TILLMAN v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Northern District Court, Case No. 4:09-cv-00423
District Judge Robert L. Hinkle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 27, 2016 at 7:48 PM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SHELLEY TILLMAN, Plaintiff

Represented by THOMAS A WARREN LAW OFFICES PL - TALLAHASSEE FL

v.
No Logo DANIEL D BROWN, Defendant
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant

Represented by Capitol Station

Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

No Logo IOAN S CIUNGU, Defendant
No Logo JAMES MCDONOUGH, Defendant
No Logo JOHN PERRY, Defendant
No Logo RONNIE HARRIS, Defendant
No Logo TONY FLETCHER STEWART, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to doc. 28 Order For Dismissal. (dlt) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/31/2010, Entered: None
    ORDER FOR DISMISSAL re 27 Mediation Report - Settled - "The parties are ordered to comply with their settlement agreement. The court reserves jurisdiction to enforce the order to comply with the settlement agreement. All claims in this case are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41.. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/31/2010. (dlt) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
      AMENDED MEDIATION REPORT - Settled (dlt) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
        MEDIATION REPORT - Impasse (dlt) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
          ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Attorney Conference to take place by 9/10/2010. Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/22/2010. Jury Trial set for 10/18/2010 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2010 10:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/13/2010. (dlt) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
            ANSWER to 18 Amended Complaint by DANIEL D BROWN, IOAN S CIUNGU, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, RONNIE HARRIS, JAMES MCDONOUGH, JOHN PERRY, TONY FLETCHER STEWART. (MAHER, SUSAN) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
              MOTION for Default Judgment as to all Defendants by SHELLEY TILLMAN. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/2/2010). (COOK, JAMES) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN PATRICK SANFORD on behalf of DANIEL D BROWN, IOAN S CIUNGU, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, RONNIE HARRIS, JAMES MCDONOUGH, JOHN PERRY, TONY FLETCHER STEWART (SANFORD, JONATHAN) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/29/2010, Entered: None
                  ORDER EXTENDING THE RULE 26(a)(2) AND DISCOVERY DEADLINES. GRANTING 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by SHELLEY TILLMAN. ( Dispositive Motions to be filed by 8/30/2010., Discovery due by 8/9/2010., Mediation Report due by 9/7/2010., Jury Trial set for the two week trial that begins 10/18/2010 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE.). Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/29/2010. (pll) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None
                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by SHELLEY TILLMAN. (COOK, JAMES) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                      ORDER GRANTING 17 LEAVE TO FILE THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DENYING AS MOOT 13 THE MOTION TO DISMISS THE ORIGINAL COMPLAINT - The first amended complaint doc 18 is deemed properly filed today. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/17/2010. (erl) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                        FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DANIEL D BROWN, IOAN S CIUNGU, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, RONNIE HARRIS, JAMES MCDONOUGH, JOHN PERRY, TONY FLETCHER STEWART, filed by SHELLEY TILLMAN. (COOK, JAMES) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
                          Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by SHELLEY TILLMAN. (COOK, JAMES) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SHELLEY TILLMAN. (COOK, JAMES) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                              SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER :( Discovery due by 7/16/2010., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 8/6/2010., Jury Trial set for 10/18/2010 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE., Mediation Report due by 8/27/2010.), Case referred to mediation.. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 3/25/2010. (dlt) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (COOK, JAMES) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                  MOTION to Dismiss by DANIEL D BROWN, IOAN S CIUNGU, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, RONNIE HARRIS, JAMES MCDONOUGH, JOHN PERRY, TONY FLETCHER STEWART. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/12/2010). (MAHER, SUSAN) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by CEDELL IAN GARLAND on behalf of DANIEL D BROWN, IOAN S CIUNGU, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, RONNIE HARRIS, JAMES MCDONOUGH, JOHN PERRY, TONY FLETCHER STEWART (GARLAND, CEDELL) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN ADAMS MAHER on behalf of FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (MAHER, SUSAN) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN ADAMS MAHER on behalf of IOAN S CIUNGU (MAHER, SUSAN) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                          INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER :Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 3/9/2010. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/8/2010. Discovery due by 6/16/2010.. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 02/23/2010. (dlt) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/15/2010, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN ADAMS MAHER on behalf of DANIEL D BROWN, RONNIE HARRIS, JAMES MCDONOUGH, JOHN PERRY, TONY FLETCHER STEWART (MAHER, SUSAN) (Entered: 02/15/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHELLEY TILLMAN. TONY FLETCHER STEWART waiver sent on 1/11/2010, answer due 3/12/2010. (COOK, JAMES) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHELLEY TILLMAN. JAMES MCDONOUGH waiver sent on 1/11/2010, answer due 3/12/2010. (COOK, JAMES) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHELLEY TILLMAN. RONNIE HARRIS waiver sent on 1/11/2010, answer due 3/12/2010. (COOK, JAMES) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                    Summons Issued as to FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, JAMES MCDONOUGH, RONNIE HARRIS, IOAN S CIUNGU, TONY FLETCHER STEWART, JOHN PERRY, DANIEL D BROWN. (dlt) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET. (COOK, JAMES) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                        DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT TO PLAINTIFF COUNSEL: Re 1 Complaint***Counsel is reminded that "Party Names" are to be entered in "ALL CAPS". This Attorney Office should review the information on filing civil cases electronically, see Guide: Civil Case Opening By Attorneys under the CM/ECF section of the N.D. Fla. website before filing another case. (dlt) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                          COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 11290000000001421756.), filed by Shelley Tillman. (Attachments: # 1 Summons) (COOK, JAMES) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 275 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?