Wireless Mobile Devices LLC v. Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-01878
District Judge David C Godbey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 12:41 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wireless Mobile Devices LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Michael James Fagan, Jr. +1 817 806 3817 +1 817 377 3485 mfagan@nbclaw.net
v.
Huawei Device USA, Inc. Huawei Device USA, Inc., Defendant
Huawei Technologies Company, Ltd. Huawei Technologies Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd."

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Robert Charles Earle +1 214 760 6117 +1 214 747 2091 rce@fr.com
T-Mobile USA, Inc. T-Mobile USA, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "T-Mobile US Inc"

Toggle Switch Represented by MetroPCS Communications

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Garreth Alexander Sarosi +1 469 330 4784 +1 866 715 8790 gsarosi@metropcs.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Final Order. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (Attachments: # 1 stip of dismissal) (tln) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
    STIPULATION OF JOINT DISMISSAL of All Claims Between the Plaintiff and Defendants Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. and Huawei Device USA Inc. by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC, Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd., Huawei Device USA Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
      JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL of All Claims Between the Plaintiff and Defendant T-Mobile US Inc by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC, T-Mobile US Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) Modified filers on 6/12/2014 (axm). (Entered: 06/12/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
        CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Acacia Research Group LLC for Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 43 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Michael J. Fagan, Jr. as counsel for Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/31/2014) (skt) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 45 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shahar Harel. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/21/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
              Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Shahar Harel (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 72979) filed by T-Mobile US Inc. (axm) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Service of Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd., T-Mobile US Inc (Youngblood, James) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2014. Claim Construction Discovery due by 7/25/2014. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/22/2014) (twd) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                      ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. Related document: 37 Answer to Amended Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                        ANSWER to 35 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by T-Mobile US Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Cooper, Brett) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/7/2014) (tla) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 36 Motion to Extend Time. Answer or responsive pleading due by 1/8/2014 (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/3/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                              ANSWER to 35 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership., COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Mobile Devices LLC filed by Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. (Earle, Robert) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by T-Mobile US Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Cooper, Brett) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 (corrected) filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                        Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Answer or Amended Pleading. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ykp) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                          ***DISREGARD - CORRECTED FILING AT DOCKET 35 *** AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. Additional patent/trademark or copyright numbers are added and the clerk should prepare the appropriate report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office to include registrations: US8014939 9/6/2011, US8301371 10/30/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F) (Bumgardner, Barry) Modified on 12/13/2013 (cea). (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                            Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd., T-Mobile US Inc, Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A) (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Joint Report filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 27 Motion to Extend Time. Status Report due by 11/18/2013. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/1/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                  Agreed MOTION to Extend Time Time and Consolidate Status and Scheduling Conferences with Related Matters filed by Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd., T-Mobile US Inc, Wireless Mobile Devices LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Earle, Robert) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                    ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. Related document: 19 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,,,, (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brett E. Cooper. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/6/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christie B Lindsey on behalf of Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Lindsey, Christie) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Brett E. Cooper (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 69056) filed by T-Mobile US Inc. (twd) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 18 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Garreth A. Sarosi as Counsel of Record. Attorney Garreth A Sarosi terminated. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/30/2013) (twd) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/29/2013) (tln) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.. (Earle, Robert) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership., COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Mobile Devices LLC filed by Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. (Earle, Robert) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re Garreth A. Sarosi filed by T-Mobile US Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Dehoney, David) (Entered: 08/25/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David R. Dehoney. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/23/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney David R Dehoney (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 068683) filed by T-Mobile US Inc. (tln) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by T-Mobile US Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate T Mobile Global Holding GmbH for T-Mobile US Inc. (Green, Eric) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by T-Mobile US Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Green, Eric) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 12 Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading by T-Mobile US Inc. Responsive pleadings due by 8/5/2013. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/28/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint filed by T-Mobile US Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Sarosi, Garreth) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Huawei Device USA Inc. answer due 8/28/2013; Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. answer due 8/28/2013. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/21/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendants' Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) (Earle, Robert) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Huawei Device USA Inc. ; served on 5/30/2013 and as to T-Mobile US Inc; served on 5/31/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service- T-Mobile) (Bumgardner, Barry) Modified docket text on 6/19/2013 (cea). (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn no longer assigned to case. All future pleadings shall be filed under Civil Action No. 3:13-cv-1878-N. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/22/2013) (cea) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Fagan, Jr on behalf of Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd., T-Mobile US, Inc.. (ndt) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ndt) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/21/2013) (ykp). (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Solis. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of AO 120 re: 1 Complaint filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd., T-Mobile US, Inc. filed by Wireless Mobile Devices LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-5310768) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Cover Sheet) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 126 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?