Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. v. Aloha Airlines, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 92057460-CAN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by wailana.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin E Hsia +1 808 544 3835 +5405 540 540 5011 mhsia@cades.com
v.
No Logo Aloha Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by amincorp.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space jb@amincorp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cades Schutte LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder kkrzykowski@cades.com
Type Cancellation
Interlocutory Attorney YONG OH (RICHARD)KIM
Date in Location 02-JUL-13
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None T
Bd Decision: Dismissed W/ Prej
    LREF
    Blank 20 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None N
    W/draw Of Pet For Cancellation
      LREF
      Blank 19 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None S
      Susp Pend Disp Of Civil Action
        LREF
        Blank 18 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None T
        Change Of Corresp Address
          LREF
          Blank 17 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None T
          P Resp To Bd Order/inquiry
            LREF
            Blank 16 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None T
            Response Due 30 Days (due Date)
              LREF
              Blank 15 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None S
              Susp Pend Disp Of Civil Action
                LREF
                Blank 14 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None W
                D Mot To Susp Pend Disp Civ Action
                  LREF
                  Blank 13 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None T
                  P Opp/resp To Motion
                    LREF
                    Blank 12 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None W
                    D Mot To Susp Pend Disp Civ Action
                      LREF
                      Blank 11 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None T
                      Paper Received At Ttab
                        LREF
                        Blank 10 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                        Bd Order: Discovery Conf Held
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None T
                          Proceedings Consolidated; Trial Dates Set
                            LREF
                            Blank 8 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None N
                            D Req For Discovery Conference-phone
                              LREF
                              Blank 7 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None N
                              Answer
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None T
                                D Mot For Ext W/o Consent
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None T
                                  D Mot To Consolidate
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None T
                                    Paper Received At Ttab
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None T
                                      Pending, Instituted
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 2 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None T
                                        Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None N
                                          Filed And Fee
                                            LREF

                                            Space Space

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 45 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?