Electronic Frontier Foundation v. Department of Justice
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-02946
District Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 18, 2016 at 11:40 PM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Electronic Frontier Foundation Electronic Frontier Foundation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Ann Lynch +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 jlynch@eff.org
Space David L. Sobel +2027 979 009 x104 +1 202 797 9066 sobel@eff.org
v.
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Justice"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/6/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/5/2014) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
      STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/16/2014) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 30 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
        STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING CASE AND EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 29 Stipulation.(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying Proceedings While Parties Pursue Settlement filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/16/2014) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
            STIPULATION AND ORDER ENLARGING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 27 Stipulation.(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Enlarging Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Lynch)(Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/14/2014) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE by Department of Justice re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Second Declaration of David Hardy)(Sowles, Marcia) (Filed on 3/14/2014) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 4/2/2014. Replies due by 4/23/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of David Hardy, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A-G to Hardy Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit H to Hardy Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit I (Part 1) to Hardy Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Part 2) to Hardy Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit I (Part 3) to Hardy Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit I (Part 4) to Hardy Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Part 5) to Hardy Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Part 6) to Hardy Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit I (Part 7) to Hardy Declaration, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit I (Part 8) to Hardy Declaration, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit J (Part 1) to Hardy Declaration, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit J (Part 2) to Hardy Declaration)(Sowles, Marcia) (Filed on 3/12/2014) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 24 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 23 Status Report filed by Department of Justice. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/3/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                    STATUS REPORT and Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by Department of Justice. (Sowles, Marcia) (Filed on 1/30/2014) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                      Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/26/2013 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 9/26/2013). Status Report due by 1/31/2014. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/26/2013) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                        JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation, Dpeartment of Justice. (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/19/2013) Modified on 9/20/2013 (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                          ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 18 Stipulation.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                            Certificate of Interested Entities by Electronic Frontier Foundation (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/16/2013) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 13 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings requesting to appear telephonically at case managment conference filed by Department of Justice. (Sowles, Marcia) (Filed on 9/16/2013) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                                ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 9/20/13 at 2:00 p.m. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                  ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sowles, Marcia) (Filed on 9/9/2013) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/5/2013) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/5/2013) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/5/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 13 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/5/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                            Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for David Sobel.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7879664.) filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Sobel, David) (Filed on 7/26/2013) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                ANSWER to Complaint byDepartment of Justice. (Sowles, Marcia) (Filed on 7/26/2013) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia K. Sowles for Defendant (Sowles, Marcia) (Filed on 7/26/2013) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/23/13. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Electronic Frontier Foundation.. (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/22/2013) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge due by August 2, 2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Department of Justice served on 6/26/2013, answer due 7/26/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/8/2013) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                            Summons Issued as to Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013) (farS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                              ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                COMPLAINT against Department of Justice ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 34611087303.). Filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2013: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (farS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 118 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?