Banks et al v. Wagner et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Middle District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00934
District Judge Christopher C. Conner, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 24, 2016 at 3:47 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Damian Black Fox, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Damian Black Fox
No Logo Banks, Frederick H., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Frederick Banks"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frederick Banks +1 979 775 5681
v.
No Logo Albio Sines, Defendant
No Logo Allyson Y. Schwartz, Defendant
No Logo Amerex Corp., Defendant
No Logo American Samsa, Defendant
No Logo Amerigas Propane, LP, Defendant
No Logo Amy Klobucher, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Cicio, Defendant
No Logo Arlen Specter, Defendant
No Logo Army, Mail Management Unit, Defendant
No Logo Attorney Clarke, Defendant
No Logo Badger Fire Protection, Defendant
No Logo Barbara A. Mikulski, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Boxer, Defendant
No Logo Benjamin E. Nelson, Defendant
No Logo Benjamin L. Cordin, Defendant
No Logo Bernard Sanders, Defendant
No Logo Bill Nelson, Defendant
No Logo Bill Poscrell, Defendant
No Logo Bill Shuster, Defendant
No Logo Blanche L. Lincoln, Defendant
No Logo Bob Corker, Defendant
No Logo Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Defendant
No Logo Bureau of Indian Affairs, Defendant
No Logo Byron L. Dorgan, Defendant
No Logo C-Span, Defendant
No Logo Cameron Lindsey, Defendant
No Logo Canberra Corporation, Defendant
No Logo CARL LEVIN, Defendant
No Logo Catherine Teti, Defendant
No Logo Chaka Fatlah, Defendant
No Logo Charles E. Grassley, Defendant
No Logo Charles E. Schumer, Defendant
No Logo Charles W. Dent, Defendant
No Logo Christopher H. Smith, Defendant
No Logo Christopher J. Bond, Defendant
No Logo Christopher J. Dodd, Defendant
No Logo Christopher P. Corney, Defendant
No Logo Chuck Hagel, Defendant
No Logo City of Camden, NJ, Defendant
No Logo City of Harrisburg, PA, Defendant
No Logo City of Pittsburgh, PA, Defendant
No Logo City of San Francisco, CA, Defendant
No Logo City of Scranton, PA, Defendant
No Logo City of Waymart, PA, Defendant
No Logo Claire McCaskill, Defendant
No Logo Clydsdale Marsupials, Defendant
No Logo CNN, Defendant
Colgate-Palmolive Company Colgate-Palmolive Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Colgate-Palmolive Co."
No Logo Commanding General In Charge (Air Force) Fort Dix, Defendant
No Logo Commanding General in Charge (Army) at Ft. Dix, NJ, Defendant
No Logo Commanding General in Charge (Navy) Fort Dix, Defendant
No Logo Commissioner of Indian Affairs, Defendant
No Logo Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Defendant
No Logo Comptroller General of the United States, Defendant
No Logo Congressman James Hitmore, Defendant
No Logo Counselor Corbella, Defendant
No Logo Craig, Thomas, Defendant
Officer/Director, Idexx Laboratories Inc /de
No Logo Cynthia M. Fagnoni, Defendant
No Logo Daniel K. Inouye, Defendant
No Logo David Clark, Defendant
No Logo David M. Walker, Defendant
No Logo David Vitter, Defendant
No Logo Debbie Stabenow, Defendant
No Logo Delegate Eleanor Holmes Norton, Defendant
No Logo Delegate Madeleine Z. Bordello, Defendant
No Logo Department Of Agriculture, Defendant
No Logo Department of Air Force, Defendant
No Logo Department Of Commerce, Defendant
United States Department of Energy United States Department of Energy, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Energy"
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Health and Human Services"
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Homeland Security"
No Logo Department Of Housing And Urban Development, Defendant
No Logo Department of Interior, Defendant
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Justice"
United States Department of Labor United States Department of Labor, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Labor"
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of State"
United States Army United States Army, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of The Army"
United States Navy United States Navy, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of the Navy"
United States Department of the Treasury United States Department of the Treasury, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Treasury"
United States Department of Veterans Affairs United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Veteran Affairs"
No Logo Designation and Computation Center, Defendant
No Logo Designators, Defendant
No Logo Diamond Chemical Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Digital Imaging Co., Defendant
No Logo Director, Defendant
No Logo Dixon, Defendant
No Logo Dr. Lopez, Defendant
No Logo Ecolab Co., Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth H. Dole, Defendant
No Logo Erin F.H. Faleomavaega, Defendant
No Logo Even Bayh, Defendant
No Logo Executive Office Of The President, Defendant
No Logo FCI Fort Dix Legal Department, Defendant
No Logo FCI Safford, AZ, Defendant
Federal Bureau of Prisons Federal Bureau of Prisons, Defendant
No Logo Forbes, Defendant
No Logo Fortune, Defendant
Fox News Network LLC Fox News Network LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Fox News"
No Logo Frances Garcia, Defendant
No Logo Frank Pallone, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Frank R. Lautensberg, Defendant
No Logo Gene L. Dodaro, Defendant
No Logo George Strader, Defendant
No Logo George V. Voinovich, Defendant
No Logo Gloria Jarmon, Defendant
No Logo Gordon Smith, Defendant
No Logo Gregory D. Kutz, Defendant
No Logo Guami Delegate Donna M. Christensen, Defendant
No Logo Guami Delegute, Defendant
No Logo Harley Lappin, Defendant
No Logo Harry Reid, Defendant
No Logo Helen Hsing, Defendant
No Logo Henry L. Hunton, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Herb Kohl, Defendant
Hewlett-Packard Company Hewlett-Packard Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Hewlett Packard Co."
Officer/Director, Navisite, Inc.
Officer/Director, E-cruiter.com Inc.
Officer/Director, Novadigm, Inc.
No Logo Inspector General (US), Defendant
No Logo J. Christopher Mihm, Defendant
No Logo Jack Reed, Defendant
No Logo Jacquelyn Williams-Bridgers, Defendant
No Logo James M. Inhose, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Bigaman, Defendant
Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III, Defendant
Officially listed as "Jeff Sessions"
United States Department of Justice Attorney General, United States Department of Justice, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
United States of America Attorney General, United States of America, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
No Logo Jeffrey C. Shenhoff, Defendant
No Logo Jim Browning, Defendant
No Logo Jim Demint, Defendant
No Logo Jim Gerlach, Defendant
No Logo Jim Saxton, Defendant
No Logo Jim Webb, Defendant
No Logo Jo Kyl, Defendant
No Logo Joe Sestak, Defendant
No Logo Joel Willemsen, Defendant
No Logo John Anderson, Jr., Defendant
No Logo John Cornyn, Defendant
No Logo John D. Rockefeller, Defendant
No Logo John E. Sunvner, Defendant
No Logo John Ensign, Defendant
No Logo John F. Kerry, Defendant
No Logo John McCain, Defendant
No Logo JOHN P. MURPHY, Defendant
No Logo John Peterson, Defendant
No Logo John Thune, Defendant
No Logo John W. Warner, Defendant
No Logo Johnny Isaksen, Defendant
No Logo Jon Tester, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Applebaum, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Kraus, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Lieberman, Defendant
No Logo Joseph R. Pitts, Defendant
No Logo Judd Gregg, Defendant
No Logo Julie Nicklin, Defendant
No Logo Katherine Schinas, Defendant
No Logo Kay Bailey Hutchison, Defendant
No Logo Keith Rhodes, Defendant
No Logo Kent Conrad, Defendant
No Logo Kipplmyers, Defendant
No Logo Lamar, Alexander, Defendant
No Logo Larry E. Craig, Defendant
Graham, Lindsey O. Graham, Lindsey O., Defendant
Officially listed as "Lindsey O. Graham"
No Logo Majorie Kanoff, Defendant
No Logo Marc Penda, Defendant
No Logo Maria Contwell, Defendant
No Logo Mark Pryor, Defendant
No Logo Mary Landrieu, Defendant
No Logo Max Bamens, Defendant
No Logo Michael F. Doyle, Defendant
No Logo Michael G. Fitzpatrick, Defendant
No Logo Michael W. Boheny, Defendant
No Logo Mike Crapo, Defendant
No Logo Mike Enzi, Defendant
No Logo Misco Products Corp., Defendant
McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mitch McConnell"
No Logo Money, Defendant
No Logo MSNBC, Defendant
No Logo Nancy Kingbury, Defendant
No Logo National Enquirer, Defendant
No Logo National Security Council, Defendant
No Logo New York Post, Defendant
No Logo New York Times, Defendant
No Logo Newsweek, Defendant
No Logo Norm Coleman, Defendant
No Logo Norman Rabkin, Defendant
No Logo Office Of Administration, Defendant
Executive Office of the President Office Of Management And Budget Executive Office of the President Office Of Management And Budget, Defendant
Officially listed as "Office of Management and Budget"
No Logo Office Of National Drug Control Policy,, Defendant
No Logo Office of Policy Development, Defendant
No Logo Office of the Vice President of the United States, Defendant
No Logo Olympia J. Snowe, Defendant
No Logo Orrin G. Hatch, Defendant
No Logo Panasonic Communications Co. Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Pat Roberts, Defendant
No Logo Patricia A. Dulton, Defendant
No Logo Patrick J. Murphy, Defendant
No Logo Patrick Leahy, Defendant
No Logo Patty Murray, Defendant
No Logo PAUL ANDERSON, Defendant
No Logo People, Defendant
No Logo Pete V. Domenici, Defendant
No Logo Phil English, Defendant
No Logo Philadelphia Inquirer, Defendant
No Logo Pittsburgh Post Gazette, Defendant
No Logo Pittsburgh Tribune Review, Defendant
No Logo Praxair, Inc., Defendant
No Logo President Barack Obama, Defendant
No Logo Richard Barr, Defendant
No Logo Richard C. Shelby, Defendant
No Logo Richard D. Lugar, Defendant
No Logo Richard J. Hillman, Defendant
No Logo Robert A. Brady, Defendant
No Logo Robert A. Robinson, Defendant
No Logo Robert Burpy, Defendant
No Logo Robert C. Byrd, Defendant
No Logo Robert E. Andrews, Defendant
No Logo Robert F. Bennett, Defendant
No Logo Robert Menendez, Defendant
No Logo Robert P. Casey, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Ron Wyden, Defendant
No Logo Ronald Fecso, Defendant
No Logo Ronald Stroman, Defendant
No Logo Rush D. Holt, Defendant
No Logo Russell D. Feingold, Defendant
No Logo Sally Anne Harper, Defendant
No Logo Sam Brownback, Defendant
No Logo Saxby Chambliss, Defendant
No Logo Secretary Ken Salazar, Defendant
No Logo Secretary of Army, Defendant
No Logo Secretary of Navy, Defendant
No Logo United States Air Force, Defendant
Officially listed as "Secretary of the Air Force"
No Logo Senator Daniel K. Akaka, Defendant
No Logo Sheldon Whitehouse, Defendant
No Logo Sherrod Brown, Defendant
No Logo Sidney Schwartz, Defendant
No Logo Star, Defendant
No Logo Starco Chemical, Defendant
No Logo State of New Jersey, Defendant
No Logo Stephen R. Rothman, Defendant
No Logo Susan M. Collins, Defendant
No Logo Susan Offutt, Defendant
No Logo Thad Cochran, Defendant
No Logo The White House Office, Defendant
No Logo Thomas J. McCool, Defendant
No Logo Thomas R. Carper, Defendant
No Logo Tim Holden, Defendant
No Logo Tim Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Tim Murphy, Defendant
No Logo Time, Defendant
No Logo Timothy Bowling, Defendant
No Logo Todd Russell Platts, Defendant
No Logo Tom Coburn, Defendant
No Logo Tom Harkin, Defendant
No Logo Unit Manager Barbara Brown, Defendant
United States House of Representatives United States House of Representatives, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
United States Senate United States Senate, Defendant
No Logo U.s. Government Accountability Office, Defendant
No Logo USA Today, Defendant
Biden Jr., Joseph R. Biden Jr., Joseph R., Defendant
Officially listed as "Vice President Joseph Biden"
No Logo Wagner, Defendant
No Logo Wall Street Journal, Defendant
No Logo Warden Conrad Graber, Defendant
No Logo Warden Donna Zickefiose, Defendant
No Logo Washington, D.C., Defendant
No Logo Wayne Allard, Defendant
No Logo Wired, Defendant
No Logo Wooford, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
ORDER re: petition for writ of mandamus 1 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Clrk of Ct to transfer case to USDC for District of New Jersey.; 2. Disposition of motion to proceed IFP 2 left to discretion of transferee court.; 3. Clrk of Ct directed to CLOSE case. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 05/19/11. (ki) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
    PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (pjr) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
      STANDING PRACTICE ORDER informing the parties in this action of their briefing and other responsibilities.Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 05/18/11. (pjr) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Frederick Banks.(pjr) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
          COMPLAINT IN MANDAMUS - n/c to plaintiff's; no jury trial demanded filed by Frederick Banks.(pjr) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 93 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?