Directv, Inc. v. Banke, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 6:03-cv-00479
District Judge Gregory A. Presnell, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Gregory A. Presnell
Last Updated September 23, 2016 at 1:16 AM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
DirecTV Group, Inc. DirecTV Group, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Directv, Inc."

Represented by Collins Law & Mediation, PL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/05/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Viktoria Collins +1 407 619 1885 +1 407 347 4092 vcollins@collinslawandmediation.com

Represented by Unknown Entity AN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey W. Day +1 407 254 5559 +1 407 254 5560 jeff@thedaylawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Carolyn A. Banke, Defendant
No Logo Jack Bercaw, Defendant

Represented by Crutchfield & Wilson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jackie Dwaine Hendren +1 321 631 7100 +1 321 639 5001 jhendren@crutchfieldlaw.com
No Logo John Bennett, Defendant
No Logo Richard J. Banke, Defendant
No Logo Robert Bennett, Defendant

Represented by Roberts Law Partners

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/15/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY David L. Robold +1 407 426 6999 +1 407 872 2266 drobold@robertsroboldlaw.com
Other Parties
No Logo J. Joaquin Fraxedas, Mediator

Represented by Fraxedas Mediation Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Joaquin Fraxedas +1 407 661 5757
Attributes
Citation Unknown
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Timeline
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER dismissing case with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a); clerk has closed the file. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/23/2004. (TKW, ) (Entered: 08/23/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None
JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice of Defendant, Jack Bercaw by Directv, Inc. (Day, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/20/2004 (AIR). (Entered: 08/20/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER dismissing case pursuant to Local Rule 3.08(b); pending motions denied as moot; case removed from November 2004 trial docket; clerk to close the file. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/17/2004. (TKW, ) (Entered: 08/17/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement for Jack Bercaw by Directv, Inc. (Day, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/12/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: None
MEDIATION REPORT Hearing held on 7/27/04 Hearing outcome: The case has been completely settled.(AIR) (Entered: 08/11/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [44-1] motion for substitution of Paul Shoucair as mediator (unopposed) (Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway) ctc (rdo) (Entered: 07/08/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: None
THIRD AMENDED NOTICE of Mediation Conference by Directv, Inc. - conference to be held on 7/21/04. (rdo) (Entered: 07/08/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: None
SECOND AMENDED NOTICE of Mediaton Conference by Directv, Inc.- mediation set for 7/21/04 before Paul Shoucair. (rdo) (Entered: 07/07/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/8/2004
UNOPPOSED MOTION by Directv, Inc. for substitution of Paul Shoucair as mediator (unopposed) (rdo) (Entered: 07/07/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: None
AMENDED NOTICE of Mediation Conference by Directv, Inc. The date of the conference has been changed from May 11, 2004 to June 8, 2004. (rdo) (Entered: 05/05/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of substitution of counsel for Directv, Inc. by Jeffrey W. Day (rdo) (Entered: 05/05/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of Mediation Conference by Directv, Inc. - Conference set for 5/11/04 at 10:00 a.m. at the offices of Stump, Storey, et al. (rdo) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court ordered Plaintiff to show cause by October 8, 2003 why the complaint against Robert Bennett should not be dismissed as a result of the discharge entered in the Bankruptcy Court. No response has been filed. It is ORDERED that the Complaint against Robert Bennett is hereby DISMISSED, without prejudice. All pending motions as to this Defendant are denied as moot. (Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell) ctc (rdo) (Entered: 10/15/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: None
RESPONSE to show cause order filed by plaintiff Directv, Inc. (rdo) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: None
ANSWER to [1-1] complaint by Jack Bercaw (rdo) (Entered: 09/29/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER. Plaintiff shall show cause within eleven days from the date of this Order why the Compaint should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Rule 3.10(a), M.D. Fla.: set show cause response due 10/8/03 for Directv, Inc. Failure to respond may result in dismissal of the defendant Jack Bercaw without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell) ctc (rdo) (Entered: 09/24/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER. The case is before the court on a letter by the Defendant Robert Bennett's attorney (doc. 35). The Plaintiff is to show cause within eleven days why the case against Robert Bennett should not be dismissed as a result of the discharge entered in the Bankruptcy Court on September 5, 2003: set show cause response due 10/1/03 for DIRECTV, Inc. Failure to respond will result in a dismissal of the defendant Robert Bennett without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell) ctc (rdo) (Entered: 09/18/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: None
LETTER RESPONSE by Robert Bennett to [34-2] show cause order for a status report (rdo) (Entered: 09/18/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: Defendant is directed to file a status report of the pending bankruptcy case within 11 days of this Order. Set status report deadline for 9/18/03 . (Signed by Judge John Antoon II) ctc (hsh) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Upon consideration of the Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Richard J. Banke (doc. 31) and Notice of Dismissal of Carolyn A. Banke doc. 30), it is ORDERED that these Defendants are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs. Any pending motions as to these Defendants are DENIED as moot. (Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell) ctc (rdo) (Entered: 07/18/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER referring case to mediation. Appointing J. Joaquin Fraxedas as mediator. Conduct hearing by 8/15/04. Lead counsel, Viktoria Collins, to coordinate dates. (Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell) ctc (rdo) (Entered: 07/18/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal of Defendant, Richard J. Banke by Directv, Inc. (rdo) Modified on 09/24/2003 (Entered: 07/18/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal of Defendant, Carolyn A. Banke by Directv, Inc. (rdo) Modified on 09/24/2003 (Entered: 07/18/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: None
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT (rdo) (Entered: 07/17/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing the Case Management Report by Directv, Inc.(rdo) Modified on 09/24/2003 (Entered: 07/17/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
REQUEST by Jack Bercaw to extend time to schedule the Case Management Meeting referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker (rdo) (Entered: 07/08/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE OF PENDENCY (no related cases) by Jack Bercaw of other actions re: order of compliance to local rule 1.04(c) (rdo) (Entered: 07/08/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE of attorney appearance for Jack Bercaw by Jackie Dwaine Hendren (rdo) (Entered: 07/08/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying [20-1] motion to dismiss the Complaint (Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell) ctc (rdo) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jack Bercaw; Re: [21-1] order. (hsh) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Directv, Inc. to [20-1] motion to dismiss the Complaint (rdo) Modified on 09/24/2003 (Entered: 06/18/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES. It is ORDERED that, within eleven days from the date of this Order, Defendant Jack Bercaw shall file and serve a CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell) ctc (rdo) (Entered: 06/17/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/27/2003
MOTION by Jack Bercaw to dismiss the Complaint (rdo) (Entered: 06/13/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (doc. 18), and pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a), it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant John Bennett is dismissed with prejudice. Any pending motions as to this Defendant are DENIED as moot. (Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell) ctc (rdo) (Entered: 06/13/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal with prejudice of Defendant John Bennett by Directv, Inc. (rdo) Modified on 09/24/2003 (Entered: 06/12/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER striking [15-1] motion for entry of clerk's default as to Robert Bennett. The defendant filed bankruptcy on May 20, 2003 and the Court issued an order staying the case. (Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell) ctc (rdo) (Entered: 06/04/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Viktoria Collins by Directv, Inc. Re: [15-1] motion for entry of clerk's default as to Robert Bennett (rdo) Modified on 09/24/2003 (Entered: 06/02/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by Directv, Inc. for entry of clerk's default as to Robert Bennett (rdo) Modified on 09/24/2003 (Entered: 06/02/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER. Pursuant to the provisions of 11 U.S.C.362, this action against Defendant Robert Bennett is automatically STAYED. Plaintiff may seek to reinstate the action as to this Defendant to active status, upon proper motion, at the conclusion of the bankruptcy proceedings. If the action against this Defendant is resolved by the bankruptcy proceedings, Plaintiff shall promptly move for dismissal of this Defendant. Bennett is directed to file and serve, on or before August 21, 2003, and every three months thereafter, a status report regarding the bankruptcy proceedings: set status report deadline for 8/21/03 (Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell) ctc (rdo) (Entered: 05/22/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None
SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy by Robert Bennett (rdo) (Entered: 05/20/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: None
RETURN of service executed as to Jack Bercaw on 4/30/03; Answer due on 5/20/03 (rdo) (Entered: 05/14/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: None
RETURN of service executed as to Robert Bennett on 4/26/03; Answer due on 5/16/03 (rdo) (Entered: 05/14/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: None
RETURN of service executed as to John Bennett on 5/1/03; Answer due on 5/21/03 (rdo) (Entered: 05/14/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: None
RETURN of service executed as to Richard J. Banke on 4/30/03; Answer due on 5/20/03 (rdo) (Entered: 05/14/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: None
RETURN of service executed as to Carolyn A. Banke on 4/30/03; Answer due on 5/20/03 (rdo) (Entered: 05/14/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing returns of service by Directv, Inc. (rdo) Modified on 09/24/2003 (Entered: 05/14/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE OF SERVICE of [3-1] Interested Persons Order and [2-1] Related Case Order and Track 2 Notice by Directv, Inc.(rdo) Modified on 09/24/2003 (Entered: 05/14/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Directv, Inc. Re: [3-1] order (rdo) Modified on 09/24/2003 (Entered: 05/02/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE OF PENDENCY (no related cases) by Directv, Inc. of other actions re: order of compliance to local rule 1.04(c) (rdo) Modified on 09/24/2003 (Entered: 05/02/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES. The Plaintiff shall, within eleven days from the date of this Order, file and serve a CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell) ctc (rdo) (Entered: 04/23/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: None
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - TRACK 2. The parties shall, within eleven days from the date of this Order, file and serve a certification as to whether there are any related cases under Local Rule 1.04(a) or (b). (ctc) (rdo) (Entered: 04/23/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: None
COMPLAINT filed under the Federal Communications Act seeking compensatory, statutory and other damages and for injunctive relief. Filing fee $150 - Receipt #11487 (rdo) Modified on 09/24/2003 (Entered: 04/22/2003)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 87 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?