Aguilar et al v. Owl's Nest, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-03848
District Judge Joseph F. Bianco, presiding

Tags
Last Updated April 14, 2017 at 12:01 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alba Aguilar, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Make the Road New York, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Magdalena Barbosa +1 718 565 8500 +1 718 565 0646 magdalena.barbosa@maketheroadny.org

Represented by Shulman Kessler LLP

No Logo CARMEN RODRIGUEZ, Plaintiff
No Logo Consuelo Duque, Plaintiff

Represented by Bourgeois, Guillaume

Toggle Switch Represented by Shulman Kessler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy L. Kessler +1 631 499 9100 +1 631 499 9120 tk@shulmankessler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marijana F Matura +1 631 499 9100 +1 631 499 9120 mm@shulmankessler.com
No Logo Luis E. Castro Alzate, Plaintiff
No Logo Martina Gonzalez, Plaintiff

Represented by Bourgeois, Guillaume

Toggle Switch Represented by Shulman Kessler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy L. Kessler +1 631 499 9100 +1 631 499 9120 tk@shulmankessler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marijana F Matura +1 631 499 9100 +1 631 499 9120 mm@shulmankessler.com
No Logo Mercedes Melgarejo, Plaintiff

Represented by Bourgeois, Guillaume

Toggle Switch Represented by Shulman Kessler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy L. Kessler +1 631 499 9100 +1 631 499 9120 tk@shulmankessler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marijana F Matura +1 631 499 9100 +1 631 499 9120 mm@shulmankessler.com
v.
No Logo Owl's Nest, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey N. Naness +1 516 827 4300 +1 516 827 0202 j.naness@verizon.net
No Logo Mercer, Robert Leroy, Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert Mercer"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey N. Naness +1 516 827 4300 +1 516 827 0202 j.naness@verizon.net
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. The clerk of the court shall close the case.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 12/16/2013. (Bollbach, Jean) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alba Aguilar, Luis E. Castro Alzate, Consuelo Duque, Martina Gonzalez, Mercedes Melgarejo, Carmen Rodriguez with prejudice (Kessler, Troy) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
      Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, jointly submitted by all parties by Alba Aguilar, Luis E. Castro Alzate, Consuelo Duque, Martina Gonzalez, Mercedes Melgarejo, Carmen Rodriguez. (Matura, Marijana) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
        Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise move to be so ordered by Robert Mercer, Owl's Nest, Inc.. (Naness, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
          Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Move by Robert Mercer, Owl's Nest, Inc.. (Naness, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
            CONSENT to become party in a class action. by All Plaintiffs (Weiser, Ilan) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Ilan Weiser on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Weiser, Ilan) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                CONSENT to become party in a class action. by All Plaintiffs (Kessler, Troy) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                  CONSENT to become party in a class action. by Consuelo Duque (Matura, Marijana) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                    CONSENT to become party in a class action. by Mercedes Melgarejo (Matura, Marijana) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 7.1 Statement, Stip accept service and extend time to answer served on Troy K. Kessler, Esq. on July 22, 2013, filed by Owl's Nest, Inc.. (Naness, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                        DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Owl's Nest, Inc.. (Naness, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                          First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Accept Service by Owl's Nest, Inc.. (Naness, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey N. Naness on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Naness, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                              Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Talbott, Thomas) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/18/2013) (Talbott, Thomas). (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (McMahon, Carol) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                  COMPLAINT against Robert Mercer, Owl's Nest, Inc. Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Alba Aguilar, Carmen Rodriguez, Luis E. Castro Alzate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (McMahon, Carol) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 512 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?