BKGTH Productions LLC v. Does 1-20
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00666
District Judge J P Stadtmueller, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 15, 2016 at 3:16 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BKGTH Productions LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Theodore N Cox

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith A Vogt +1 773 340 9469 KeithVogt.JD@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Does 1-20, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: 10/30/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BKGTH Productions LLC. (Vogt, Keith)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: 8/6/2013 Response - non motion
    RESPONSE filed by BKGTH Productions LLC re [8] Document Sealed (Vogt, Keith)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: 8/6/2013 Response - non motion
      RESPONSE filed by BKGTH Productions LLC re [9] Objections (Vogt, Keith)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: 8/6/2013 Objections
        OBJECTIONS to Providing Name, Address and other personal information by Doe #12. (msc)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: 8/6/2013 Document Sealed
          Document Sealed: Objection to the Disclosure of personal information as to Doe #14. (msc)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 6/27/13 granting 5 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. See Order. (cc: all counsel) (nm)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
              BRIEF in Support filed by BKGTH Productions LLC re 5 MOTION for Discovery Prior to 26(f) . (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Darren Griffin, # 2 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit B)(Vogt, Keith)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                MOTION for Discovery Prior to 26(f) by BKGTH Productions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vogt, Keith)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                  DISCLOSURE Statement by BKGTH Productions LLC. (Vogt, Keith)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by BKGTH Productions LLC. (Vogt, Keith)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
                      Report to Register of Copyrights. (Mailed via USPS to Copyright Office) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(msc)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                        COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Does 1-20 by BKGTH Productions LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-1703841) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vogt, Keith)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 177 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?