[SECRET]
Administrative Proceeding Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court, Case No. Misc. 13-01
District Judge Reggie B. Walton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Electronic Frontier Foundation Electronic Frontier Foundation, Unknown

Toggle Switch Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L. Sobel +2027 979 009 x104 +1 202 797 9066 sobel@eff.org
United States of America United States of America, Unknown
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Opinion and Order
Opinion and Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Opposition to Motion
    Opposition to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Bar Membership
      Bar Membership
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Order
        Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/24/2013 Motion for Consent to Disclosure of Court Records
          Motion for Consent to Disclosure of Court Records
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 97 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?