Michael Scott v. Watsontown Trucking Co. Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 13-1228

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 6:51 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4350 - Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00404401040 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Michael Lewis Scott. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 04/16/2013. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? No. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999087836] [13-1228] John Garza
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404401040 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Michael Lewis Scott. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 04/16/2013. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? No. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999087836] [13-1228] John Garza
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00404330988 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John K. Messersmith, IV James H. Revere, III for William A. Miller, III and Watsontown Trucking Co. Inc..[999054997] [13-1228] James Revere
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404330988 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John K. Messersmith, IV James H. Revere, III for William A. Miller, III and Watsontown Trucking Co. Inc..[999054997] [13-1228] James Revere
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404330988 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John K. Messersmith, IV James H. Revere, III for William A. Miller, III and Watsontown Trucking Co. Inc..[999054997] [13-1228] James Revere
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
            BRIEF by Appellees William A. Miller, III and Watsontown Trucking Co. Inc. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Response. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/20/2013. [999111077] [13-1228] John Messersmith
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
              FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Michael Lewis Scott. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 04/16/2013. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? No. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999087836] [13-1228] John Garza
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                BRIEF by Appellant Michael Lewis Scott in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/16/2013. [999087821] [13-1228] John Garza
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None
                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John K. Messersmith, IV for William A. Miller, III and Watsontown Trucking Co. Inc..[999063439] [13-1228] John Messersmith
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                    Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1228] (SLW)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
                      BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/16/2013. Response Brief due 05/20/2013 [13-1228] (SEN)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 9 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                        Docket correction requested from Mr. John K. Messersmith, IV for [3] appearance of counsel. Access to appearance of counsel has been restricted to case participants. [13-1228] (SEN)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                          Amended DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Michael Lewis Scott. [13-1228] John Garza
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                            DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Michael Lewis Scott. [13-1228] John Garza
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Michael Lewis Scott. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999057277] [13-1228] John Garza
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by JOHN R. GARZA for Michael Lewis Scott.[999057273] [13-1228] John Garza
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellees William A. Miller, III and Watsontown Trucking Co. Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999055001] [13-1228] James Revere
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                                    DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 3:12-cv-00176-DJN.. [13-1228] (SEN)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                                      Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:12-cv-00176-DJN. Case manager: SNagle. [13-1228] (SEN)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?