Spak et al v. 1 World Trade Center LLC. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-09396
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 14, 2016 at 6:16 PM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Marina Spak, Plaintiff
No Logo Steven Spak, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Joseph Dubanevich +1 212 267 3700 wdubanevich@napolibern.com
v.
No Logo 1 World Trade Center LLC., Defendant
No Logo 1 WTC Holdings LLC., Defendant
No Logo 2 World Trade Center LLC., Defendant
No Logo 2 WTC Holdings LLC., Defendant
No Logo 4 World Trade Center LLC., Defendant
No Logo 4 WTC Holding LLC., Defendant
No Logo 5 World Trade Center LLC., Defendant
No Logo 5 WTC Holding LLC., Defendant
No Logo A Russo Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ABM, Defendant
ABM Industries, Inc. ABM Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Acrow Corporation Of America, Defendant
No Logo Allcom Electric Inc., Defendant
No Logo AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling LLC., Defendant
No Logo ASG Pest Control, Defendant
No Logo Atc Associates, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Atlantic Heydt Corp., Defendant
No Logo Atlas Concrete Corp., Defendant
No Logo Avanti demolition & Carting Inc.,, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Construction, Inc., Defendant
Bechtel Corporation Bechtel Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bergen Concrete Cutting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Berkel & Company Contractors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo BFP One Liberty Plaza Co., L.P., Defendant
No Logo BFP Tower C Co. LLC., Defendant
No Logo Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Boston Properties, Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Breeze Carting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Breeze National Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Defendant
No Logo Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.c., Defendant
No Logo C & D Fireproofing & Plastering Corp., Defendant
No Logo C & D Painting & Decorating, Inc., Defendant
No Logo C.B. Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Canron Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Cantor Seinuk Group, PC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Cantor Seinuk Group"
No Logo Certified Fence Corp., Defendant
No Logo Civetta-Cousins JV, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Clarco Enterprises Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Clarco Enterprises LLC., Defendant
No Logo Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Communications Holding Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Development, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Coordinated Metals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Craig Test Boring Company Inc., Defendant
No Logo Criticom International Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., Defendant
No Logo D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Defendant
No Logo Dakota Demo-Tech, Inc., Defendant
No Logo DCM Erectors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Defendant
No Logo Diego Construction, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diversified Carting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo DMT Enterprise, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo EJ Davies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo En-Tech Corp., Defendant
No Logo Entertainment Partners Corp., Defendant
No Logo ET Environmental, Defendant
No Logo Evergreen Recycling of Corona(EROC), Defendant
No Logo Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Executive Medical Services, P.C., Defendant
No Logo F & G Mechanical, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Felix Equities, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fleet Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Frank Micelli Jr. Contracting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo FTI Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo G & G Contracting Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, LLP, Defendant
No Logo Gino Cracolici & Sons Inc., Defendant
No Logo Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, PLLC., Defendant
No Logo Grace Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hallen Welding Service,Inc., Defendant
No Logo Helmsman Management Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo HGC Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo High Rise Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc., Defendant
No Logo High-Rise Electric, Inc., Defendant
No Logo HP Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hunter Construction Co., Defendant
No Logo Hunter Construction., Defendant
No Logo JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc., Defendant
Koch Skanska Inc. Koch Skanska Inc., Defendant
No Logo Laquila Construction Inc., Defendant
No Logo LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers P.C., Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc. Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Liberty Mutual Insurance Company"
No Logo Liberty Mutual Managed Care Inc., Defendant
No Logo LIRO, INC, Defendant
No Logo Lockwood Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lower Manhattan Development Corp., Defendant
No Logo Lucius Pitkin, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Defendant
No Logo M.G. McLaren, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Manafort Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Manafort Brothers Incorporated"
No Logo Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Medcor Medical and Hospital Supply, Defendant
No Logo Ment Bros. Iron Works Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Meridian Construction Group, Defendant
No Logo MG McLaren, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Moody's Investors Service, Defendant
No Logo Moretrench American Corporation, Defendant
No Logo MRA Engineering, PC, Defendant
No Logo Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Musco Sports Lighting, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Nacirema Industries Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Defendant
No Logo Nicholson Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo NYC Industrial Development Agency, Defendant
No Logo Off Road Welding, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Olympic Plumbing & Heating Corp., Defendant
No Logo Ove Arup & Partners P.C., Defendant
No Logo Parson Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle, Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Management Corp., Defendant
No Logo Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Defendant
No Logo Pro Safety Services, Llc, Defendant
No Logo PT & L Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rich-Mark Environmental Services Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rober Silman Associates, Defendant
No Logo Robert C Stewart, Defendant
No Logo Robert Errat, Defendant
No Logo Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rodar Enterprises, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Royal GM, Inc., Defendant
No Logo SAB Trucking Inc., Defendant
No Logo Safeway Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Seasons Industrial Contracting, Defendant
No Logo Semcor Equipment and Manufacturing Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Sheldrake Organization, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Silverite Contracting Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Development Corp., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Facility Manager LLC., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC LLC., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC MGMT Co. LLC., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Properties LLC., Defendant
No Logo Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc., Defendant
No Logo Skidmore, Owing & Merrill LLP, Defendant
No Logo Star Delta Electric, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Stier Anderson, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Summit Structures LLC., SURVIVAIR, Defendant
No Logo Telenet Communication Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Defendant
Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties, Defendant
No Logo Tomasetti Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Torretta Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Total Safety Consulting, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Trio Asbestos Removal, Defendant
No Logo Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Co Inc, Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Tully Consulting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Tully Environmental Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tully Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Turner Construction Co., Defendant
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Turner Construction International, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Tyyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), Defendant
No Logo United States Rebar, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vanguard Equities Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vertical Lend, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vertical Technology, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vollmer Associates LLP., Defendant
No Logo W HARRIS & SONS INC, Defendant
No Logo Weeks Marine Inc., Defendant
No Logo Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Westfield America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Westfield WTC Holding LLC., Defendant
No Logo Westfield WTC, LLC., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower D. Co., LP, Defendant
No Logo Whitney Contracting Inc., Defendant
No Logo Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., Defendant
No Logo World Trade Center Properties LLC, Defendant
No Logo Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo YONKERS CONTRACTING Company INC., Defendant
No Logo Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc.,, Defendant
Citation Section 49 U.S.C. § 40101
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FINAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT: (THIS STIPULATED ORDER PERTAINS TO ALL PLAINTIFFS AND DOCKET NUMBERS SET FORTH ON EXHIBIT A) IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED Plaintiffs and Settling Defendants have entered into a settlement agreement resolving all claims by Plaintiffs against Settling Defendants in the above-captioned action. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' claims against the Settling Defendants and each of them shall be dismissed, and hereby are dismissed, with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/25/2011) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/25/11) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(jw) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the Plaintiffs listed on the attached Schedule A, and the attorneys for defendants BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LP, BFP One Liberty Plaza Co., LLC, BFP Tower C Co. LLC, Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., WFP Tower A Co., LP, WFP Tower B Co., LP and WFP Tower D Co., LP (collectively the "Brookfield Parties") in these actions, that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of this action, the matters listed on the attached Schedule A are hereby discontinued without prejudice as against the above-named Brookfield Parties only, and without costs to any party... and as further set forth. Relates to All cases listed in Schedule A. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/27/10) (rjm) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/16/2009, Entered: None
      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by Kristen M. Hackford. Document filed by Steven Spak, Marina Spak. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 02/16/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Diego Construction, Inc. served on 1/26/2007, answer due 2/15/2007. Document filed by Steven Spak; Marina Spak. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Port Authority of New York and New Jersey served on 5/2/2006, answer due 5/22/2006. Document filed by Steven Spak; Marina Spak. (Rubin, Denise) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc. served on 5/11/2006, answer due 5/31/2006. Service was accepted by Kristen M Hackford. Document filed by Steven Spak; Marina Spak. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/3/2008, Entered: None
              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Safeway Environmental Corp. served on 5/3/2006, answer due 5/23/2006. Document filed by Steven Spak; Marina Spak. (Dubanevich, William) (Entered: 08/03/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. LaStrada General Contracting Corp. served on 5/3/2006, answer due 5/23/2006. Service was accepted by Lastrada General Contracting Corp. Document filed by Steven Spak; Marina Spak. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Breeze Carting Corp. served on 5/3/2006, answer due 5/23/2006. Document filed by Steven Spak. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. served on 5/3/2006, answer due 5/23/2006. Document filed by Steven Spak; Marina Spak. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Tishman Speyer Properties served on 5/2/2006, answer due 5/22/2006. Service was accepted by J.M. (unreadable). Document filed by Steven Spak; Marina Spak. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None
                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Fleet Trucking, Inc. served on 5/3/2006, answer due 5/23/2006. Service was accepted by Fleet Trucking, Inc. Document filed by Steven Spak; Marina Spak. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None
                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Breeze National Inc. served on 5/3/2006, answer due 5/23/2006. Service was accepted by Breeze National, Inc.. Document filed by Steven Spak; Marina Spak. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None
                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Hallen Welding Service,Inc. served on 5/11/2006, answer due 5/31/2006. Service was accepted by J. Baum. Document filed by Steven Spak; Marina Spak. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Whitney Contracting Inc. served on 5/11/2006, answer due 5/31/2006. Service was accepted by Joanne Pisano. Document filed by Steven Spak; Marina Spak. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Tucci Equipment Rental Corp. served on 5/3/2006, answer due 5/23/2006. Service was accepted by Daneen Gazzola. Document filed by Steven Spak; Marina Spak. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  DUPLICATE STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL... that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the actions, the above actions listed are discontinued without prejudice against Cushman and Wakefield, Inc., only, without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation and order. This Document relates to All Cases listed in this document. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/4/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00100-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York Crane & Equipment Corp. served on 5/3/2006, answer due 5/23/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Steven Spak. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: None
                                      COMPLAINT against JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc., Koch Skanska, Inc., Laquila Construction Inc., LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers P.C., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Managed Care Inc., Liro, Inc., Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Lower Manhattan Development Corp., 4 World Trade Center LLC., Lucius Pitkin, Inc., LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, M.G. McLaren, P.C., Manafort Brothers Incorporated, Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Medcor Medical and Hospital Supply, Ment Bros. Iron Works Co., Inc., Meridian Construction Group, MG McLaren, P.C., Moody's Investors Service, 4 WTC Holding LLC., Moretrench American Corporation, MRA Engineering, PC, Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Musco Sports Lighting, LLC., Nacirema Industries Incorporated, New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Nyc Industrial Development Agency, 5 World Trade Center LLC., Nicholson Construction Company, Off Road Welding, Inc., Olympic Plumbing & Heating Corp., OVE ARUP & PARTNERS P.C., Parson Group, Inc., Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Pinnacle, Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Plaza Construction Corp., Plaza Construction Management Corp., 5 WTC Holding LLC., Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Pro Safety Services LLC., PT & L Contracting Corp., Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Rich-Mark Environmental Services Inc., Rober Silman Associates, Robert C Stewart, Robert Errat, Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Rodar Enterprises, Inc., A Russo Wrecking, Inc., Royal GM, Inc., SAB Trucking Inc., Safeway Environmental Corp., Seasons Industrial Contracting, Semcor Equipment and Manufacturing Corporation, Sheldrake Organization, Inc., Silverite Contracting Corporation, Silverstein Development Corp., ABM, Silverstein Properties Inc., Silverstein Properties, Silverstein WTC Facility Manager LLC., Silverstein WTC LLC., Silverstein WTC MGMT Co. LLC., Silverstein WTC Properties LLC., Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc., Skidmore, Owing & Merrill LLP, Star Delta Electric, Inc., Stier Anderson, LLC., ABM Industries, Inc., Summit Structures LLC., SURVIVAIR, Telenet Communication Inc., Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Speyer Properties, Tomasetti Group, Inc., Torretta Trucking, Inc., TOTAL SAFETY CONSULTING, LLC., Trio Asbestos Removal, Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Company, Tully Consulting Corp., Tully Environmental Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Turner Construction Co., Turner Construction Company, Turner Construction International, LLC., Tyyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation, Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), Acrow Corporation of America, United States Rebar, Inc., Vanguard Equities Inc., Vertical Technology, Inc., Vertical Lend Inc., Vollmer Associates LLP., W Harris & Sons Inc., Weeks Marine, Inc., Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Westfield America, Inc., Westfield WTC Holding LLC., Allcom Electric Inc., Westfield WTC, LLC., WFP Tower D. Co., LP, Whitney Contracting Inc., Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., World Trade Center Properties LLC., Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc.,, AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling LLC., ASG Pest Control, ATC Associates, Inc., Atlantic Heydt Corp., Atlas Concrete Corp., Avanti demolition & Carting Inc.,, Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Bergen Concrete Cutting, Inc., Berkel & Company, Contractors, Inc., BFP One Liberty Plaza Co., L.P., BFP Tower C Co. LLC., Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Boston Properties, Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze National Inc., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., C & D Fireproofing & Plastering Corp., C & D Painting & Decorating, Inc., C.B. Contracting Corp., Canron Construction Corp., Cantor Seinuk Group, Certified Fence Corp., Civetta-Cousins JV, LLC., Clarco Enterprises Corporation, Clarco Enterprises LLC., Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Consolidated Edison Communications Holding Company, Inc., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Consolidated Edison Development, Inc., Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc., Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc., Consolidated Edison,Inc., Coordinated Metals, Inc., Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Craig Test Boring Company Inc., Criticom International Corporation, Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Dakota Demo-Tech, Inc., DCM Erectors, Inc., Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Diego Construction, Inc., Diversified Carting, Inc., 1 World Trade Center LLC., DMT Enterprise, Inc., Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., EJ Davies, Inc., En-Tech Corp., Entertainment Partners Corp., ET Environmental, Evergreen Recycling of Corona(EROC), Ewell W. Finley, P.C., 1 WTC Holdings LLC., Executive Medical Services, P.C., F & G Mechanical, Inc., Felix Equities, Inc., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Frank Micelli Jr. Contracting, Inc., FTI Trucking, Inc., G & G Contracting Inc., Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, LLP, Gino Cracolici & Sons Inc., 2 World Trade Center LLC., Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, PLLC., Grace Industries, Inc., Hallen Welding Service,Inc., Helmsman Management Services, Inc., HGC Contracting Corp., High-Rise Electric, Inc., High Rise Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc., HP Environmental, Inc., Hunter Construction., Hunter Construction Co., 2 WTC Holdings LLC.. (Filing Fee $ 250.00, Receipt Number 560322)Document filed by Steven Spak, Marina Spak.(jeh, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2005 (mbe, ). (Entered: 11/08/2005)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 178 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?