TCYK, LLC v. Does 1 -17
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:13-cv-01727

Tags
Last Updated September 12, 2016 at 6:24 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Koch & Garvis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark R Anfinson +1 612 827 5611 +1 612 827 3564 mranfinson@lawyersofminnesota.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Keith A. Vogt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keith A. Vogt +1 312 583 3400 +1 312 755 4408 KVogt@takiguchiandvogt.com
v.
No Logo Doe 1, Defendant
No Logo Doe 10, Defendant
No Logo Doe #11, Defendant
No Logo Doe 12, Defendant
No Logo Doe 13, Defendant
No Logo Doe 14, Defendant
No Logo Doe 15, Defendant
No Logo Doe 16, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Godfread Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul A Godfread +1 612 284 7325 +1 612 605 6001 paul@godfreadlaw.com
No Logo Doe 17, Defendant
No Logo Doe 2, Defendant
No Logo Doe #3, Defendant
No Logo DOE #4, Defendant
No Logo Doe #5, Defendant
No Logo Doe 6, Defendant
No Logo Doe 7, Defendant
No Logo Doe #8, Defendant
No Logo Doe 9, Defendant
No Logo Does 1-17, Defendant
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 Judgment*
JUDGMENT (Attachments: # (1) Civil Notice - appeal)(jam)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: 3/13/2014 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 3/13/2014. (GJS)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: 3/5/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC (Vogt, Keith)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/3/2014 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER re [30] Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Doe 16. Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 3/3/2014. (GJS)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Stipulation of Dismissal
          STIPULATION of Dismissal by Doe 16. (Godfread, Paul)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: 2/12/2014 Notice of Cancelation/Rescheduling of HearingCourt Filing
            TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Cancellation of Pretrial Conference: [28] Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2014 before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes is cancelled. (JEP)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
              NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. (KNK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2014: # (1) Consent Form) (KNK).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC (Vogt, Keith)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 26 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                  ANSWER to Complaint by Doe 16. (Godfread, Paul) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                    LREF
                    Blank 25 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 23 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by TCYK, LLC. Doe 16 served on 12/12/2013, answer due 1/2/2014. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                          LREF
                          Blank 22 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by TCYK, LLC. Doe # 15 served on 12/14/2013, answer due 1/6/2014. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                            LREF
                            Blank 21 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by TCYK, LLC. Doe # 3 served on 12/13/2013, answer due 1/3/2014. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                Summons Issued as to Does 1-17. (TSS) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                  DOCKET ENTRY (ECF No. 18) FILED IN ERROR: Summons Issued as to Does 1-17. (TSS) Modified docket text on 12/6/2013 (TSS). (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by TCYK, LLC. Doe # 4 waiver sent on 10/22/2013, answer due 12/23/2013. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S FIRST MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH IT HAS TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE ON DOE DEFENDANTS that Plaintiffs Motion (Doc. No. 15) is granted. Plaintiff shall have through and including December 31, 2013 to effectuate service of a Summons and Complaint on a Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 10/29/2013. (MMP) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                        First MOTION for Extension of Time Serve Summons and Complaint by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting 13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Keith A Vogt for TCYK, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 09/06/2013. (KMM) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 13 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Keith A. vogt. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-3686738 by TCYK, LLC. (Anfinson, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 12 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: 8/14/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                              ORDER 1. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoenas Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (Doc. No. [9]), is GRANTED. (See text of Order for detaials). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 08/14/2013. (jz)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 12
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: 8/14/2013 Exhibit
                                                  EXHIBIT re [9] MOTION for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoenas Prior to Rule 26 (f) Conference by TCYK, LLC filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) C, # (2) Exhibit(s) D)(Anfinson, Mark)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: 8/14/2013 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [9] MOTION for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoenas Prior to Rule 26 (f) Conference filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Anfinson, Mark)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 10
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: 8/14/2013, Terminated: 8/14/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                          MOTION for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoenas Prior to Rule 26 (f) Conference by TCYK, LLC. (Anfinson, Mark)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: 8/12/2013 Notice to AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                            TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE to Attorneys: The motion hearing scheduled for 8/16/2013 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Keyes is cancelled. The motion will be decided on the submissions. (JEP)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/11/2013, Entered: 8/11/2013 Motion for Discovery
                                                              DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-MOTION for Discovery by TCYK, LLC. (Anfinson, Mark) Modified on 8/13/2013 (akl).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 8/11/2013, Entered: 8/11/2013 Motion for Discovery
                                                                DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-MOTION for Discovery by TCYK, LLC. (Anfinson, Mark) Modified on 8/13/2013 (akl).
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/11/2013, Entered: 8/11/2013 Motion for Discovery
                                                                  DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-MOTION for Discovery by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s), # (2) Exhibit(s))(Anfinson, Mark) Modified on 8/13/2013 (akl).
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: 7/3/2013 Summons Issued
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: 7/3/2013 Notice of Initial Case Assignment
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: 7/3/2013 Exhibit
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: 7/2/2013 Complaint
                                                                          LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 151 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?