JBF RAK LLC v. United States

Administrative Proceeding Court of International Trade, Case No. 1:13-cv-00211
District Judge Judith M. Barzilay, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Judith M. Barzilay
Last Updated September 22, 2016 at 3:34 AM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo JBF RAK LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Galvin & Mlawski

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack David Mlawski +1 212 679 1500 +1 212 971 0417 jm@customslaw.com

Represented by Nettles Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Joseph Galvin +1 212 679 1500 +1 212 689 2662 jjgalvin@hotmail.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States"

Represented by United States Department of Commerce

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Devin Scott Sikes +1 202 482 4044 +1 202 482 4912 devin.sikes@trade.gov

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Other Parties
No Logo DuPont Teijin Films, Intervenor-Defendant

Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Moses Horn +1 202 663 6749 +1 202 663 6363 david.horn@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Ian Kessler +1 202 663 6212 +1 202 663 6363 jeffrey.kessler@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick James McLain +1 202 663 6393 +1 202 663 6363 patrick.mclain@wilmerhale.com

Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald Ira Meltzer +1 202 663 6389 +1 202 663 6363 ronald.meltzer@wilmerhale.com
Mitsubishi Polyester Film, Inc. Mitsubishi Polyester Film, Inc., Intervenor-Defendant
No Logo Skc, Inc., Intervenor-Defendant
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Order entered on 7/3/2013, assigning action to Judge Judith M. Barzilay.(Taronji, Steve) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
Order entered on 6/28/2013 granting Motion to intervene as Defendant-Intervenors (Related Doc # 20 ).. (Goell, Geoffrey) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
Form 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by David Moses Horn of Wilmer Hale on behalf of DuPont Teijin Films, Mitsubishi Polyester Film, Inc., SKC, Inc.. (Horn, David) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
Form 17 Business Proprietary Information Certification filed on behalf of David M. Horn, Ronald I. Meltzer, Patrick J. McLain, and Jeffrey I. Kessler, as attorneys, and Susan Crawford and Susie Moyer, as consultants. Filed by David Moses Horn of Wilmer Hale on behalf of DuPont Teijin Films, Mitsubishi Polyester Film, Inc., SKC, Inc.. (Horn, David) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
Form 11 Notice of Appearance on behalf of David M. Horn, Ronald I. Meltzer, Patrick J. McLain, and Jeffrey I. Kessler. Filed by David Moses Horn of Wilmer Hale on behalf of DuPont Teijin Films, Mitsubishi Polyester Film, Inc., SKC, Inc..(Horn, David) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
Consent Motion to Intervene as Defendant intervenor . Responses due by 7/17/2013. Filed by David Moses Horn of Wilmer Hale on behalf of DuPont Teijin Films, Mitsubishi Polyester Film, Inc., SKC, Inc..(Horn, David) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
Amended complaint against United States. Filed by Jack David Mlawski of Galvin & Mlawski on behalf of JBF RAK LLC.(Mlawski, Jack) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
Order entered on 6/7/2013, Granting plaintiff's consent motion for preliminary injunction. (Related Doc # 17 ). (Taronji, Steve) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
Consent Application/Motion for preliminary injunction . Responses due by 6/26/2013. Filed by Jack David Mlawski of Galvin & Mlawski on behalf of JBF RAK LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Order, # 2 memorandum in support)(Mlawski, Jack) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
Motion to alter/amend/correct or rescind the Court's June 5, 2013 Order. Responses due by 6/25/2013. Filed by Jane Chang Dempsey of U.S. Department of Justice on behalf of United States.(Dempsey, Jane) Modified on 6/7/2013 (Taronji, Steve). (Entered: 06/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
Order entered on 6/5/2013, ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order is granted for a period of 14 days from the date of this order. ORDERED that the defendant show cause, if there is any, within the period of 14 days of this order why the suspension of liquidation of plaintiff's entries of goods ordered herein cannot continue for the duration of this action and any judicial appeals that emanate therefrom. (Related Doc # 11 ). (Taronji, Steve) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
Certificate of service of amended summons. Filed by Jack David Mlawski of Galvin & Mlawski on behalf of JBF RAK LLC. (Mlawski, Jack) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
Form 11 Notice of Appearance . Filed by Devin Scott Sikes of U.S. Department of Commerce on behalf of United States.(Sikes, Devin) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
Form 11 Notice of Appearance . Filed by Jane Chang Dempsey of U.S. Department of Justice on behalf of United States.(Dempsey, Jane) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
Application/Motion for temporary restraining order . Responses due by 6/24/2013. Filed by Jack David Mlawski of Galvin & Mlawski on behalf of JBF RAK LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in support)(Mlawski, Jack) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
Complaint against United States. Administrative Record due by 7/22/2013. Filed by Jack David Mlawski of Galvin & Mlawski on behalf of JBF RAK LLC.(Mlawski, Jack) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
Amended Summons deemed filed. Filed by Jack David Mlawski of Galvin & Mlawski on behalf of JBF RAK LLC. (Taronji, Steve) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
Order entered on 6/4/2013, Granting consent motion to alter/amend/correct Summons. (Related Doc # 7 ). (Taronji, Steve) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
Consent Motion to alter/amend/correct summons. Responses due by 6/24/2013. Filed by Jack David Mlawski of Galvin & Mlawski on behalf of JBF RAK LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Amended summons)(Mlawski, Jack) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
Summons served by Clerk's Office upon Plaintiff and appropriate Government Agency/Agencies . (Goell, Geoffrey) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
Amended Certificate of service of summons. Filed by Jack David Mlawski of Galvin & Mlawski on behalf of JBF RAK LLC. (Mlawski, Jack) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
Form 17 Business Proprietary Information Certification filed on behalf of JBF RAK LLC. Filed by Jack David Mlawski of Galvin & Mlawski on behalf of JBF RAK LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Form 17)(Mlawski, Jack) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
Form 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Jack David Mlawski of Galvin & Mlawski on behalf of JBF RAK LLC. (Mlawski, Jack) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
Form 5 Information Statement . Filed by Jack David Mlawski of Galvin & Mlawski on behalf of JBF RAK LLC. (Mlawski, Jack) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
Summons . Filed by Jack David Mlawski of Galvin & Mlawski on behalf of JBF RAK LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Mlawski, Jack) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 191 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?