the court; FURTHER ORDERED that, to the extent Keegan seeks review of the district court's denial of her motion to transfer or the determination that the plaintiffs have stated a claim for relief under the Fair Housing Act, the motion to dismiss be granted in part; FURTHER ORDERED that the remainder of this appeal be held in abeyance pending further order of the court. USCA Case Number 10-5309. (mmh) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER denying 78 Motion to Clarify the Court's August 16, 2010 Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on October 4, 2010. (lchhk1.) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 78 MOTION for Order Clarifying the Court's August 16 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Motion for an Immediate Entry of a Clarification Order or, in the Alternative, Expedited Briefing MOTION to Expedite filed by GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, DAPHNE JONES, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, EDWARD RANDOLPH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Moore, ReNika) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 78 MOTION for Order Clarifying the Court's August 16 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Motion for an Immediate Entry of a Clarification Order or, in the Alternative, Expedited Briefing MOTION to Expedite filed by ROBIN KEEGAN. (Krouse, Allen) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER setting deadlines regarding opposition to 78 Motion to Clarify the Court's August 16, 2010 Opinion and Order Granting Plaintiffs' Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Plaintiffs' Motion for an Immediate Entry of Clarification Order or, in the Alternative, Expedited Briefing. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on September 23, 2010.(lchhk1.) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                              Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 79 Notice of Appeal. (dr) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 77 Order, Memorandum & Opinion by ROBIN KEEGAN. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-2298098. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Krouse, Allen) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Order Clarifying the Court's August 16 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Second Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Motion for an Immediate Entry of a Clarification Order or, in the Alternative, Expedited Briefing by GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, DAPHNE JONES, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, EDWARD RANDOLPH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Romer-Friedman, Peter). Added MOTION to Expedite on 9/17/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 defendant Robin Keegan's motion to dismiss and denying 28 Keegan's motion to transfer. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on September 7, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Henry H. Kennedy held on June 25, 2010; Page Numbers: 1-66. Court Reporter/Transcriber Annie Shaw, Telephone number 202 354-3242, Court Reporter Email Address : shawreporting@yahoo.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/16/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/27/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2010.(Shaw, Annie) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                        Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 74 Notice of Appeal. (dr) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 72 Order, Memorandum & Opinion by ROBIN KEEGAN. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-2270407. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Krouse, Allen) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF APPEAL by ROBIN KEEGAN (Krouse, Allen) Modified on 8/18/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              REVERSED PURSUANT TO USCA JUDGMENT FILED 3/29/11.....MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting 62 Second Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and denying 70 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on August 16, 2010. (NP) Modified on 3/30/2011 (smm). (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re 62 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, DAPHNE JONES, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, EDWARD RANDOLPH. (Moore, ReNika) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal by ROBIN KEEGAN (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Krouse, Allen) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re 62 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ROBIN KEEGAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Janet R. Thornton, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Lara Robertson, # 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Robin Keegan)(Krouse, Allen) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 67 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,. (znmw, ) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 61 Memorandum & Opinion, 59 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, DAPHNE JONES, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, EDWARD RANDOLPH. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-2247487. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Moore, ReNika) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER denying 63 Defendant Robin Keegan's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Second Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 23, 2010. (lchhk1) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 63 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 62 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, DAPHNE JONES, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, EDWARD RANDOLPH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Pages from 6/25/10 hearing transcript), # 2 Exhibit B (Hewitt Aff.))(Moore, ReNika) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appeal by GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, DAPHNE JONES, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, EDWARD RANDOLPH (Moore, ReNika) Modified on 7/26/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 62 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ROBIN KEEGAN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Risey, Suzanne) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, DAPHNE JONES, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, EDWARD RANDOLPH (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hewitt, Damon) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION setting forth the rationale for 59 the Court's order of June 29, 2010, which denied 50 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 6, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion Of Withdrawal As Attorney For Llezlie Green Coleman by GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Coleman, Llezlie) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER denying 50 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 29, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 50 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, DAPHNE JONES, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, EDWARD RANDOLPH. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A (Part 1) to Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A (Part 2) to Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit A (Part 3) to Exhibit 1, # 5 Affidavit Exhibit A (Part 4) to Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Romer-Friedman, Peter) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 50 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ROBIN KEEGAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Culotta, Renee) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER denying 54 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Robin Keegan, Executive Director of the Louisiana Recovery Authority, to respond to 50 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; setting a briefing schedule and hearing on 50 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 10, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 54 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 50 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, DAPHNE JONES, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, EDWARD RANDOLPH. (Sellers, Joseph) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 50 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ROBIN KEEGAN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Culotta, Renee) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 52 Order Clarifying the Court's May 24, 2010 Order filed by GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, DAPHNE JONES, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, EDWARD RANDOLPH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Sellers, Joseph) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      CLARIFICATION OF THE COURT'S MAY 24, 2010 ORDER. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 4, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Morgan Whitney Williams, :Firm- Greater New Orleans Fair Housing Action Center, :Address- 404 S. Jeff Davis Pkwy, New Orleans, LA 70119. Phone No. - (504) 596-2100, ext. 104. Fax No. - (504) 708-2476 by GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, DAPHNE JONES, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, EDWARD RANDOLPH (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Romer-Friedman, Peter) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction by GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, DAPHNE JONES, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, EDWARD RANDOLPH (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Counsel, # 4 List of Exhibits, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N, # 19 Exhibit O, # 20 Exhibit P, # 21 Exhibit Q, # 22 Exhibit R, # 23 Exhibit S Part 1, # 24 Exhibit S Part 2, # 25 Exhibit T, # 26 Exhibit U, # 27 Exhibit V, # 28 Exhibit W, # 29 Exhibit X, # 30 Exhibit Y, # 31 Exhibit Z, # 32 Exhibit aa, # 33 Exhibit bb, # 34 Exhibit cc, # 35 Exhibit dd, # 36 Exhibit ee, # 37 Exhibit ff, # 38 Exhibit gg)(Sellers, Joseph). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 6/3/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Substitution of Named Party (Rainwater) by GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, DAPHNE JONES, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, EDWARD RANDOLPH (Moore, ReNika) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Yvette Conley on behalf of GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, DAPHNE JONES, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, EDWARD RANDOLPH (Conley, Danielle) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Romer-Friedman on behalf of GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, DAPHNE JONES, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, EDWARD RANDOLPH (Romer-Friedman, Peter) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Continue and/or Reset Hearing by PAUL RAINWATER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Culotta, Renee) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER scheduling a hearing on the parties' motions to dismiss on June 4, 2010, at 3:00 pm, to address issues specified in the Court's Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 24, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, DAPHNE JONES, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, EDWARD RANDOLPH. Attorney Matthew Colangelo terminated. (Colangelo, Matthew) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 41 MOTION for Hearing re 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, 28 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION for Hearing re 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, 28 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Todd, James) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 41 MOTION for Hearing re 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, 28 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION for Hearing re 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, 28 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Todd, James) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Hearing re 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, 28 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case by DAPHNE JONES, EDWARD RANDOLPH, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sellers, Joseph) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              ERRATA by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT 38 Reply to opposition to Motion filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Corrected Copy of Reply)(Todd, James) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re 28 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case filed by PAUL RAINWATER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D)(Culotta, Renee) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Todd, James) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Daniel Tenny) by DAPHNE JONES, EDWARD RANDOLPH, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tenny, Daniel) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by PAUL RAINWATER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Culotta, Renee) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION re 34 Memorandum in Opposition,, to Extend Time for Defendants' Replies by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Todd, James) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, 28 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case filed by DAPHNE JONES, EDWARD RANDOLPH, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit List, # 3 Exhibit A 2005 Act, # 4 Exhibit B. 2006 Act, # 5 Exhibit C 2007 Act, # 6 Exhibit D Feb 13 2006 Regulation, # 7 Exhibit E Oct 30 2006 Regulation, # 8 Exhibit F Dec 11 2007 Regulation, # 9 Exhibit G Aug 8 2008 Regulation, # 10 Exhibit H Appeals and Second Disbursements, # 11 Exhibit I Filing an Appeal)(Sellers, Joseph) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 28 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Todd, James) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION Leave to File Consolidated Response Not to Exceed 65 Pages re 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, 28 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case by DAPHNE JONES, EDWARD RANDOLPH, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tenny, Daniel) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER. Attorney M. Lucia Blacksher terminated. (Blacksher, M.) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jenny R. Yang on behalf of all plaintiffs (Yang, Jenny) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 28 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Todd, James) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Transfer Case by PAUL RAINWATER (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order regarding Motion to Dismiss, # 6 Text of Proposed Order regarding Motion to Transfer)(Culotta, Renee) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to PAUL RAINWATER served on 2/16/2009, answer due date 4/6/2009. (Coleman, Llezlie) Modified on 3/26/2009 to correct docket text to reflect document filed (tr). (Entered: 03/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Stipulation Regarding Scheduling. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 23, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Regarding Scheduling by DAPHNE JONES, EDWARD RANDOLPH, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tenny, Daniel) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PAUL RAINWATER served on 2/16/2009, answer due 4/6/2009 (Coleman, Llezlie) Modified on 3/11/2009 (tr). (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER served on 2/16/2009, answer due 3/9/2009 (Coleman, Llezlie) Modified on 3/11/2009 (jf, ). (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jessie Handforth Kome in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Todd, James) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by PAUL RAINWATER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Paul Rainwater, Executive Director of the Louisiana Recovery Authority to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Heffernan, Timothy) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Suzanne Marie Risey, Allen J. Krouse, III, Renee Gluth Culotta, :Firm- Frilot L.L.C., :Address- 1100 Poydras Street, 36th Floor, New Orleans, LA 70163. Phone No. - 504-599-8016. Fax No. - 504-599-8116 by PAUL RAINWATER (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Suzanne Marie Risey, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Allen J. Krouse, III, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Renee Gluth Culotta, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admissions)(Heffernan, Timothy) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Firm Name Change by GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER (Coleman, Llezlie) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Attorney Name Change by GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER (Coleman, Llezlie) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Third Request) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Todd, James) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER extending deadline for seeking class certification. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 11, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION To Extent Deadline To Seek Class Certification by GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sellers, Joseph) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Second Request) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Todd, James) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT served on served on 11/14/2008, answer due 2/12/2009(Tenny, Daniel) Modified on 1/13/2009 to include service and answer dates(tr). (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT served on 11/14/2008, answer due 2/12/2009 (Tenny, Daniel) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 11/14/2008. (Tenny, Daniel) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Todd, James) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Todd on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Todd, James) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Debo Adegbile, Matthew Colangelo, Damon T. Hewitt, Renika C. Moore, :Firm- NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc., :Address- 99 Hudson Street, 16th Floor, New York, NY 10013. Phone No. - 212-965-2200. Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission by DAPHNE JONES, EDWARD RANDOLPH, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION OF DEBO ADEGBILE, # 2 DECLARATION OF MATTHEW COLANGELO, # 3 DECLARATION OF DAMON T. HEWITT, # 4 DECLARATION OF RENIKA C. MOORE, # 5 PROPOSED ORDER)(Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- M. Lucia Blacksher, :Firm- Greater New Orleans Fair Housing Action Center, :Address- 228 St. Charles Avenue, STE 1035, New Orleans, LA 70130. Phone No. - 504-208-5050. Motion For Pro Hac Vice Admission of M. Lucia Blacksher by DAPHNE JONES, EDWARD RANDOLPH, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Lucia Blacksher, # 2 Proposed Order)(Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Firm Name Change by DAPHNE JONES, EDWARD RANDOLPH, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD (Tenny, Daniel) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Llezlie Lloren Green on behalf of all plaintiffs (Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Tenny on behalf of all plaintiffs (Tenny, Daniel) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE. (tr) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER. (tr) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, PAUL RAINWATER ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616016220) filed by DAPHNE JONES, EDWARD RANDOLPH, GREATER NEW ORLEANS FAIR HOUSING ACTION CENTER, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, GLORIA BURNS, RHONDA DENTS, ALMARIE FORD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tr) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 187 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?