TCYK, LLC v. Wikoff
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-01691-WYD-MEH

Tags
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 3:52 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (jhawk, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
    ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant Thomas Wikoff and this action are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/30/13. (jjhsl, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case and Defendant Thomas Wikoff by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit of Attempted Service)(Stephenson, David)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Summons IssuedCourt Filing
        SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form attached. (Attachments: # (1) Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jjhsl, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Summons Request
          SUMMONS REQUEST as to Thomas Wikoff by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Stephenson, David)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Amended Complaint
            AMENDED COMPLAINT against Thomas Wikoff, filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) exhibit a, # (2) exhibit b, # (3) exhibit c)(jjhsl, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/ModifyCourt Filing
              MINUTE ORDER granting [29] Motion to Amend Complaint by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/20/13.(jjhsl, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: 12/19/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                MEMORANDUM regarding [29] MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Amended Complaint to Name Doe Defendant filed by TCYK, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/19/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: 12/19/2013 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                  MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Amended Complaint to Name Doe Defendant by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Document Marked Up Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # (2) Proposed Document Marked Up Exhibit A to Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # (3) Proposed Document Clean Copy of Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # (4) Exhibit Clean Copy of Exhibit A to Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit B to Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit C to Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Stephenson, David)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: 12/19/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants John Does 3, 4, 5, 7, 11, 13, 14, 15, 16, and 19 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/18/13. (jjhsl, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: 12/18/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 3, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 7, John Doe 9, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, and John Doe 19 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David) Modified on 1/2/2014 to correct text (jjhsl, ).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                        MINUTE ORDER granting [24] Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/22/13.(jjhsl, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                          MEMORANDUM regarding [24] MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendants filed by TCYK, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/21/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                            MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendants by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Stephenson, David)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: 11/12/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants John Doe 6 and John Doe 20 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. John Doe 1 and John Doe 18 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. These Defendants shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/12/13. (jjhsl, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/10/2013, Entered: 11/10/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 1 and John Doe 18 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/10/2013, Entered: 11/10/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 6 and John Doe 20 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/24/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [17] Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants. Plaintiff shall serve Defendants in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 on or before 11/23/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/23/2013. (mehcd)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                      MEMORANDUM regarding [17] MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants filed by TCYK, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/23/13. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                        MEMORANDUM regarding [17] MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants filed by TCYK, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/23/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proof of Service Comcast, # (2) Exhibit Proof of Service Bresnan, # (3) Exhibit Proof of Service CenturyTel, # (4) Exhibit Production Response--Charter, # (5) Exhibit 1st Production Response--Comcast, # (6) Exhibit 2nd Production Response--Comcast, # (7) Exhibit No charge by process server, # (8) Exhibit 1st Production Response--CenturyTel, # (9) Exhibit 2nd Production Response--CenturyTel)(Stephenson, David)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant John Doe 2 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/23/13. (jjhsl, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/22/2013, Entered: 9/22/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 2 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/25/2013, Entered: 8/25/2013 Amended Complaint
                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Spreadsheet of Doe Defendants, # (2) Exhibit Copyright Registration Certificate, # (3) Exhibit Local Listings of the Motion Picture)(Stephenson, David)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013 Restricted Document - Level 2
                                                  RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2 (jjhsl, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: 7/17/2013 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                    MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a status report within five (5) days of the date of this order, then on the tenth day of each month thereafter, informing the Court of the status of service in this case. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/17/2013. (mehcd)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: 7/11/2013 Order on Motion for LeaveCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [8] Motion for Leave to Take Limited Expedited Discovery Priorto Rule 26(f) Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 07/11/13.(jjhsl, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: 7/1/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                        MEMORANDUM regarding [8] MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Expedited Discovery filed by TCYK, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/1/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: 7/1/2013 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (5) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/1/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/30/2013, Entered: 6/30/2013 Motion for Leave
                                                            MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Expedited Discovery by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration in support of motion, # (2) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Stephenson, David)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: 6/27/2013 Magistrate Judge Consent FormCourt Filing
                                                              Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued. (agarc, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: 6/27/2013 Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
                                                                REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights. (agarc, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: 6/27/2013 Case Assigned to JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                  Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Micheal E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: 6/27/2013 Complaint
                                                                    COMPLAINT against John Does 1-20 (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-3425200), filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Spreadsheet of Doe Defendants, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Registration, # (3) Exhibit Local Listings of the Motion Picture, # (4) Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephenson, David)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: 6/27/2013 Administrative Notice
                                                                      Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Stephenson, David)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Take Limited Expedited Discovery Priorto Rule 26(f) Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 07/11/13.(jjhsl, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Notice of Case Association
                                                                            NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?