Defendini v. Horizon Lines LLC, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the First Circuit, Case No. 13-1864

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 10, 2016 at 3:09 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3340 - Personal Injury: Marine
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106551223 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Horizon Lines LLC filed by Attorney Manolo T. Rodriguez-Bird. Certificate of service dated 07/03/2013. [13-1864] (MTR)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106551179 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE as to the inapplicability of filing fees to Appellant as a Seaman filed by Appellant Enrique Defendini. [13-1864] CLERK'S NOTE: The ECF filer did not select the option that best describes the document. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (MS)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106550933 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
      TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Enrique Defendini indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. [13-1864] (MS)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106550927 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
        DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Enrique Defendini. [13-1864] (MS)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106550921 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Enrique Defendini filed by Attorney Manuel Sosa-Baez. [13-1864] (MS)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106550659 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
            CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #27) filed by Appellant Enrique Defendini. Docketing Statement due 07/16/2013. Transcript Report/Order form due 07/16/2013. Fee due 07/16/2013. Appearance form due 07/16/2013.. [13-1864] (GK)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 32 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?